Four Fifty Three Barrington v. Barrington Avenue Partners
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC039749

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Four Fifty Three Barington Homeowners, Plaintiff

Represented by Quinley & Associates

v.
No Logo 453 Barrington Property Group Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Barrington Avenue Partners, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Bruce L. Cochran Associates Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Certified Air Conditioning & Heating, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Design Concepts Landscape Architecture, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Four Fifty Three Barrington Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Gold State Roofing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Jamal Tile Works, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Kennedy Wilson, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Kennedy-wilson International, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Leor Construction, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Lns Plumbing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Mills, Robert J., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Talfam Industries Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Taschler Linda M., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Tile Design Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Trend Electrical Systems Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Whp Gen-par Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo Whp Real Estate Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe & Wyman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nemiroff Warren
No Logo A.e. Schmidt, Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant
No Logo Concrete Loaiza, Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant
No Logo Pacific Coast Plumbing Co., Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant
No Logo Alpine Development, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Avital Construction, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Barajas Juan, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Best Fire Protection, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Blake Schwermer Showerpans, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Cal State Sheet Metal, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Caspian Service, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Certified Service Air Conditioning & Heat, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Chuck's Custom Painting, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo City National Bank, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Desert Blasters Construction Co., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Design Concepts, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Dick Kisiel Construction, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Fireplace Systems & Tri-country Heating, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Genam & Co. Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Gilbert Roofing, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Gilbert Roofing Company, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Gordon Roofing Company, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Insul-crete, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Interamerican Builders Group, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo J.b. Welding & Fencing, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo J.b. Wrought Iron & Welding, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Jamal Tile Works, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Kovacs-byer & Associates Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Landscape Development, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Lou Piano Electric Systems, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Malcolm Construction Co. Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Mbm Inc. Structural Engineering, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo O.j. Insulation Co. Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Ostler-jenkins Insulation Co., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Pacific Coast Plumbing Co. Ins., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Pacific Rug & Carpet Co., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Penhall Environmental Services, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Petty Gary, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Pr Waterproofing, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Roe Nos.27 37 & 57, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Ronald L. Jenny Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Safe Plastering, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo So. Cal. Mfg. Co., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Steel Danmar, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Thorpe Insulation Co., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Tim Mitchell Construction, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Totally Wired Electrical, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Ultra Painting, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Vista Plastering & Sons, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Wagner Industries, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Wagner Kerr Associates, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Westside Heating & Air Conditioning, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Woodie Woodpecker Woodworks Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Cochran Brian L. & Associates Inc., Cross-Complainant
No Logo Kisiel Construction, Cross-Complainant
No Logo Masonry Jack Dahl, Cross-Complainant
No Logo Golden State Roofing, Defendant's DBA
No Logo Mills, Robert J., Cross-Defendant in Pro Per
Type Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/12/1998
  Entries (269) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 269 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/17/1998 Remittitur Filed.
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. EACH PARTY TO BEAR OWN COSTS.
    Blank 268 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Declaration
    JOHN R. WHITE
      Blank 267 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Order
      MODIFIED--GRANTING DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ON RONALD L. JENNY dba PACIFIC COAST
        Blank 266 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Request For Entry Of Dismissal
          Blank 265 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 Notice Of Ruling
            Blank 264 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Notice Of Ruling
              Blank 263 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998 Notice
              OF SETTLEMENT
                Blank 262 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Notice of Continuance
                RE: HEARING
                  Blank 261 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Notice of Motion
                    Blank 260 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998 Partial Dismissal
                    w/o Prejudice) (X-COMPLT FILED BY TIM MITCHELL CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON FEB 26, 1997
                      Blank 259 Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Order
                      ORDER TO CONT TRIAL
                        Blank 258 Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Exparte Application
                        APP FOR ORDER ADVANCIG HRNG DATE ON MTN FOR GFS
                          Blank 257 Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Order
                          ORDER ADVANCING HRNG DATE ON MTN FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                            Blank 256 Filed: 1/2/1998, Entered: 1/2/1998 Notice of Continuance
                            RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF X-COMPLNT
                              Blank 255 Filed: 1/2/1998, Entered: 1/2/1998 Notice of Continuance
                              RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                Blank 254 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: 12/8/1997 Order
                                DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT TIM MITCHELL CONSTRUCTION, INC
                                  Blank 253 Filed: 12/5/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Notice of Continuance
                                  HEARING
                                    Blank 252 Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Declaration
                                    OF DAVID H. PIERCE
                                      Blank 251 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: 12/2/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                      with Prejudice) (AS TO TALFAM INDUSTRIES AND 453 BARRINGTON LTD.'S X-COMPLT AGAINST LOU PIANO ELECTRONICS ONLY.
                                        Blank 250 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 11/26/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                        w/o Prejudice) (FIRST AMENDED COMPLT AS TO WARNOCK HERSEY ONLY.
                                          Blank 249 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: 11/17/1997 Order
                                          ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                                            Blank 248 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Notice of Continuance
                                            RE: HEARING
                                              Blank 247 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Notice
                                              OF SETTLEMENT
                                                Blank 246 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                OF CROSS-DEFENDENT TIM MITCHELL FOR ORDER DETERMINING FAITH SETTLEMENT
                                                  Blank 245 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 10/22/1997 Substitution of Attorney
                                                    Blank 244 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Notice
                                                    SETTLEMENT
                                                      Blank 243 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                      DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLE MENT
                                                        Blank 242 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Association Of Attorney
                                                          Blank 241 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/14/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                            Blank 240 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
                                                              Blank 239 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: 10/6/1997 Answer
                                                                Blank 238 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: 10/6/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                  Blank 237 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 miscellaneous other
                                                                  RECOMMENDATION OF SPECIAL MASTER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND MODIFICATION NUMBER THREE THERETO AND ORDER THEREON
                                                                    Blank 236 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Default Entered
                                                                    AGAINST DEFT-R.R. WATERPROOFING
                                                                      Blank 235 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Default Entered
                                                                      AGAINST LOAIZA CONCRETE
                                                                        Blank 234 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Association Of Attorney
                                                                          Blank 233 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 Notice of Continuance
                                                                          RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED X-COMPLNT OF TALFAM INDUSTRIES,INC.
                                                                            Blank 232 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                            SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                              Blank 231 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997 Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
                                                                                Blank 230 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Answer
                                                                                  Blank 229 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
                                                                                    Blank 228 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                    SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                      Blank 227 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Answer to Second Amended X-Comp
                                                                                        Blank 226 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/3/1997 Notice
                                                                                        NTC OF SETTLEMENT & APPLICATION FOR SETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT, MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECL OF DENNIS L. ALTHOUSE
                                                                                          Blank 225 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                            Blank 224 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997 Stipulation
                                                                                            stip/order setting aside default
                                                                                              Blank 223 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997 Answer to Second Amended X-Comp
                                                                                                Blank 222 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (THE FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR EXPRESS/INDEMNITY AND THE TWELFTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF: DUTY TO DEFEND OF TALFAM INDUSTRIES, INC.'S X-COMPLT SEE DOCUMENT IN THE FILE.
                                                                                                  Blank 221 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997 Order
                                                                                                  RECOMMENDATIONS OF SPECIAL MASTER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND MODIFICATIO NUMBER TWO THERETO AND ORDER THEREON
                                                                                                    Blank 220 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/11/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                    w/o Prejudice) (X-COMPLT FILED BY TALFAM INDUSTRIES INC. ON FEB 25, 1997 X-COMPLT OF TALFAM INDUSTRIES, INC AGAINST X-DEFENDANT WAGNER-KERR ASSOCIATES ONLY.
                                                                                                      Blank 219 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/11/1997 Answer to Second Amended X-Comp
                                                                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: 8/6/1997 Answer to Second Amended X-Comp
                                                                                                          Blank 217 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: 8/6/1997 Association Of Attorney
                                                                                                            Blank 216 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                            SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED COMPLNT
                                                                                                              Blank 215 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Default Entered
                                                                                                              against deft-LOAIZA CONCRETE, INC.
                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/25/1997 Answer to Second Amended X-Comp
                                                                                                                  Blank 213 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997 Association Of Attorney
                                                                                                                    Blank 212 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                      Blank 211 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                        Blank 210 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/11/1997 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 7/8/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                          APP/ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE WRIT OF MANDATE FOLLOWING DETERMINATION OF GFS
                                                                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/3/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                              w/o Prejudice) (X-COMPLT FILED BY TALFAM INDUSTRIES, INC. FILED ON FEB 26, 1997, AS TO X-DEFENDANT ALPINE DEVELOPMENT, SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS ROE 151, ONLY.
                                                                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                RE: REPORTERS/MONITORS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
                                                                                                                                  Blank 205 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                    Blank 204 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                    w/o Prejudice) (X-COMPLT FILED BY TALFAM INDUSTRIES, INC. ON AS TO MALCOLM CONSTRUCTION, SUED AND SERVED HEREIN.
                                                                                                                                      Blank 203 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 6/26/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 6/24/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                            Blank 200 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                            RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                              Blank 199 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                              w/o Prejudice) (FIRST AMENDED X-COMPLT FILED BY TALFAM INDUSTRIES, INC. ON 2-26-97 AS TO PENHALL ENVIRONMENTAL SERV. (SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS ROE 154) ONLY.
                                                                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 197 Filed: 6/17/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Order
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT, BY X-DEFT, INTERAMERICAN BLDR'S GROUP AND PLTFF, 453 BARRINGTON HOMEOWNERS ASSOC
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 196 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 195 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (X-COMPLT FILED BY TALFAM INDUSTRIES ON 2-26-97 X-DEFENDANT, JERRY KOVACE & ASSOCIATES, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS KOVACS BYER AND ASSOCIATES, INC.) ONLY.
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                          RE: ATTY IN RE NTC OF APPEAL
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                              RE: FRANK W. BAUMAN
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 190 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 186 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 185 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                          RE: CITY NATIONAL BANK'S PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 184 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 183 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 182 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 181 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 180 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    DOE GARY PETTY dba P.R. WATERPROOFING
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      DOE 1 P.R. WATERPROOFING, INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/21/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        DOE 11 - JDM STRUCTURES
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          ROE 159 WOODIE WOODPECKERS WOODWORKS
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 176 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            ROE 158 KOVACS-BYER & ASSOCIATES, INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 175 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 174 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 173 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 172 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (X-COMPLT OF X-COMPLT, TIM MITCHELL CONSTRUCTION, INC., AGAINST X-DEFT CITY NATIONAL BANK, ONLY.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Association Of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 166 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RE: HEARING ONCITY NATIONAL BANKS DEMURRER TO X-COMPLNT OF TIM MITCHELL CONSTRUCTION, INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 162 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE: HEARING ON CITY NATIONAL BANKS DEMURRER TO X-COMPLNTOF LOU PIANO ELECTRIC SYSTEMS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            w/o Prejudice) (DISMISSING X-DEFENDANT LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC., ONLY, AS TO THE X-COMPLT OF TALFAM INDUSTRIES, INC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 158 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 154 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE: SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 153 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 152 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 151 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS & COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 150 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FEDERAL AND RELATED AUTHORITIES CITED IN REPLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 149 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 148 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 147 Filed: 4/23/1997, Entered: 4/23/1997 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (AS TO THE 4TH, 5TH, 6TH, 7TH, 8TH, 11TH, 12TH, 13TH AND 14TH CAUSES OF ACTION OF TALFAM INDUSTRIES, INC.'S X-COMPLT AGAINST LOU PIANO ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, ONLY.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 145 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 144 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 142 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ROE 151 ALPINE DEVELOPMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 141 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ROE 153 WESTSIDE HEATING & AIR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 140 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ROE 154 PENHALL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 139 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ROE 157 CITY NATIONAL BANK
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ROE 152 PACIFIC RUG & CARPET
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ROE 155 GORDON ROOFING COMPANY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/11/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: 4/8/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: 4/8/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOE 10 JACK DAHL MASONRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: 4/8/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: 4/8/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APP/ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE: FRANK W. BAUMAN IN SUPPORT OF INTERAMERICANS MOTN TO CONFIRM GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RE: DOUGLAS A. SHAW IN SUPPORT OF INTERAMERICANS MOTN TO CONFIRM GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 3/28/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 3/28/1997 First Amended Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 3/28/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ROE 151 INTER AMERICAN BUILDERS GROUP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFTS-X-C0MPLAINANTS AND X-DEFTS., BARRINGTON AVENUE PARTNERS, 453 BARRINGTON PROPERTY GROUP, INC KENNEDY-WILSON INTERNATION,KENNEDY WILSON, INC., WHP REAL ESTATE LIMI TED PARTNERSHIP, & WHP GEN-PAR,INC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGAIINST X-DEFTS-INSUL-CRETE, ROE 45, FOUR FIFTH THREE BARRINGTON, LTD., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 3/26/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/20/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AS TO ROE 114
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AS TO ROE 113
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE: CERTIFICTE OF MERIT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE: SUMMONS;FIRST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AS TO ROE 112
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AS TO ROE 109
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AS TO ROE 111
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER ROE 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION TO MTN OF DEFTS, X-COMPLTANTS AND X-DEFTS BARRINGTON AVE. PARTNERS ETC., TO C/T DTE; MEMORANDUM OF PTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECL OF DAVID M. HUFF IN SUPPORT THEREOF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION TO MTN OF X-DEFT SO CAL MFG. CO. TO C/T DTE; MEMORANDUM OF PTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECL OF DAVID M. HUFF IN SUPPORT THEREOF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER OF X-DEFT GILBERT ROOFING CO IN MTN TO CONT TRL.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 First Amended Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LOU PIANO ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS JOINDER IN SO CAL MFG. CO MTN TO CONT TRL.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Amended Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED NTC OF MTN TO CONT TRL DTE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/21/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/21/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NTC OF CONT OF X/DEFT AND X-COMPLN SO CAL MFG. CO'S MTN TO CONT TRL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTN TO CONT TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        1ST AMENDED COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Answer to First Amended X-Compl.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/28/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Association Of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/17/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS & 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWERED BY JUAN BARAJAS dba J.B. Wrought Iron & Welding (X-DEFTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWERED ON BEHALF OF CHUCK'S CUSTOM PAINTING (CROSS DEFT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWERED BY CHUCK'S CUSTOM PAINTING (CROSS DEFT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    1ST AMENDED COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 1/9/1997, Entered: 1/9/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/6/1997 First Amended Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/6/1997 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 12/27/1996, Entered: 12/27/1996 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS & X-COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (DISMISS GUY A. ZEBERT, ROE 5, FROM X-COMPLT OF X-COMPLAINANTS BARRINGTON AVENUE PARTNERS, ET AL, ONLY.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          w/o Prejudice) (DISMISS VICTOR PARR, ROE 6, FROM X-COMPLT OF X-COMPLAINANTS BARRINGTON AVENUE PARTNERS, ET AL. ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/4/1996 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOE 81 KENNEDY-WILSON INTERNATIONAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/4/1996 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOE 1 KENNEDY-WILSON, INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996 Amendment To Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ROE 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT KENNEDY-WILSON,INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION AND DEFT LINDA M. TASCHLER, AN INDIVIDUAL ONLY.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOE 81 KENNEDY-WILSON INTERNATIONAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 8/14/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: 8/12/1996 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/8/1996 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/3/1996 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: 4/23/1996 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED 1-25-96
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS & COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS & COMPLNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?