David S. Karton, et al., v. Ari Design & Construction, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC125392

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2017 at 9:56 PM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Karton Cherly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abramson Joye R..
No Logo Karton David S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abramson Joye R..
v.
No Logo Ari Design & Construction Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausman & Sosa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beitchman David P.. -bc445154
No Logo Guttman Jonathan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausman & Sosa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beitchman David P.. -bc445154
No Logo Messika Ilan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausman & Sosa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beitchman David P.. -bc445154
No Logo Toledano Shahar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausman & Sosa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beitchman David P.. -bc445154
No Logo Wesco Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausman & Sosa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beitchman David P.. -bc445154
No Logo Guttman Yoni, Defendant's AKA
No Logo Hon. James A. Steele (ret.), Referee
Type Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 66 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Notice Of Ruling
    Blank 65 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Ex-Parte Application
    TO CONTINUE TRIAL
      Blank 64 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Declaration
      OF SHANI KOCHAV IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
        Blank 63 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Opposition
        TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
          Blank 62 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 Exhibit
            Blank 61 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 List of Witnesses
              Blank 60 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Report of Referee
              re: deposition and allocation of discovery referee fees
                Blank 59 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Stip & Order-use CSR
                REYNA OTA CSR#13934
                  Blank 58 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 reply
                  TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION
                    Blank 57 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Ex-Parte Application
                    TO ADVANCE HEARING AND SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALTERNATE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                      Blank 56 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Opposition
                      TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
                        Blank 55 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Declaration
                        OF SHANI KOCHAV IN SUUPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING AND SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALT TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                          Blank 54 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Opposition
                          PLTFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING ON THEIR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR POSTPONING THE TRIAL
                            Blank 53 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Request For Judicial Notice
                              Blank 52 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Miscellaneous-Other
                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF DISCOVERY REFEREE HON. STEELE (RET) RE PLTFS EX PARTE APPLICATION -DEFT'S PMK DEPOSITIONS
                                Blank 51 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 notice of motion
                                AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
                                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Report of Referee
                                  RE: PLAINTIFFS' LETTER MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, MONETARY SANCTIONS AND REALLOCATION OF
                                    Blank 49 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Notice
                                    NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF JOE R. ABRAMSON ATTY FOR PLTFS FROM 5-1-17 - 5-17-17
                                      Blank 48 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Report of RefereeCourt Filing
                                      signed by Judge Newman on 8/10/17
                                        Blank 47 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Notice
                                        NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
                                          Blank 46 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Ex-Parte Application
                                          for order pursuant to stipulation
                                            Blank 45 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Order
                                            appointing referee
                                              Blank 44 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Notice Of Ruling
                                                Blank 43 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Notice Of Ruling
                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                  STATEMENT BY DEFENDANTS
                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Reply to Opposition
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Points and Authorities
                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Notice
                                                        OF ERRATA RE: JOINT STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY
                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                          JOINT STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                            JOINT STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY
                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Ex-Parte Application
                                                              FOR FOLLOWING ORDERS (1) DETERMINING THAT DEFENDANTS ARE BOUND BY THEIR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER TO INTERROGATORY 324.1 ETC.
                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Notice
                                                                RE: ADVANCED HEARING DATE ON DEFTS' MTN TO QUASH
                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Order
                                                                  UPON INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FORM INTERROGATORY 324.1 TO DEFENDANT ARI DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC.
                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Motion to compel
                                                                    TO PROVIDE FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO SUBPARTS (a) AND (c) OF FORM INTERROGATORIES
                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                      FOR THE FOLLOWING ORDERS (1) ADVANCING AND SPECIALLY SETTING FOR HEARING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT ARI DESIGN ETC.
                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Points and Authorities
                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                          SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES
                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Declaration
                                                                            OF JOE R. ABRAMSON
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 motion to quash
                                                                              PLTF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS/CONSUMER RECORDS;
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Declaration
                                                                                OF SHANI KOCHAV IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPSOITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS
                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                      W/O PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON MARCH 14, 2016
                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: 6/13/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: 6/13/2016 Notice of change of address
                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Default Entered
                                                                                            AS TO: SHAHAR TOLEDANO, AN INDIVIDUAL - ENTERED;
                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Request for Entry of Default
                                                                                              AS TO: ARI DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CORPORATION - RECEIVED;
                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Default Entered
                                                                                                  AS TO: ARI DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CORPORATION - ENTERED;
                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Request for Entry of Default
                                                                                                    AS TO: SHAHAR TOLEDANO AN INDIVIDUAL - RECEIVED;
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 Notice
                                                                                                              OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 Answer
                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Declaration
                                                                                                                    OF SHANI KOCHAV
                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                      ON PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Affidavit - misc
                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Cross-complaint filed
                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Complaint filed
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Complaint

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 368 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?