J.d. Wilson Vs. Litton Loan Servicing Et. Al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC101449

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 11, 2017 at 1:19 AM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wilson, JD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dickson Roy C.
v.
No Logo Ara Boghosian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Bank Of New York Mellon The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Litton Loan Servicing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Mortgage Corporation. The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Quality Loan Service Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Westwood Associates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roup & Associates A Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark V. Asdourian Plc

Represented by Roup and Associates

No Logo Goods & Services, Defendant's DBA
No Logo Wilson, JD, Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Type Civil (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/16/2012
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 113 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Request For Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
    Blank 112 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Notice
    OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
      Blank 111 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Notice of hearing
      ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
        Blank 110 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Notice-Settlement
        OF ENTIRE CASE, CONDITIONAL
          Blank 109 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Stipulation and Order
          RE DEPOSITION DISCOVERY AND NOTICE FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER THEREON
            Blank 108 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Stipulation and Order
            to continue mediation completion date Mediation completion extended to 12-12-11
              Blank 107 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Deft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
              TO PLAINTIFF'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT
                Blank 106 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Stipulation and Order
                Re: Deposition Discovery and Notice For Hearing on Motion For Summary Judgment
                  Blank 105 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Amended Complaint
                  SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                    Blank 104 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011 Stipulation and Order
                    To Take Off Calendar Hearing on Demurrer to Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint and For Leave to File a Sixth Amended Complaint
                      Blank 103 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Notice of Continuance
                        Blank 102 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Demurrer
                        to plff's "5" AMENDED COMPLAINT; memo of points & authorities
                          Blank 101 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 Order-Court Fee Waiver
                          ON BEHALF OF ARA BOGHOSIAN
                            Blank 100 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 Request-Waive Court Fees
                              Blank 99 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Motion to compel
                              answers to special interrogs & for sanctions; memo of points & authorities
                                Blank 98 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Motion to compel
                                answers to form interrogs & for sanctions; memo of points & authorities in support thereof
                                  Blank 97 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Motion to compel
                                  responses to req for production of documents & req for sanctions; memo of points & authorities
                                    Blank 96 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Proof of Service
                                      Blank 95 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Declaration
                                      OF MARK V. ASDOURIAN OF MOTIONS TO: COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM & SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQ FOR HE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; & FOR AN ORDER THAT MATTERS BE DEEMED ADMITTED
                                        Blank 94 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Motion for an Order
                                        that matters be deemed admitted; memo of points & authorities
                                          Blank 93 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Proof of Service
                                            Blank 92 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Proof of Service of Summons
                                              Blank 91 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                Blank 90 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Answer
                                                ANSWER TO FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 Opposition
                                                      PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO WMC MORTGAGE CORP'S DEMURRER TO 5TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Proof of Service
                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Notice
                                                            WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S AMENDED NTC OF HEARING ON DEMURRER & DEMURRER TO FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Memo points & authorities
                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Demurrer
                                                                WCM MORTGAGE, LLC'S NTC HRG ON DEMURRER & DEMURRER TO 5TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Summons Filed
                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 First Amended Complaint
                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED
                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                        REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Opposition
                                                                          PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO WMC MORTGAGE CORP'S DEMURRER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                              in support of WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Declaration
                                                                                  QUALITY'S DECLARATION
                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Declaration
                                                                                    DECLARATION OF DAVID OWEN IN SUPPORT OF QUALITY'S DECLARATION
                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Notice of hearing
                                                                                            ON DEMURRER
                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Fourth Amended Complaint
                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Summons Filed
                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Notice
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Order
                                                                                                    DISMISSING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS LITTON LOAN SERVICING LP AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF THE GE-WMC ASSET...
                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                        of supplemental Federal authorities in support of plff's opposition to defts' demurrer to 3rd amended complaint
                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                          reply to plff's late opposition to demurrer to 3rd amended complaint by deft's Litton Loan Servicing LP & the Bank of New York Mellon
                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                            OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                              PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO LITTON LOAN & NEW YORK MELLON'S DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO WMC MORTGAGE CORP'S DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                    WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S NTC HRG ON DEMURRER & DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                      IN SUPPORT OF WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                        OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Demurrer
                                                                                                                          to 3rd amended complaint by defts Litton Loan Servicing LP & the Bank of New York Mellon; memo points & authorities in support thereof
                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION OF DAVID OWEN IN SUPPORT
                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ON THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Third Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                              of cmc
                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                of the hearing on WMC MORTGAGE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO PLFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEMURRER & MOT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                          PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                            PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                and demurrer to Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                    PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                      TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/10/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                    OF HRG ON DEMURRER & DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                      TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; DECLARATION OF CHARLES O. AGEGE IN SUPPORT THE
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                            TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                              TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; MEMO. OF POINTS AND AUTH. IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO MTN TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      plff's opposition to mtn to expunge lis pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PORTIONS OF THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFTS; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF HRG ON MTN TO STRKE OF DEFTS LITTON LOAN SERVICING LP & THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PORTIONS OF THE COMPLT; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Notice of Pendency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO CONSOLIDATE UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION WITH PENDING UNLIMITED SUPERIOR COURT ACTION FOR FRAUD, QIET TITLE & TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES & DECL. OF J.D. WILSON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?