Forsta AP-Fonden et al v. St. Jude Medical, Inc. et al
Federal Court Proceeding Minnesota District Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 6:58 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Gustafson +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dgustafson@gustafsongluek.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Hedlund +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dhedlund@gustafsongluek.com
No Logo Danske Invest Management A/S, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heins Mills & Olson, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Anderson +1 612 338 4605 janderson@heinsmills.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent J Esades +1 612 338 4605 +1 612 338 4692 vesades@heinsmills.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ranae D. Steiner +1 612 338 4605 +1 612 338 4692 rsteiner@heinsmills.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M. Castaldo +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 gcastaldo@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua E. D'Ancona, Esq. +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 jdancona@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Christopher Mulveny +1 610 822 0262 +1 610 667 7056 dmulveny@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret E Onasch +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 monasch@ktmc.com
No Logo Forsta AP-fonden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heins Mills & Olson, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Anderson +1 612 338 4605 janderson@heinsmills.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent J Esades +1 612 338 4605 +1 612 338 4692 vesades@heinsmills.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ranae D. Steiner +1 612 338 4605 +1 612 338 4692 rsteiner@heinsmills.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M. Castaldo +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 gcastaldo@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/04/2016, PRO HAC VICE David P. Abel +1 843 216 9000 +1 212 818 0477 dabel@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Dixon Camm +1 504 648 1485 mcamm@motleyrice.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2015, PRO HAC VICE Rebecca M Katz +1 212 577 0040 +1 212 577 0054 rkatz@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg S. Levin +1 843 216 9512 +1 843 216 9440 glevin@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Cole Littlejohn +1 843 216 9000 jlittlejohn@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher F Moriarty +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 cmoriarty@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Narwold +1 860 882 1676 +1 860 882 1682 bnarwold@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance V. Oliver +1 843 216 9000 loliver@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Pendell +1 860 218 2722 +1 860 882 1682 mpendell@motleyrice.com
No Logo Norfolk County Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Ann Avan +1 212 949 4640 +1 212 949 4640 ravan@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Walter Stocker +1 212 907 0882 +1 212 883 7082 mstocker@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/06/2014 Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/06/2014 Lindsey A. Davis +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 ldavis@zelle.com
No Logo Robert Freedman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chestnut Cambronne PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan L Bleichner +1 612 339 7300 +1 612 336 2921 bbleichner@chestnutcambronne.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Bores +1 612 339 7300 +1 612 336 2940 jbores@chestnutcambronne.com
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl L. Cambronne +1 612 339 7300 +1 612 336 2940 kcambronne@chestnutcambronne.com
v.
No Logo Daniel J. Starks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle S Grant +1 612 340 5671 +1 612 340 2807 grant.michelle@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Randall H Steinmeyer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Catherine Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura R Hammargren +1 312 701 8146 +1 312 701 7711 lhammargren@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael, Jr. +1 312 701 7653 +1 312 706 8178 wmichael@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Leslie Ring +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8675 DRing@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alycia A. Degen +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 adegen@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Dosch +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jdosch@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Graham +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 5599 dgraham@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Daniel Keeling, III +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 rkeeling@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel B Niewoehner +1 312 853 7588 +1 312 853 7036 rniewoehner@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by St. Jude Medical, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/14/2013 James W A Ladner +1 651 756 2048 +1 651 756 2156 jladner@sjm.com
TERMINATED: 02/14/2013 J Aron Allen +1 651 490 4431 +1 651 490 4420 aallen@sjm.com
No Logo Donald J. Zurbay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle S Grant +1 612 340 5671 +1 612 340 2807 grant.michelle@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura R Hammargren +1 312 701 8146 +1 312 701 7711 lhammargren@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael, Jr. +1 312 701 7653 +1 312 706 8178 wmichael@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Leslie Ring +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8675 DRing@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alycia A. Degen +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 adegen@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Dosch +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jdosch@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Graham +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 5599 dgraham@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Daniel Keeling, III +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 rkeeling@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel B Niewoehner +1 312 853 7588 +1 312 853 7036 rniewoehner@sidley.com
No Logo Eric S. Fain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle S Grant +1 612 340 5671 +1 612 340 2807 grant.michelle@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura R Hammargren +1 312 701 8146 +1 312 701 7711 lhammargren@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael, Jr. +1 312 701 7653 +1 312 706 8178 wmichael@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Leslie Ring +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8675 DRing@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alycia A. Degen +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 adegen@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Dosch +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jdosch@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Graham +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 5599 dgraham@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Daniel Keeling, III +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 rkeeling@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel B Niewoehner +1 312 853 7588 +1 312 853 7036 rniewoehner@sidley.com
No Logo John C. Heinmiller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle S Grant +1 612 340 5671 +1 612 340 2807 grant.michelle@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura R Hammargren +1 312 701 8146 +1 312 701 7711 lhammargren@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael, Jr. +1 312 701 7653 +1 312 706 8178 wmichael@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Leslie Ring +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8675 DRing@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alycia A. Degen +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 adegen@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Dosch +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jdosch@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Graham +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 5599 dgraham@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Daniel Keeling, III +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 rkeeling@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel B Niewoehner +1 312 853 7588 +1 312 853 7036 rniewoehner@sidley.com
No Logo Michael T. Rousseau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle S Grant +1 612 340 5671 +1 612 340 2807 grant.michelle@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura R Hammargren +1 312 701 8146 +1 312 701 7711 lhammargren@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael, Jr. +1 312 701 7653 +1 312 706 8178 wmichael@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Leslie Ring +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8675 DRing@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alycia A. Degen +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 adegen@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Dosch +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jdosch@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Graham +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 5599 dgraham@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Daniel Keeling, III +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 rkeeling@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel B Niewoehner +1 312 853 7588 +1 312 853 7036 rniewoehner@sidley.com
No Logo St. Jude Medical, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Quest Medical, Inc.
Unknown Role, Apollo Merger Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle S Grant +1 612 340 5671 +1 612 340 2807 grant.michelle@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Randall H Steinmeyer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Catherine Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura R Hammargren +1 312 701 8146 +1 312 701 7711 lhammargren@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael, Jr. +1 312 701 7653 +1 312 706 8178 wmichael@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Leslie Ring +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8675 DRing@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alycia A. Degen +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 adegen@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Dosch +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jdosch@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Graham +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 5599 dgraham@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Daniel Keeling, III +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 rkeeling@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel B Niewoehner +1 312 853 7588 +1 312 853 7036 rniewoehner@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by St. Jude Medical, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/14/2013 James W A Ladner +1 651 756 2048 +1 651 756 2156 jladner@sjm.com
TERMINATED: 02/14/2013 J Aron Allen +1 651 490 4431 +1 651 490 4420 aallen@sjm.com
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 295 MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation, 297 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Class Counsels Motion for Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Reimbursement of Class Representatives Costs and Expenses : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Anderson, James) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Declaration of Gregg S. Levin and Gregory M. Castaldo in Support of 297 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Class Counsels Motion for Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Reimbursement of Class Representatives Costs and Expenses, 295 MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Cornerstone Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Jan Matej, # 3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Bo Spanding, # 4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Eric Schachter, # 5 Exhibit 5 Declaration of Joshua C. Littlejohn, # 6 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Gregory M. Castaldo, # 7 Exhibit 7 Declaration of James W. Anderson, # 8 Exhibit 8 Summary Time/Expense Chart)(Anderson, James) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEMORANDUM in Support re 297 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Class Counsels Motion for Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Reimbursement of Class Representatives Costs and Expenses - Memorandum of Law in Support of Class Counsels Motion for Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Reimbursement of Class Representatives Costs and Expenses filed by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, James) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Attorney Fees - Class Counsels Motion for Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Reimbursement of Class Representatives Costs and Expenses by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden. (Anderson, James) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM in Support re 295 MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation - Memorandum of Law in Support of Class Representatives Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, James) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden. (Anderson, James) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: The Settlement Fairness Hearing has been RESCHEDULED for Wednesday, November 9, 2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. Please update your calendars accordingly. (CBC) Modified text on 8/9/2016 (KMM). (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE by Eric S. Fain, John C. Heinmiller, Michael T. Rousseau, St. Jude Medical, Inc., Daniel J. Starks, Donald J. Zurbay re 290 Settlement Agreement, Notice of Service of Class Action Fairness Act Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit(s) A)(Grant, Michelle) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND SETTLEMENT NOTICE PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 07/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Notice of Proposed Settlement, of Motion for Fee Award, and of Settlement Fairness Hearing, # 2 Exhibit 2: Proof of Claim Form, # 3 Exhibit 3: Publication Notice) (TSS) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden re 287 MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Anderson, James) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement by Forsta AP-Fonden, Danske Invest Management A/S. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order, # 3 Exhibit A-1 - Long Settlement Notice, # 4 Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim Form, # 5 Exhibit A-3 - Summary Settlement Notice, # 6 Exhibit B - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment, # 7 Exhibit C - Exclusion List)(Anderson, James) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 287 MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, James) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 287 MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement : at date and time to be determined. (Anderson, James) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Approval of Settlement - Class Representatives Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden. (Anderson, James) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Eric Schachter with attached Exhibits A-F by Danske Invest Management A/S, Forsta AP-Fonden (D'Ancona, Joshua) Modified on 5/25/2016 (MMP). (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?