Daniel Saffron Vs. Alan Saffron
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC121318

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2017 at 6:57 PM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Saffron Daniel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis Michael R.
v.
No Logo Saffron Alan, Defendant

Represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, LLC

Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 12/02/2014
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Proof of Service
    Blank 15 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Request For Entry Of Dismissal
    AS TO THE COMPLAINT
      Blank 14 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Exhibit
        Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 List of Witnesses
          Blank 12 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Statement of Case
          TO BE READ TO THE JURORS
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Proof-Service/Summons
              Blank 10 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Substitution of Attorney
                Blank 9 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Notice
                OF REJECTION OF REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ANSWERED FILED 12/20/13
                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Proof of Service
                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Statement-Case Management
                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Request for Entry of Default
                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Statement-Case Management
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Notice
                            NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Answer
                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Complaint filed

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?