Hiroshi Horiike Vs. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC110477

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 11, 2017 at 7:01 PM ST (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Horiike, Hiroshi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor N. Pippins
v.
No Logo Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Cortazzo Chris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
Type Civil (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 153 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 stipulation
Stipulation to Exonerate the Appellate Bond; Order thereon
    Blank 152 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Memorandum Of Costs
    MEMO OF COSTS ON APPEAL ($16,664.15
      Blank 151 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Stipulation and Order
      STIPULATION RE: AMENDED MEMO OF COSTS ON APPEAL; ORDER THEREON
        Blank 150 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Notice
        OF MOTION OFF CALENDAR
          Blank 149 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Declaration
          OF STEPHANIE GOLDSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HIROSHI HORIIKE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDNTIAL BROKERAGE CO. AND CHRIS CORTAZZO'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX COSTS BILL
            Blank 148 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues
            MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
              Blank 147 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Notice of Lodging
              IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
                Blank 146 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Substitution of Attorney
                  Blank 145 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Notice of Lodging
                  IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
                    Blank 144 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                    IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADJUDICATION
                      Blank 143 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues
                      MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
                        Blank 142 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Substitution of Attorney
                          Blank 141 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Substitution of Attorney
                            Blank 140 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Motion
                            MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX COSTS BILL
                              Blank 139 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Remittitur Filed.
                              REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 2/2/17
                                Blank 138 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Notice
                                MEMORANDUM OF COST ON APPEAL FORWARDING TO THE APPEALS DEPT. AT THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE 111 NO. HILL STREET,RM-111-A LOS ANGELES,CAL.90012
                                  Blank 137 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Remittitur Filed.
                                  REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 2/2/17
                                    Blank 136 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Notice
                                    TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
                                      Blank 135 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Notice of Designation of Record
                                        Blank 134 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Notice
                                        NOTICE OF POSTING BOND
                                          Blank 133 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Notice
                                          OF ERRATA TO NOTICE OF APPEAL
                                            Blank 132 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Notice
                                            NTC TO ATTY RE NTC OF APPEAL
                                              Blank 131 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Abstract of Judgment issued
                                                Blank 130 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Notice of appeal
                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Notice
                                                  NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Stipulation and Order
                                                    STIP AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER
                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Opposition
                                                      TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Declaration
                                                        OF SEAN RILEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HIROSHI HORIIKE'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Memo points & authorities
                                                          IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HIROSHI HORIIKE'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Notice
                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Notice
                                                              OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL
                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Declaration
                                                                OF MARK GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS.
                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Declaration
                                                                  OF STEVEN CHRISTIANSON IN SUPPORT OF MEMEORANDUM OF COSTS.
                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                    TOTAL COSTS $99,812.01
                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 judgment
                                                                        reversed by remittitur filed 2-3-17
                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 reply
                                                                          IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT
                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: 10/25/2012 Objection
                                                                            TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER CORTAZZO AND COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY
                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                              JURY POLLING SHEET
                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                CIVIL DEPOSIT
                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Jury Question
                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Special Verdict.
                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                      STIPULATION RE: EXHIBITS
                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                        GIVEN AND REFUSED
                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Jury Question
                                                                                          2
                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                            STIOPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER (KIMBERLY WILDISH
                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 Brief
                                                                                              DEFT SUPP. TRIAL BRIEF RE: INABILITY TO RECOVER PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                                plf supplemental proposed special jury inst
                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Brief
                                                                                                  supplemental brief re: special jury inst
                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                    PLF OPP TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT
                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Motion for an Order
                                                                                                      DEFT MOTION TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF APPRAISER TORRES
                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Brief
                                                                                                        DEFTS' SUPPLEMENT TRIAL BRIEF
                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Motion for an Order
                                                                                                          deft's motion for nonsuit
                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Brief
                                                                                                            DEFTS' SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF
                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER
                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                                                PROPOSED LIST OF PRE-TRIAL CACI
                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                  OF PUBLIC RECORD INFORMATION
                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 List of Witnesses
                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED
                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                      OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS
                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF
                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                                                          REVISED LIST
                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                            REQUESTED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS FOR THE COURT TO ASK PROSPECTIVE JURORS
                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                              LIST OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                IDENTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY TO BE OFFERED IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY AT TRIAL
                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                  REVISED MAIN TRIAL BRIEF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANTS' MAIN TRIAL BRIEF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 List of Witnesses
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED JOINT
                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                          SURREPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #4 - TO EXCLUDE OTHER CORTAZZO LISTINGS; DECL OF SEAN RILEY
                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                              JOINT LIST OF STIPULATED FACTS
                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                  REQUESTED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS FOR THE COURT TO ASK PROSPECTIVE JURORS
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 reply
                                                                                                                                                    7) REPLIES TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                      PLF DESIGNATION OF DEPO. TRANSCRIPT
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                        PLF WRITTEN STATEMENT OF RELIEF CLAIMED
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                          PLF PROPOSED CACI JURY INST
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                            PLF LIST OF CAUSES OF ACTION
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 List of Witnesses
                                                                                                                                                              JOINT WITNESS LIST
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                LIST OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANTS' TRIAL DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                    PLF PROPOSED JURY INST
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT EXHIBIT LIST
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Statement of Case
                                                                                                                                                                        PARTIES' JOINT STATEMENT OF CASE
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                          PARTIES' AGREED UPON JURY INST
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                              IDENTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY TO BE OFFERED IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY AT TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #6 TO LIMIT ARGUMENT RE VICARIOUS LIABILITY
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RE FINANCIAL CONDITION; DECL OF AMIN AL-SARRAF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                    TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE OTHER CORTAZZO LISTINGS DECL OF AMIN AL-SARRAF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A CCP 651 JURY VIEW OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                          #5 TO EXCLUDE MEDIATION RELATED MATERIALS
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL DEPOSIT
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                              #2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RE FINANCIAL CONDITION
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                #4 TO EXCLUDE OTHER CORTAZZO LISTINGS
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR A CCP 651 JURY VIEW OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                    #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RE INSURANCE
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                      #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                        #6 TO LIMIT ARGUMENT RE VICARIOUS LIABILITY
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Ex-parte Request for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APP TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO EVIDENCE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF DIANNA L. SERIO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF SEAN RILEY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF CHIZUKO NAMBA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF HIROSHI HORIIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF TSUTOMU YOKOI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF NEIL GUNNY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF CHRIS CORTAZZO IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: 12/28/2011 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCT- ION OF DOCUMENTS; DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY JAMES BRODERICK AND THE SQUIRE, SANDERS & DEMPSEY FIRM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF MARK J. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY JAMES BRODERICK AND THE SQUIRE, SANDERS & DEMPSEY FIRM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Amended Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF MARK J. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Amended Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AND MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY JAMES BRODERICK AND THE SQUIRE, SANDERS & DEMPSEY FIRM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FURTHER PRODUCTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF MARK J. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY JAMES BRODERICK AND THE SQUIRE, SANDERS & DEMPSEY FIRM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY JAMES BRODERICK AND THE SQUIRE, SANDERS & DEMPSEY FIRM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF MARK J. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY AND CHRIS CORTAZZO'S AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO AMENDED ANSWER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER TO AMENDED ANSWER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNVERIFIED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DAVID W. MACEY TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESUBMISSION OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DAVID W. MACEY TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF CHRISTOPHER PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF RESUBMISSION OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DAVID W. MACEY TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY AND CHRIS CORTAZZO'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO ANSWER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 Notice Of Association Of Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR ADMISSION OF DAVID W. MACEY TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AND DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY AND CHRIS CORTAZZO'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?