Porsche Financial Services,inc. Vs. Sam Hakim Et. Al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC102337

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 11, 2017 at 1:57 AM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Cheong Denove Rowell and Bennett

v.
No Logo Citi Real Estate, Defendant
No Logo Hakim Sam, Defendant
Type Civil (General Jurisdiction)
Status Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. 07/30/2009
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Acknow of Satisfaction of Judgment
    Blank 14 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 13 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Abstract of Judgment issued
      RETURNED BY BUCKSLIP ON 8/12/09.
        Blank 12 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Statement of Case
        IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE DUBOIS;
          Blank 11 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Declaration
          OF THOMAS H. HUTCHINSON AND ORDER REQUESTING COPY BE USED AS ORIGINAL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1806
            Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Request For Dismissal
            AS TO DOES 1-20
              Blank 9 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Declaration
              OF STEPHANIE DUBOIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE UP
                Blank 8 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Request for Entry of Default
                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 judgment
                  BY DEFAULT BY COURT
                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Request for Entry of Default
                    Sam Hakim, an individual
                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Partial Dismissal
                      w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT, CITI REAL ESTATE, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN ONLY
                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Request for Entry of Default
                        SAM HAKIM ,an individual #1b (name of plaintff) does not conform to the S&C
                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Statement-Case Management
                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Proof of Service of Summons
                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009 Complaint filed

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 444 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?