Gary Kress Vs. Ron Leclair, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC049831

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kress Gary, Plaintiff

Represented by Greenwald, Pauly, Foster & Miller

v.
No Logo Leclair Kellie, Defendant

Represented by Greenwald, Pauly, Foster & Miller

No Logo Leclair Ron, Defendant

Represented by Greenwald, Pauly, Foster & Miller

Type Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/12/1998
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Request For Entry Of Dismissal
    Blank 3 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 Answer
      Blank 2 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
        Blank 1 Filed: 11/6/1997, Entered: 11/6/1997 Complaint filed

          Space Space

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 31,586 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?