United States of Amercia et al v. Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-01608
District Judge Sara Lioi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:10 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Leatra Harper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Black, Mccuskey, Souers & Arbaugh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W Connors PHV +1 330 456 8341 +1 330 456 5756 tconnors@bmsa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rakovic, Zoran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warner Mendenhall +1 330 535 9160 +1 330 762 9743 warnermendenhall@hotmail.com
No Logo Leslie Harper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Black, Mccuskey, Souers & Arbaugh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W Connors PHV +1 330 456 8341 +1 330 456 5756 tconnors@bmsa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rakovic, Zoran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warner Mendenhall +1 330 535 9160 +1 330 762 9743 warnermendenhall@hotmail.com
No Logo Steven Jansto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Black, Mccuskey, Souers & Arbaugh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W Connors PHV +1 330 456 8341 +1 330 456 5756 tconnors@bmsa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rakovic, Zoran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warner Mendenhall +1 330 535 9160 +1 330 762 9743 warnermendenhall@hotmail.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "United States of Amercia"

Toggle Switch Represented by Black, Mccuskey, Souers & Arbaugh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ex rel Thomas W Connors PHV +1 330 456 8341 +1 330 456 5756 tconnors@bmsa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Northern District of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O. Judson Scheaf, III +1 614 233 5190 +1 614 221 5909 JScheaf@hahnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer D. Armstrong +1 216 348 5809 +1 216 348 5474 jarmstrong@mcdonaldhopkins.com
Space Peter Daniel Welin +1 614 484 0701 pwelin@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P. O. Box 668

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Kevin Lundholm +1 330 343 5585 +1 330 343 7977 lundholm@kpldlaw.com
Space James J. Pringle, Jr. +1 330 343 5585 +1 330 343 7977 jpringle@kpldlaw.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Leave
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Leave
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and LR 16.3(b)(3), parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Connors, Thomas) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Initial Disclosures filed by Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District. (Scheaf, O.) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Connors, Thomas) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Attorney Appearance of James J. Pringle and J. Kevin Lundholm filed on behalf of Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District. (Pringle, James) Modified text on 8/19/2016 (H,KR). (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Attorney Appearance by O. Judson Scheaf III, Peter D. Welin and Jennifer D. Armstrong filed on behalf of Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District. (Scheaf, O.) Modified text on 8/18/2016 (H,KR). (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 9/21/2016 at 12:00 PM in Chambers 526, U.S. District Court, Akron, before Judge Sara Lioi. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 8/31/2016. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 9/7/2016. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(P,J) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Order: The complaint shall be unsealed and served upon defendant by the relator. All other contents of the Court's file shall remain under seal and not be made public or served upon the defendant, except for this order and the government's notice of election to decline intervention (Related Doc # 4 ), which the relator will serve upon the defendant. The seal be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this order. The parties shall serve all pleadings and motions filed in this action upon the United States. The parties shall serve all notices of appeal upon the United States. All orders shall be sent to the United States. Should the relator or defendant propose that this action be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued, the Court will solicit the written consent of the United States before ruling or granting its approval. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/16/2016. (P,J) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Attorney Appearance by Thomas W. Connors filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Connors, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Election to Decline Intervention filed by United States of Amercia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (H,SP) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Leslie Harper, Steven Jansto, Leatra Harper. Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District waiver sent on 7/29/2016, answer due 9/27/2016. filed on behalf of Leslie Harper; Steven Jansto; Leatra Harper (Mendenhall, Warner) Modified service and answer on 8/12/2016 (H,KR). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/13/2015. (P,J) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                        Complaint against Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District. Filing fee of $400.00 paid, receipt # 54660005619, filed by Leslie Harper, Steven Jansto, Leatra Harper. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 5:13cv2145 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Lease dated 6/17/11, # 3 Exhibit B - Lease dated 5/27/12, # 4 Exhibit C - Lease dated 2/15/13, # 5 Exhibit D - Lease dated 4/22/14) (M,TL) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?