Paul M. Agbabian Vs. Tst Colorado Avenue Et. Al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC069148

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Agbabian, Paul M., Plaintiff

Represented by Astor & Phillips

v.
No Logo Bennitt Todd, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo David Forbes Hibbert Aia, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Ellerbe Becket Inc. A Delaware Corp., Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Mccarthy Western Constructors Inc., Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Mgm Plaza, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo P.o.d. Inc. A California Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Sasaki Associates Inc., Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Tst Colorado Avenue, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

No Logo Ellerbe Becket Construction Services Inc, Cross-Defendant
No Logo P.o.d. Sasaki, Defendant Erroneously Sued As
Type Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 02/18/2005
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 193 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 miscellaneous other
NOTICE TO BKKPR ISSUED JURY FEES IN THE SUM OF $150.00 POSTED ON 4/24/02 RECPT#SM164885014 TRANS TO TRUST
    Blank 192 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 191 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Acknow of Satisfaction of Judgment
        Blank 190 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Notice Of Ruling
          Blank 189 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Request For Dismissal
          WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE X-COMPLAINT FILED BY SASAKI ASSOCIATES ON 6/12/02 AND 7/17/02 AGAINST TST COLORADO, TISHMAN SPEYER, MGM PLAZA, MCCARTHY WESTERN AND ROES 21-30, INCLUSIVE
            Blank 188 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Notice Of Ruling
            AT HEARING ON OSC REGARDING DISMISSAL
              Blank 187 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Request For Dismissal
              WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE X-COMPLAINT FILED BY SASAKI & ASSOCIATES ON 6/12/02 & 7/17/02 AGAINST TST COLORADO, TISHMAN SPEYER, MGM PLAZA, McCARTHY WESTERN AND ROES 21-30, INCLUSIVE
                Blank 186 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Order: Case Management
                  Blank 185 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Request For Dismissal
                  WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE X-COMPLAINT FILED BY McCARTHY WESTERN CONSTRUCTORS ON 4/26/02
                    Blank 184 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Request For Dismissal
                    WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE X-COMPLAINT FILED BY TST COLORADO AVE LLC, MGM PLAZA ON 6/12/02 AND X-COMPLAINT FILED BY TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES ON 6/12/02
                      Blank 183 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Notice
                      OF RULING AT HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL
                        Blank 182 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Order: Case Management
                          Blank 181 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Acknow of Satisfaction of Judgment
                            Blank 180 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Notice Of Ruling
                            AT TSC
                              Blank 179 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Order: Case Management
                                Blank 178 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Remittitur Filed.
                                RESPONDENTS SHALL RECEIVE COSTS ON APPEAL.
                                  Blank 177 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Notice Of Ruling
                                    Blank 176 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Order: Case Management
                                      Blank 175 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Notice Of Ruling
                                        Blank 174 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Notice
                                        OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
                                          Blank 173 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Notice-Case Reassignment and Order
                                            Blank 172 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Notice
                                            TO REPORTERS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
                                              Blank 171 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Notice
                                              designation of ther record on appeal 5.1 and reporters
                                                Blank 170 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Notice
                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Notice
                                                  OF FILING OF APPEAL
                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Notice of Appeal
                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                        TOTAL COSTS $6570.03
                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                              TOTAL COSTS $2393
                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE
                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Judgment*
                                                                    submitted by defts sasaki assoc and todd bennitt
                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                      on motions for summary judgment
                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Judgment*
                                                                        submitted by deft ellerbe becket, inc and cross-defendant ellerbe becket construction services
                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                            ON EX-PARTE APPLICATION
                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Objection Document Filed
                                                                              OF DEFT ELLERBE BECKET, INC. AND CROSS-DEFT. ELLERBE BECKET COSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC. TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT LODGED BY TST COLORADO AVE, LLC TISHMAN SPEYER; REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Declaration
                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL DECL OF JONATHAN F. GOLDING IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION
                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                  of Ellerbe Becket Inc. to proposed judgments lodged by Mc Carthy Western Constructors and Sasaki Assoc. and lodging of alternative form of judgment; decl of Jona- thank F. Golding;
                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Notice
                                                                                    of errata re exhibit "g" to joint appendix of exhibits;
                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 reply to motion
                                                                                      deft mccarthy western constructors inc's reply to plff's opposition to motion for s/j and for costs
                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 reply to motion
                                                                                        deft mccarthy western constructors inc's objection to evidence filed in support of plff's opposition to motion for s/j and for costs;
                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 reply to motion
                                                                                          TO OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Brief
                                                                                            REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                              TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Response
                                                                                                TO NEW ADDITIONAL FACTS
                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                  TO TESTIMONY PROFFERED BY SASAKI ASSOC. AND TODD BENNITT
                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 reply to motion
                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO NEW OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                      to msj; decl of Ronald N . Sarian Paul M. Agbabian and Jay William Preston
                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Response
                                                                                                        to Ellerbe Becket separate state- ment of undisputed material facts
                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                          to msj of Sasaki Assoc. and Todd P. Bennitt; declarations
                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Response
                                                                                                            to Sasaki Assoc. and Todd P. Bennitt's separate statement of undisputed material facts;
                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                              to msj of Mc Carthy Western Const- ructors Inc.; declarations
                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Response
                                                                                                                to McCarty Western Constructor's separate statement of undisputed material facts; additional materia l facts;
                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Response
                                                                                                                  to separate statement of TST Colorado Ave LLC;
                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                    appendix of exhibits filed
                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                                        to msj of Ellerbe Beckett; decl of Ronald N. Sarian, Paul M. Agbabian, Jay William Preston and Bruce Sellery
                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                                          TO MC CARTHY WESTERN CONSTRUCTORS INC.'S MSJ;
                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Notice of trial
                                                                                                                            final status conference and motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Response
                                                                                                                              AND OPP TO TST COLORADO AVE AND MGM PLAZA'S MSJ;
                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                OF HEARING ON MOTION OF DEFT. ELLERBE BECKET, INC. FOR MSJ
                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                  MEMO OF P & A;
                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                    OF FRANK W. MOLLOY IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                          AND FOR COSTS; MEMO OF P & A; DECL OF JOHN BIRCH AND KARYL TOWELL IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSE D ORDER
                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                    IN SUPPORT OF MSJ;
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                        of s/c
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                          OF S/C
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Notice of Change of Hearing/Trial
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                OF MSJ
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUPERIOR COURTS 8-5-02 MINUTE ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Notice of Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Notice of Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                          OF SUPERIOR COURT'S AUGUST 1,2002 MINUTE ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                              OF SUPERIOR COURT'S JULY 26, 2002 MINUTE ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                GRANTING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS SIGNED BY JUDGE NEIDORF THIS DATE.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  is signed by Judge Neidorf this date.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                      0F M.D. DICKEY
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                          TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                            TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF RECOGNITN OF DANGE RAFTER THE ACCIDENT
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              PLTFS NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURES
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                #2 RE EXCLUSION OF INS, PROFITS AND/OR FINANCIAL CONDITON OF X-DFT ELLERBE BECKER CONSTRUCITON SERVICE,INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                  #1 RE EXCLUSION OF INS, PROFITS AND/OR FINANCIAL CONDITION OF DEFT ELLERBE BECKER, INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF REQUEST BY DEFT AND X-DEFT. FOR CONT. OF HEARING ON DEFT MCCARTHY WESTERN CONSTRUCTORS INC.'S MOT. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO PERMIT ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY AND FURTHER BRIEFING.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF PERSONAL SERVICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF KAREN D. MAHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ELLERBE BECKET, INC. AND X-DEFT. ELLERBE BECKET CONSTRUC- TION SERVICES MOT. FOR TRIER OF FACT TO VIEW MGM PLAZA BASKETBALL COURT AND ADJACENT WALL
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF LODGING OF ANNOTATED COPY OF DECL. OF JOHN BIRCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. AND X-DEFT.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS THERETO.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF KATHLEEN M. BRAGG
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE: DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE, OF DEFT DAVID FORBES HIBBERT, AIA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (P/DISMISSAL FILED ON 7-9-02 W/O PREJUDICE AS THE DEFT DAVID FORBES HIBBERT, AIA, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF EARL E. SMITH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF SERVICE BY EXPRESS CARRIER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RULING ON CROSS DEFT. ELLERBE BECKET CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF DAVID HULLINGER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF BRUCE M. COHEN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 CCP 170.6 Application FiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  against Judge Neidorf
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    X-DEFT ELLERBE BECKET CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEAR- ANCE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            IN MSJ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX OF EXH IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Notice of Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF MSJ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF SERVICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF DAVID HULLINGER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF JONATHAN F. GOLDING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF KAREN D. MAHER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF BRUCE M. COHEN ESQ.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF JONATHAN F. GOLDING ESQ.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF KATHLEEN M. BRAGG
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF STEVEN R. PARMINTER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            POSITION WITH REGARD TO ANTICIPA- TED EX PARTE APP. OF ELLERBE BECKET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FEE PAID BY HUNTER, MOLLOY & SALCIDO ATTY FOR DEFT.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR ORDER EXTENDING HEARING CUTOFF DATE ON MSJ AND TO RESCHED- ULE HEARING OF BECKET'S MSJ SET ON 7/22/02 FOR 8/6/02
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS TST COLORADO AVENUE LLC TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES LP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of defts and cross-defts;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOE 14 HAVING DISCOVERED TO BE: SASAKI ASSOCIATES, INC., a Massachusetts Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR ORD. CONT. DEPO. OF PLFF. OR FOR REQUIRING PLFF TO SUBMIT TO SUBSEQUENT DEPO. BY DEFT. BECKET, OR FOR ORDER STAYING DEPO.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      POSTION WITH REGARD TO EX PARTE OF ELLERBE BECKET,INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FEE PAID BY MORRIS, POLICH & PURDY ATTY FOR DEFT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RE EX PARTE RE DEPOSITION OF PLFF. IS SIGNED BY JUDGE NEIDORF THIS DATE.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ERRATA RE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DOE 3 P.O.D., INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA RE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DOE 2 MCCARTHY WESTERN CONSTRUCTORS, INC.,
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA RE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DOE 1 ELLERBE BECKET, INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FEE PAID BY MICHAEL J. SHLUB ATTY FOR DEFT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RE STATUS CONFERENCE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Notice of Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FEE PAID BY WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER ATTY FOR DEFTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        doe 3 having discovered to be: P.O.D., Inc., a California Corp.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          doe 1 having discovered to be: Ellerbe Becket, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Doe 2 having discovered to be: McCarthy Western Constructors, Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Notice of Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE TO BE 3-7-02 9:00 AM DEPT WE O
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Notice of Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE: DILIGENCE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIRTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO C.C.P 411.35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?