Jim Long Vs. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC056797

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Long, Jim, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Darling International, Inc.

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

v.
No Logo Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mandel & Norwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Hazan Bucky, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mandel & Norwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Koch Molly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mandel & Norwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Oldham Kenan, Mediator
Type Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 04/17/2001
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Request For Entry Of Dismissal
ENTIRE ACTION FILED W/PREJUDICE
    Blank 29 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Order
    RE: CONTINUANCE OF BRIEFING DATES AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
      Blank 28 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Stipulation
      RE: CONTINUANCE OF BRIEFING DATES AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
        Blank 27 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Notice Of Ruling
        MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION
          Blank 26 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Notice Of Ruling
            Blank 25 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 miscellaneous other
            DEFT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY'S SECOND REPLY TO THE FURTHER OPP OF MOLLY JORDAN KOCH TO MOTION OF DEFTS FOR A DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH AS TO THEIR SETTLEMENT WITH PLTF.
              Blank 24 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Opposition
              TO MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION
                Blank 23 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Stipulation
                AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE
                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                    Blank 21 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Request For Judicial Notice
                      Blank 20 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Notice Of Ruling
                      MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION
                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Order
                        ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTION DUE TO MAJOR ILLNESS OF COUNSEL
                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Exparte Application
                          FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTION DUE TO MAJOR ILLNESS OF COUNSEL
                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Stipulation and Order
                            TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Order
                              AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT EFFECTIVE 10-2-00
                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 Notice Of Ruling
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Exparte Application
                                  Unopposed ex parte application for order continuing trial date
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                    re continuance of trial date order signed by Judge Rubin
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Substitution of Attorney
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Notice Of Ruling
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Notice
                                          NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Notice Of Ruling
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Opposition
                                              - to motion to strike
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                FEE PAID BY LAW DEPT COLDWELL, BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE CO
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 5/28/1999 First Amended Complaint
                                                    FEE PAID BY QUINN, EMANUEL, URQUHART, OLIVER & HEDGES ATTY FOR PLTF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Notice of Motion
                                                      DEFT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANYS NTC OF MOTN & MOTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLNT MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Notice
                                                        NTC OF DEMURRER & DEMURRER OF DEFT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY TO THE 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION OF THE COMPLNT OF PLTF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Proof of Service
                                                          SUMMONS & COMPLNT
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Complaint

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?