Wilshire Rodeo Co. Vs. Ivari International,inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC118266

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 12, 2017 at 12:41 AM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wilshire Rodeo Co., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lubetzky Richard.
v.
No Logo Ivari International, Inc., Defendant
Type Civil (General Jurisdiction)
Status Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. 10/03/2012
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Acknow of Satisfaction of Judgment
FULL
    Blank 7 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 judgment
    is Modified and signed by: ALLAN GOODMAN, JUDGE
      Blank 6 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Affidavit in Lieu of Testimony
        Blank 5 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Request for Entry of Default
        DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT IVARI INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
          Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
          UNLAWFUL DETAINER
            Blank 3 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Request for Entry of Default
            SEE REJECTION NOTICE DATED 9/11/12 ENVELOPE SUBMITTED NOT SUFFICIENT PLAINTIFF TELEPHONICALLY NOTIFIED
              Blank 2 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Partial Dismissal
              w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLEASE DISMISS DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY
                Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Complaint filed

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 28 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?