Justin Gierke v. Codilis & Associates, P.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 16-2051

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 2:46 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Justin Gierke. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-2052 16-1668 [3] [6749799] [16-2051] (Edelman, Daniel)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
    ORDER: re: Plaintiffs-appellants' motion to consolidate related appeals, filed on May 10, 2016, in Appeal No. 16-1668. [6749352-2] The motion is GRANTED, and these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiffs-appellants shall file a single, consolidated brief and required short appendix on or before June 15, 2016. The defendants-appellees shall file a single, consolidated brief on or before July 15, 2016. The plaintiffs-appellants shall file a single, consolidated reply brief, if any, on or before July 29, 2016. DW [2] [6749583] [16-1668, 16-2051, 16-2052] (CAG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
      Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Justin Gierke by 05/12/2016. Transcript information sheet due by 05/20/2016. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/15/2016 for Justin Gierke. [1] [6748618] [16-2051] (AP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 67 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?