Harris v. Jacobs Marsh
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-1230

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 7:37 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Erica L. Harris, FILED. Service date 05/06/2016 by CM/ECF.[1766872] [16-1230] [Entered: 05/06/2016 03:56 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
    ORDER, dated 05/05/2016, dismissing appeal by 5/19/2016, unless Appellant Erica L. Harris, submits form C and D, FILED.[1765900] [16-1230] [Entered: 05/05/2016 03:41 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, acknowledgment and notice of appearance, [7], on behalf of Appellant Erica L. Harris, FILED.[1765887] [16-1230] [Entered: 05/05/2016 03:34 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
        DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/18/2016, RECEIVED.[1755894] [16-1230] [Entered: 04/21/2016 04:45 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Erica L. Harris, FILED. [1755891] [16-1230] [Entered: 04/21/2016 04:42 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 75 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?