Wilshire Rodeo Co. Vs. Ivari International,inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC122098

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2017 at 7:32 PM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wilshire Rodeo Co., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lubetzky Richard.
v.
No Logo Ivari International, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Movaghar & Yamin PLC

Type UD/Commercial (not Drugs/Evict) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Default Judgment after Prove-up 03/28/2014
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 Filed Writ of Exec
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED
    Blank 13 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Acknow of Satisfaction of Judgment
      Blank 12 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Writ Issued
      writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles and mailed in sase
        Blank 11 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Notice of Entry of Judgment
          Blank 10 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014 judgment
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014 List of Exhibits
              Blank 8 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Answer Unlawful Detainer
                Blank 7 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Notice Of Ruling
                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Opposition
                  TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF ANSWER
                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Motion for an Order
                    TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Request for Trial Setting
                      REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL "UNLAWFUL DETAINER"
                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Proof-Service/Summons
                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Answer Unlawful Detainer
                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Complaint filed

                              Space Space

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 34 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?