California United Bank v. Christine E. Holifield, et al.,
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC123619

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2017 at 8:40 PM EST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo California United Bank, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sohi Pooya
v.
No Logo Elite Aviation, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mahn Law Group
No Logo Holifield Christine E., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mahn Law Group
No Logo New Co Aviation Llc, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mahn Law Group
Type Mortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Binding Arbitration 06/16/2015
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Notice of change of address
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 10 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Statement-Case Management
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 9 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Statement-Case Management
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 8 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Statement-Case Management
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Declaration
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 6 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Declaration
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 5 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Demurrer
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Motion to strike
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Proof-Service/Summons
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Summons Filed
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Complaint filed
                        Request RequestSpace

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?