DANIELS v. MCDONOUGH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:05-cv-00171
District Judge MAURICE M PAUL, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 3:53 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MCDONOUGH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by STATE OF FLORIDA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WENDY ELAINE BENNER-LEON +1 202 305 7719 +1 202 307 8781 wendy.benner-leon@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES V CROSBY, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 19.50, receipt number 4-5229 (kdm) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
    PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 24.44, receipt number 4-4094 (kdm) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
      PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 10.00, receipt number 4-3965 (kdm) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
        Appeal Record Returned as to 57 Notice of Appeal filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. USCA# 06-14625-HH. (Three Volumes Returned.) (kdm) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
          MANDATE of USCA as to 57 Notice of Appeal filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. USCA# 06-14625-HH. (kdm) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
            Partial Filing fee: $ 40.04, receipt number 4-3108 (kdm) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 88 Motion for CLARIFICATION, clarifing the percentage at which deductions are made from his inmate account; Plaintiff must continue to pay each filing fee at the rate of 20 percent of the precedingmonths income credited to his account, resulting in a total rate of 40 percent of his income, until the full amount of each filing fee is satisfied. Signed by Judge MAURICE M PAUL on 10/10/07. (Mailed Plaintiff a copy of this Order). (kdm) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION TO CLARIFY THE PERCENT OF DEDUCTION FROM ACCOUNT re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and 78 USCA Order, by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (kdm) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                  Filing fee: $ 15.00, receipt number 4-2871 (bkp) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                    Partial Filing fee: $ 15.00, receipt number 4-2800 (dlt) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                      USCA Acknowledgment of 83 Appeal Record Sent to USCA. USCA Appeal # 06-14625-HH (deb) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF READINESS re 57 Notice of Appeal Number of Pleadings/Volumes: 3 (deb) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 57 Notice of Appeal 06-14625-HH (deb) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                            ORDER of USCA as to 57 Notice of Appeal filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS REINSTATING APPEAL 06-14625-HH. (deb) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                              ORDER of USCA as to 57 Notice of Appeal filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS DISMISSING APPEAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. USCA# 06-14625-HH (deb) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                Partial Filing fee: $ 18.98, receipt number 4-936 (amm) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                  Partial Filing fee: $ 18.98, receipt number 4-933 (amm) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
                                    ORDER of USCA as to 57 Notice of Appeal filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS denying IFP, directing prisoner to pay fee per PLRA, Granting leave to proceed, denying motion to clarify, denying motion for copies at court expense. USCA# 06-14625-H(NOTE 3 volumes of record received) (deb) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                      Filing fee: $ 29.24, receipt number 4-695 (pll) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                        Filing fee: $ 10.00, receipt number 4000000626 (pll) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
                                          Partial filing fee: $ 19.24, receipt number 40000502 (mlz, Tallahassee) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                            USCA Acknowledgement re: 72 Original Papers to USCA. USCA Appeal # 06-14625-H (deb) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for copy of record. Signed by Judge MAURICE M PAUL on 11/28/06. (copy of docket sheet forwarded) (deb) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                ORIGINAL PAPERS to US Court of Appeals re 57 Notice of Appeal Number of Pleadings/Volumes:3; USCA # 06-14625-H (atm) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Partial Filing fee: $ 10, receipt number 4*200 (jak) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                    REQUEST by USCA for Original papers. USCA# 06-14625-H (deb) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for permission to order the record on appeal by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (deb) Modified on 10/19/2006 (deb, Gainesville). (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                        REQUEST by USCA for original papers. USCA# 06-14625-H (deb) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                          USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER re: 57 NOTICE OF APPEAL USCA Appeal # 06-14625-H (deb) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                            CONSENT to payment of appeal fee from prison account re 57 Notice of Appeal (Copy to Finance) (deb) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                              USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER re: 57 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 55 Clerk's Judgment, 53 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. Certificate of Readiness due by 9/20/2006 (deb, Gainesville) USCA Appeal # 06-14625-H (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                USCA Case Number 06-14625-H for 57 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS,. (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER re: 57 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. USCA Appeal # 06-14625-H (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying 58 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, denying 59 Motion for Certificate of Appealability . Signed by Judge MAURICE M PAUL. (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 57 Notice of Appeal (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 55 Clerk's Judgment, 53 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. Certificate of Readiness due by 9/20/2006 (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              Partial Filing fee: $ 18.72, receipt number 8041117161 (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintff (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER ADOPTING 51 Report and Recommendation, GRANTING Summary Judgment Signed by Judge MAURICE M PAUL on 8/9/06. (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      OBJECTION to 51 Report and Recommendations by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, It is RECOMMENDED that 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAMES V CROSBY,, JAMES MCDONOUGH be GRANTED and the Clerk directed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor. Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR on 7/13/06. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/10/2006(pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER denying 44 Motion for Leave to File and finding as moot 45 Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE (of Filing Exhibits A-G) by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS re 48 Statement of Facts, 47 Response (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS Re: 47 Response. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE/Opposition re 34 Special Report by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS Re: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (pll, Tallahassee) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2006 (pll, Tallahassee). (Entered: 05/10/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B# 2 Exhibits C-O)(pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Motion for Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 42 Motion to Withdraw, declaring moot 29 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 35 Motion in limine, and denying 36 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (kjc, Tallahassee) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Court's Permission to Amend a Previously Amended Motion for Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (kjc, Tallahassee) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part 38 MOTION to Substitute Party. James McDonough is substituted as a Defendant in this case only as to the official capacity claims. Defendant Crosby remains a Defendant as to the individual capacity claims. 39 order is vacated. Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR on 4/27/06. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              OBJECTION to Substitution of Defendant by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (amm, Tallahassee) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 38 Motion to Substitute Party. The clerk shall substitute James McDonough in place of James V. Crosby on the docket. Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (kjc, Tallahassee) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Party /Notice of Substitution of Defendant by JAMES V CROSBY, JR. (BENNER-LEON, WENDY) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Written Objection to Defendant's Special Report re 34 Special Report by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (kjc, Tallahassee) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/28/2006) (kjc, Tallahassee) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SPECIAL REPORT by JAMES V CROSBY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9)(BENNER-LEON, WENDY) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Filing fee: $ 18.72, receipt number 8041100624 (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 31 Motion to Extend Time . Set Deadlines/Hearings Miscellaneous Deadline for Defendant to file Special Report - by 3/22/2006. Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Extend Time to File Special Report by JAMES V CROSBY, JR. (BENNER-LEON, WENDY) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to File summary judgment. Denying as moot 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall file the special report on or before 3/13/06 . Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (Filed 3/10/06 per order) (pll, Tallahassee) Modified on 3/13/2006 (pll, Tallahassee). (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 23 Motion Seeking Court's Permission to Proceed with Amended Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS Re: 26 Memorandum in Support. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support (Amended Motion for Summary Judgment) by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seek Court's Permission for Leave to File Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of 'For the Record Only'- Plaintiff does not consent to trial by the Magistrate Judge - by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seek the Court's Permission to Proceed with Amended Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 18 Motion for Leave to File . Set Deadlines/Hearings. Miscellaneous Deadline for filing separate statement of material facts - by 3/17/2006. Answer/Special Report due by 3/13/2006. Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing 'Citation of Authority' by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 20 Memorandum in Support (Attachments: # 1 Citation of Authority - Part II)(pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (Response due by 2/28/2006) (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 16 Motion to Extend Time . Set Deadlines/Hearings Miscellaneous Deadline for Defendant's Special Report - by 3/13/2006. Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR. (pll, Tallahassee) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Extend Time to File Special Report by JAMES V CROSBY, JR. (BENNER-LEON, WENDY) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by WENDY ELAINE BENNER-LEON on behalf of JAMES V CROSBY, JR (BENNER-LEON, WENDY) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Partial Filing fee: $ 35.10, receipt number 804109248 (als, Tallahassee) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by serving Susan A. Maher, Deputy General Counsel on 11/16/05 (als, Tallahassee) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for service of/ re 7 Amended Complaint filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. Summons Issued and forwarded to USM along with service copy of complant. . Signed by Judge WILLIAM C SHERRILL JR on 11/9/05. (als, Tallahassee) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE / LETTER re Adding new Magistrate Judge. Notifying parties of new assignment and Case No. to 4:05cv00171-MP/WCS. (als, Tallahassee) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re 8 Order re 7 Amended Complaint filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS, Miscellaneous Deadline: Copy of Amended Complaint - by 10/17/2005 by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. Copy of Amended Complaint received. (cda, Gainesville) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 7 Amended Complaint filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS, Miscellaneous Deadline: Copy of Amended Complaint - by 10/17/2005. Signed by Judge ALLAN KORNBLUM on 9/19/2005. (cda, Gainesville) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against JAMES V CROSBY, JR filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS [one service copy](tss, Gainesville) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS, directing clerk to send Plaintiff a section 1983 complaint form; Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/1995.. Signed by Judge ALLAN KORNBLUM on 7/19/05. (complaint form sent to Plaintiff)(llt, Gainesville) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS - New Address is Union Correctional Institution 7819 NW 228 Street Raiford, FL 32026 (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Signed by Judge ALLAN KORNBLUM. (copy of order mailed to Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 2601 Blair StoneRoad, Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500) (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to Pro Se (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS. (deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against JAMES V CROSBY, JR, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS , filed by RONNIE WAYNE DANIELS.(deb, Gainesville) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?