Brooks, Lindsay v. Pickford Realty, Ltd; Prudential et al.,
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC114075

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 11, 2017 at 9:37 PM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brooks Lindsay N., Plaintiff

Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

No Logo Brooks Lindsey N., Plaintiff

Represented by Herzfeld & Rubin, PC

v.
No Logo Doug Sandler, Defendant

Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

No Logo Homervices Of America Inc., Defendant

Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

No Logo Midamerican Energy Holdings Company, Defendant

Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

No Logo Pickford Real Estate Inc. Dba Prudential, Defendant

Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

No Logo Pickford Services Company Inc., Defendant

Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

No Logo Sandler Doug, Defendant

Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Interested Party
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Fishman David J., Attorney-Defendant
No Logo Savitt Linda Johnson, Attorney-Defendant
No Logo Prudential California Realty, Defendant's DBA
No Logo Schaffer Edmund S. Esq., Mediator
No Logo Winterman Craig L., Attorney-Plaintiff
Type Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 08/22/2014
  Entries (152) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 152 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Declaration
OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
    Blank 151 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 reply
    IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE
      Blank 150 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Objection
      TO THE DECLARATION
        Blank 149 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Opposition
        TO SECOND MOTION TO ENFORCE
          Blank 148 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014 notice of motion
          AND MOTION TO ENFORCE THE ORAL SETTLEMENT
            Blank 147 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Opposition
            TO DEFTS EX PARTE APPLIC FOR ORDER ENFORCING SETTLEMENT
              Blank 146 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Ex-Parte Application
              FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING SETTLEMENT ENTERED INTO BY DEFENDANTS AND PLAINTIFF LINDSEY BROOKS
                Blank 145 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 stipulation
                FOR AN ORDER SEALING PORTIONS OF THE RECORD
                  Blank 144 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Order
                  RE SEALING PORTIONS OF THE RECORD
                    Blank 143 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Declaration
                    of Fishman, Savitt, Mosier, Sandler
                      Blank 142 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Motion
                      to Enforce Oral Settlement Agreement Entered into by Deft and Plaintiff per CCP 664.6
                        Blank 141 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Proof of Service
                        for Motion to Enforce and Supporting Documents
                          Blank 140 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Brief
                          LINDSEY BROOKS ON USE OF VIDEO OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY IN OPENING STATEMENT AND AT TRIAL
                            Blank 139 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
                            EILEEN LOWE, CSR 12303
                              Blank 138 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Objection
                              BY DEFENDANTS TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF KANDACE MURPHY
                                Blank 137 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Statement of Case
                                (JOINT
                                  Blank 136 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 witness list
                                  Joint (Amended
                                    Blank 135 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Stipulation Order
                                    RE JURY (CIVIL TRIALS
                                      Blank 134 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Objection
                                      TO TESTIMONY RE CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY COLDWELL BANKER
                                        Blank 133 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 witness list
                                        JOINT
                                          Blank 132 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
                                          DINA CURRADO, CSR 10908
                                            Blank 131 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                            IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #6
                                              Blank 130 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: 5/6/2014 Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory
                                              AGAINST JUDGE WILLIAM WILLET IN TORRANCE, DEPT. 11
                                                Blank 129 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: 5/6/2014 Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
                                                KAMYA WILSON CSR 6151
                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                  NO. 6 TO PRECLUDE FRANCINE B. KULICK PHD FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN IN SUPPORT THEROF
                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: 5/2/2014 Statement of Case
                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 jury instructions
                                                      AMENDED SPECIAL
                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 notice of motion
                                                        TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENA
                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 List of Witnesses
                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 jury instructions
                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Statement of Case
                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Exhibit
                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                  TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 2
                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                    TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 3
                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                      TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 4
                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                        TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 7
                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                          TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 8
                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                            TO TN IN LIMINE NO. 10
                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                              TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 11
                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 13
                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                  TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 15
                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                    TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 1
                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                      TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 2
                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                        TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 4
                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                          TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 5
                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                            IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Opposition
                                                                                              NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                  IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2
                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                    IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Opposition
                                                                                                        TO MOTION IN LIMINE 2-8, 10,11,13 -15
                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: 4/15/2014 Amended Notice
                                                                                                          TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE WITNESSES AND DOCS AT THE TIME OF TRIAL
                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: 4/15/2014 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                            TO NTC TP APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCS AT THE TIME OF TRIAL
                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                              #4-ALLEGED FACEBOOK OR OTHER SOCIAL MEDIA POSTING BY PLF; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF L. DEAN SMITH, JR; PROPOSED (ORDER
                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                #2-TO EXCLUDE PREVIOUS SEXUAL HARRASMENT CLAIMS MADE BY PLF; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN; ORDER
                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                  #1-EXCLUDE ANY REF ARGUMENT, OR EVIDENCE OF PLF'S SEXUAL CONDUCT OTHER THAN W/DEFT. DOUG SANDLER; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORIITES; DECL. OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN; PROPOSED ORDER
                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                      PLF, LINDSEY BROOKS' MTN LIMINE #5 TO EXCLUDE ANY REF, ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE CONCERNING NON-PARTY WITNESSES T. FORD'S ALLEGED INTERV & R. SMITH'S PRIOR ALCHOL-RELATED CRIM CONV; MEMO OF POINTS;DECLARAT
                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND/OR TESTIMONY RELATED TO PLTF'S PURPORTED EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OR EMOTIONSL DISTRESS DAMAGES; MEMO OF PTS AND AUTHOR. DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                          NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE LAY OPINIONS RE CAUSATION OF PLTF'S EMOTIONAL DISTRESS SYMPTOMS; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH.; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                            NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REQ. BUT NOT DISCLOSED DURING DICOVERY; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH.; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                              NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR REFERENCE TO AN ALLEGED AFFIAR IN 2002 BETWEEN DEFT. DOUG SANDLER AND N. LEWIS; MEMO OF PTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF GOSSIP AND RUMOURS REGARDING DEFT SANDLER'S REPUTATION WITH WOMEN; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH.; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                  NO. 12 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AN EMPLOYMENT RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN PLTF AND PRUDENTIAL; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH.; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                    NO. 13 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO THE REASONS FOR DEFT. SANDLER'S OFFICE TRANSFERS AT COLDWELL BANKERS' MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH.; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                      NO. 14 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND/OR EVIDENCE OFFERED BY WITNESSES REGARDING THEIR BELIEF OR LEGAL CONCLUSION THAT DEFT. ENGAGES IN HARRASSMENT OR FAILED TO TAKE REASONABLE STEPT TO PREVENT...
                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                        NO. 15 TO EXCLUDE "ME TOO" EVIDENCE; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                          OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND MOTN. IN LIMIN NOS.1-15
                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                            NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE REGARDING DEFTS' FINANCIAL CONDITION; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH. DECL OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                              NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED VIOLATIONS OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT OTHER THAN SEXUAL HARRASSMENT AND FAILURE TO TAKE REASONABLE STEPS TO PREVENT...
                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF PLTF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR REFERENCE TO A SINGLE RACIAL STATEMENT OR JOKE ATTRIBUTED TO DEFT. DOUG SANDLER; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                    NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LITIGATION OR CLAIMS PURPORTED DISCRIMINATION, HARRASSMENT OR RETALIATION BY NON-PARTIES AGAINST DEFENDANTS; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                      NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE PLTF'S ALLEGED LITIGATION-RELATED EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECL. OF DAVID J FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                        AND MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP 598 AND CC 3295 TO BIFURCATE TRIAL WITH RESPECT TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECL. OF DAVID J. FISHMAN
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Order: Case Management
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                            FOR ORD. TO CONT. TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                              CASE RELOCATION
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 Notice of Relocation
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Statement - General
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      continuing trial is signed by Judge Stone this date
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                        OF DEPO OF DEFT. DOUG SANDLER; REQ. FOR PROD OF DOCS AND TANGIBLE THINGS AT DEPO
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                          OF DEPO OF VICTORIA BOYNTON; REQ. FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                            WITHDRAL OF M/COMPEL
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                RE DISCOVERY MOTS.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                  IN SUPP OF M/COMPEL
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                    to m/quash
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      motion to compel resp special intg
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          M/COMPEL RESP REQ FOR PROD
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                            IN SUPP OF MOTION TO COMPEL
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                              David Fishman
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RE DEFTS' MOT. FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Tentative Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOT. FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF L.DEAN SMITH,JR. RE CHRONOLOGY OF SCHEDULING DEPOS OF WITS
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Statement - General
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                            David Fishman
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                m/judgment on pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  to decl of David Fishman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      use csr
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Statement - General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Statement - General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  David Fishman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    with Prejudice) (DOUG SANDLER ONLY AS TO THE SECOND, THIRD AND SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      with Prejudice) (AS TO PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC DBA PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY AND PICKFORD SERVICES COMPANY INC. ONLY AS TO THE THIRD AND SIXTH CAUSES OF ACTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Motion for an Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          with Prejudice) (as to Doe 3 Midamerican Energy Holdings Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            with Prejudice) (doe 2 is Homeservices of America Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Tentative Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE MOT. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEAN SMITH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: 10/11/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED RE PLFF'S EX PARTE APP AND DEFT'S EX PARTE APP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE EX PARTES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR ORD. TO CONT. TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR AN ORD. COMPELLING DEFTS TO PRODUCE PARTY-AFFILLIATED WITS AND DOCS AT DEPO; OR AN OST FOR NOTICED MOT. AND SPECIALLY SETTING A HRNG TO DETERMINE WHETHER PLFF IS ENTITLED TO SANC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    old atty: Robert Dolan new atty: Linda Miller Savitt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      old atty:Robert Dolan new atty: Linda Miller Savitt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Motion for an Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            doe 2 is Homeservices of America Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              doe 3 Midamerican Energy Holdings Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC DBA PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TO EX PARTE APP TO COMPEL DEPO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RE PLFF'S EX PARTE TO COMPEL DEPO OF NON-PARTY WITNESS SHERRY BORKGREN IS SIGNED BY JUDGE STONE THIS DATE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Request for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REJECTED. Pickford Services Company Inc. SECTION 5 NEEDS INCOMPLETE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR AN ORD. COMPELLING DEPO OF NON-PARTY WITNESS, SHERRY BORKGREN TO APPEAR ON AGREED UPON 9/10/12 OR TO ANOTHER DATE BEFORE 9/12/12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            1st Statement of Agreement/Non- Agreement. Mediation not held (parties choose private mediation).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Notice Assign.-Med Hrg Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Order: Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF CMC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          by Pickford Real Estate dba Prudential California Realty
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?