Debra Croft v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1488

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 10:28 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:14-cv-04630-MGL.. [16-1488] (BHR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999875078] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [4] Copies to all parties.. [16-1488] (BHR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
      RESPONSE/ANSWER by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC to Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [4], follow up Notice [6]. Nature of response: in support of. [16-1488] Lawrence Hershon
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
        RESPONSE FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. notice requesting response [5], Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [4]Response due on 07/08/2016. [16-1488] (BHR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
          NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Lawrence Michael Hershon for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [4]Response due: 06/20/2016.[999845365]. [16-1488] (BHR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
            MOTION by Appellant Debra B. Croft to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [4]. Date and method of service: 06/07/2016 ecf. [999845244] [16-1488] Richard Gleissner
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
              DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Richard Robert Gleissner for Appellant Debra B. Croft re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 05/31/2016 from Richard Robert Gleissner and Lawrence Michael Hershon, filing of docketing statement (Loc.R. 3(b)) Docketing statement due from Debra B. Croft on 05/31/2016, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated on 05/31/2016.. [16-1488] (BHR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:14-cv-04630-MGL. [16-1488] (BHR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:14-cv-04630-MGL. Case manager: BarbaraRowe. [16-1488] (BHR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 140 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?