Paul G. Aiello Et. Al. Vs. Erich W. Joiner Et. Al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC065799

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aiello Paul G., Plaintiff
No Logo White, Grace, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Coldwell Banker Jon Douglas Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Joiner Erich W., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Loof Gail, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Diana L. Mercer, Mediator
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution 05/13/2002
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Order of Dismissal
see minute order 5/13/02 ENTIRE ACTION PUR CCP 583.410
    Blank 13 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S
      Blank 12 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Partial Dismissal
      with Prejudice) (DISMISSAL FILED W/PREJUDICE AS THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO THE COMPLAINT AS TO ERICH JOINER ONLY.
        Blank 11 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Statement-Agreement
        Full
          Blank 10 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Notice
          OF SETTLEMENT
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Notice Assign.-Med Hrg Date
              Blank 8 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Ntc of Appmt of Evaluator/Mediator
                Blank 7 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Notice of Status Conference filed
                QUESTIONNAIRE
                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Notice of Status Conference filed
                  QUESTIONNAIRE
                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Notice of Status Conference filed
                    questionnaire
                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Answer
                        FEE PAID BY L/O COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY ATTY FOR DEFTS
                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 General Denial
                          FEE PAID BY CAROLYN J. WALLACE ATTY FOR DEFT
                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Complaint filed

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 1 time.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?