Harry Cohen Etal Vs. Barton Brodkin Etal
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC070342

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cohen Harry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schwartz Robert A..
No Logo Cohen Heather, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schwartz Robert A..
v.
No Logo Brodkin 1983 Revocable Trust The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Brodkin Barton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Brodkin Thea, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Coldwell Banker Previews, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Douglas Jon Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Grisanti Paul, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Grisanti Sara, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Hamlin Linda, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Lippert Judi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Pritchett-rapf & Associates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mccormick Siepler & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Blakeman, Benjamin, Mediator
No Logo Grigor & Anait Krgatbashyan, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Stearns & Clemons Law Offices Of

No Logo Stephanie M. Loo, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Stearns & Clemons Law Offices Of

No Logo Thomas S. Loo, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Stearns & Clemons Law Offices Of

Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 09/29/2003
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Request For Dismissal
    Blank 41 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Partial Dismissal
    with Prejudice) (DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE CO erroneously sued as COLDWELL BANKER PREVIEWS AND JON DOUGLAS CO, PAUL GRISANTI, SARA GRISANTI, AND JUDY LIPPERT
      Blank 40 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Notice-Settlement
        Blank 39 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Substitution of Attorney
          Blank 38 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Substitution of Attorney
            Blank 37 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Answer To Second Amended Complaint
              Blank 36 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Notice Of Ruling
              RE DEMURRER OF DEFTS TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                Blank 35 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Opposition
                TO COLDWELL BANKER'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                  Blank 34 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                    Blank 33 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Demurrer
                    TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Second Amended Complaint
                      FOR DAMAGES FOR FRAUD AND NON DISCLOSURE, DECEIT, BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND NEGLIGENCE
                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Notice Of Ruling
                          Blank 30 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Opposition
                          TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT MADE BY THE COLDWELL BANKER DEFTS
                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Notice
                            NOTICE OF CHAANGE OF LAW FIRM OF HAMBURG, HANOVER, EDWARDS & MARTIN TO THE LAW FIRM OF LINER, YANKELEVITZ, SUNSHINE & REGENSTREIF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice
                              OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Order
                                RE TRIAL PREPARATION AND MANAGEMENT
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Partial Dismissal
                                  with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANT STEPHANIE M. LOO ONLY
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Demurrer
                                      TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: 7/5/2002 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Notice Of Ruling
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Joinder
                                            IN MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Notice
                                              AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Opposition
                                                TO CROSS-DEFT THOMAS LOO'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS FOR TRIAL
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                  OF BARTON AND THEA BRODKIN
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 First Amended Complaint
                                                    FOR DAMAGES FOR FRAUD AND NON DISCLOSURE, DECEIT, BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND NEGLIGENCE
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Motion to Consolidate
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Notice Of Ruling
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Ntc of Appmt of Evaluator/Mediator
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                            QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                              QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Opposition
                                                                TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT MADE BY THE COLDWELL BANKER DEFENDANTS
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                  QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                    QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                      QUESTIONNAIRE
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Answer
                                                                        FEE PAID BY HAMBURG, HANOVER, EDWARDS & MARTIN ATTY FOR DEFTS
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Answer
                                                                            FEE PAID BY MCCORMICK, SIEPLER & BAKER ATTY FOR DEFTS
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Deft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
                                                                              AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Proof of Service
                                                                                OF ORDER & NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT & CASE RELOCATION
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Notice-Case Reassignment and Order
                                                                                  assigned from weo to weh/wla effective 4-9-02
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Complaint

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?