Pawelkoski v. Stryker Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:13-cv-02441
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 1:16 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Pawelkoski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben W. Gordon, Jr. +1 850 434 0509 +1 850 436 6059 bgordon@levinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL A. NIGH +1 850 435 7013 +1 850 435 7020 dnigh@levinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meshbesher & Spence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Genevieve M Zimmerman +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 gzimmerman@meshbesher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meshbesher & Spence Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason P Johnston +1 612 339 9121 jjohnston@meshbesher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Selcer Zimmerman +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 csz@zimmreed.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics Corp, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Ireland Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stryker Ireland Limited"
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Order for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Member Cases. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 09/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (TSS) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Member Actions by Howmedica Osteonics re: ECF No. 693 in 13-md-2441 (DWF/FLN). (TSS) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
      Defendant Howmedica Osteonics Corp's Request for Entry Of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Member Actions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit B (Part 4), # 6 Exhibit B (Part 5), # 7 Exhibit B (Part 6)) (TSS) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Pawelkoski. Stryker Ireland Limited served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Nemo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This Notice serves as a reminder to all counsel that they shall read and comply with all Orders and Pretrial Orders ("PTOs") filed in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN), even if not filed in the individual member cases. As the Court noted on May 28, 2014 (Doc. No. 326 ), the Court only files all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the master MDL docket. For example, PTO No. 29, filed today on the master MDL docket is applicable to all cases and should be read and complied with by all counsel for all cases. Indeed, counsel is responsible for all documents applicable to all actions and filed in the master MDL docket. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Further, all Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/27/2015. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
            Summons Issued as to Stryker Ireland Limited. (kt) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
              TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: From this date on, all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN will be filed only in the master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN) and will not be filed in the individual member cases. Orders that apply to less than all cases (e.g., an Order of Dismissal of an individual member case) will be filed in the master MDL docket and in the individual member case. All Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO.9 (Protective Order). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER ON REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO SEEK PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION. Defendants' Request for Permission to Seek Partial Reconsideration of PTO No. 13 (Doc. No. 275 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 (Stipulated Order Regarding Bellwether Categories). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/9/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 (Order Regarding Defendants' Contacts With Physician-Experts). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15 (Order Regarding Deposition Guidelines for Plaintiffs Who are In Extremis). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 14 (PLCC Appointments to Sub-Committee to Confer with New Jersey Multicounty Litigation). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/21/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 13. (Order on Discovery Motion.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/15/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4. Order Regarding Direct Filing of Cases into this Court Without Need to Associate Local Counsel. (See Order for details.). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/9/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Pawelkoski. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. served on 4/9/2014, answer due 4/30/2014; Stryker Corporation served on 4/9/2014, answer due 4/30/2014; Stryker Sales Corporation served on 4/9/2014, answer due 4/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Gordon, Ben) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (Scheduling orders and bellwether cases.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/25/2014 and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/24/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al. (Please note this Amended PTO was originally filed on 3/25/2014, but only in the main MDL case of 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN. To be consistent with all of the other PTO's filed in this MDL, it is being refiled on this date in the main MDL case as well as all member cases.) (BJS) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (Scheduling orders and bellwether cases.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/14/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 11 (Electronic Service of Preliminary Disclosure Forms and Plaintiff Fact Sheets). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/28/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al. (BJS) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER re scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel at 2:00 PM on March 12, 2014 in chambers, Suite 9W, United States Courthouse, 300 South 4th Street, Minneapolis, MN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/26/14. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(kt) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 11 (Electronic Service of Preliminary Disclosure Forms and Plaintiff Fact Sheets). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/25/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 10 (Master Long and Short Form Complaints and Jury Trial Demand). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 1/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Master Long Form Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Master Short Form Complaint)Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 9 (Interim Protective Order). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement) Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8. (Forms for use by each plaintiff in providing preliminary and more extensive case-specific factual information in the above-referenced matter.). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Master Plaintiff's Preliminary Disclosure Form, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Fact Sheet)Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7. (Accepting Service of Process). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/19/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6. (Order governing procedures.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/21/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5. (Order Designating Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel Committee, Liaison Counsel, and Steering Committee & Defendants' Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel.) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/5/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4. Order Regarding Direct Filing of Cases into this Court Without Need to Associate Local Counsel. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/3/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- FILED IN WRONG CASE - LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Plaintiff's Interim Lead Counsel Genevieve Zimmerman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 4)(Zimmerman, Genevieve) Modified on 9/18/2013 (akl). (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation. Filed by Michael Pawelkoski. No summons requested. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              PRETRIAL ORDER #3. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/5/13. (akl) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER #2. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/22/13. (akl) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/5/13. (akl) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation. (akl) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per MDL List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 13cv2441 DWF/FLN. (akl) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-3685991.) Filed by Michael Pawelkoski. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?