Nguyen v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-02589
Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 15, 2017 at 5:26 PM ST (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elisa J. Stewart +1 415 593 0083 +1 415 520 0920 Elisajstewart@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Ellen Musell +1 415 593 0083 +1 415 520 0920 wmusell@stewartandmusell.com
v.
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Paul Ceballo +1 415 554 3911 +1 415 554 3837 brian.ceballo@sfgov.org
No Logo Flint T. Paul, Defendant
No Logo Im, Defendant
No Logo Lt. IM, Defendant
No Logo Morales, Defendant
No Logo Officer Dudley, Defendant
No Logo Officer Galligan, Defendant
No Logo Officer Gilman, Defendant
No Logo Officer Shih, Defendant
No Logo Officer Dudley, Defendant
No Logo Officer Galligan, Defendant
No Logo Officer Gilman, Defendant
No Logo Officer Morales, Defendant
No Logo Sgt. Flint T. Paul, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCity and County of San Francisco. (Ceballo, Brian) (Filed on 6/21/2016) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Nguyen re 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued, 2 Summons Returned Unexecuted of Summons and Complaint. City and County of San Francisco served on 5/31/2016, answer due 6/21/2016. (Musell, Wendy) (Filed on 6/16/2016) Modified on 6/17/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tony Nguyen.. (Musell, Wendy) (Filed on 5/31/2016) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                                  Summons Issued as to City and County of San Francisco, Dudley, Galligan, Gilman, Im, Morales, Flint T. Paul, Shih. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                                    Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 5/27/2016. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                        Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tony Nguyen as to All Defendants. (Musell, Wendy) (Filed on 5/13/2016) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10448382.). Filed byTony Nguyen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Musell, Wendy) (Filed on 5/13/2016) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?