Jctla Investment Corp. v. Richard Roth, Et. Al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC118546

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 12, 2017 at 12:53 AM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jctla Investment Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Saltzman Mark E..
v.
No Logo Roth, Richard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glickman Steven C.
No Logo Roth Veronica, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glickman Steven C.
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Glass Ginger, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
Type Civil (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 04/06/2015
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Request For Dismissal
W/PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION **X-COMP SIGNED OFF**
    Blank 28 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice-Case Reassignment and Order
      Blank 27 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Notice-Settlement
        Blank 26 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Ex-Parte Application
        TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC
          Blank 25 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Notice of change of address
            Blank 24 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Notice Of Ruling
              Blank 23 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Statement-Case Management
                Blank 22 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Statement-Case Management
                  Blank 21 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Statement-Case Management
                    Blank 20 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Answer to Second Amended X-Comp
                    OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS RICHARD ROTH AND VERONICA ROTH
                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Notice
                      OF RULING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT;
                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 General Denial To Cross-complaint
                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Objection
                          TO NOTICE OF RULING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Second Amended Cross-complaint
                            NO SUMMONS ISSUED
                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Reply to Opposition
                              TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT;
                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Opposition
                                TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Motion to strike
                                  PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Notice
                                        NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON DEMURRER CROSS-COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: 10/29/2012 First Amended Cross Complaint
                                          SUMMONS ISSUED
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: 10/29/2012 Summons Filed
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Demurrer
                                              TO CROSS-COMPLAINT "FAX FILED"
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Notice
                                                NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Answer
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Cross-complaint filed
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Summons Filed
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Complaint

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?