Blum v. Duran
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00966

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:45 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Edward Blum, Plaintiff

Represented by P.O. Box 1829

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Blum +1 623 815 5350

Represented by Porter Law Center Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernald C Porter +1 480 289 9630 +1 480 275 5626 bern@porterlawcenter.com
No Logo Nancy Blum, Plaintiff

Represented by P.O. Box 1829

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Blum +1 623 815 5350

Represented by Porter Law Center Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernald C Porter +1 480 289 9630 +1 480 275 5626 bern@porterlawcenter.com
v.
No Logo California Emergency Physicians, Defendant
No Logo Gary Sollars, Defendant
No Logo Medamerica Mutual Risk Retention Group, Defendant
No Logo Medical Protective Company, Defendant

Represented by BROENING OBERG WOODS & WILSON PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine MacRae Corcoran +1 602 271 7753 +1 602 258 1458 kmc@bowwlaw.com

Represented by Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Broening +1 602 271 7700 +1 602 258 1458 jrb@bowwlaw.com
No Logo Medical Protective Insurance, Defendant
No Logo Samuel Duran, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Broening +1 602 271 7700 +1 602 258 1458 jrb@bowwlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine MacRae Corcoran +1 602 271 7753 +1 602 258 1458 kmc@bowwlaw.com
No Logo Sara Shimmin, Defendant
No Logo Scott L Dalton, Defendant

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/22/2015 Susan Irene McLellan +1 602 200 1292 +1 600 230 8985 smclellan@soarizonalaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
  Entries (98) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to 97 Stipulation to Dismiss, IT IS ORDERED dismissing this matter with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/21/15. (KGM) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE to Motion re: 95 MOTION to Compel MedPro Insurance to tender funds as agreed MOTION to hold MedPro in contempt for breach of contract filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION to Compel MedPro Insurance to tender funds as agreed or MOTION to hold MedPro in contempt for breach of contract by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (EJA) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference held on 10/6/2015. The Court is advised that the parties have reached a settlement and the terms of the settlement are placed on the record. IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed without prejudice on 11/30/2015, unless a Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice is filed prior to that date. FURTHER ORDERED vacating all pending hearings and denying all motions as moot. The Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on 11/30/2015, without further leave of Court. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Pro Se Plaintiffs Edward and Nancy Blum. Telephonic appearance by Katherine Corcoran for Defendant Samuel Duran Jr. (Court Reporter David German.) Hearing held 10:07 AM to 10:13 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE to Motion re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2015. Hearing is rescheduled to allow counsel for defendant an opportunity to discuss possible settlement with her client. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Pro Se Plaintiffs Edward and Nancy Blum. Telephonic appearance by Katherine Corcoran for Defendant Samuel Duran Jr. Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. (Court Reporter David German.) Hearing held 4:01 PM to 4:15 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE in Opposition re: 89 MOTION to Expedite Trial Scheduling Conference and Ruling on Plaintiff's Pending Pleadings Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Trial Scheduling Conf and Request for Expedited Ruling on Plaintiffs Pending Pleadings filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Expedite the Trial Scheduling Conference and Ruling on Plaintiff's Pending Pleadings by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (EJA) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re: 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re: 84 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Dr Amradeep Sodhi re Causation filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE to Motion re: 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (KMG) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE to Motion re: 84 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Dr Amradeep Sodhi re Causation filed by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (KMG) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Dr Amradeep Sodhi re Causation by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STATEMENT OF FACTS by Defendant Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (KMG) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A Buttrick: Settlement Conference held on 8/12/2015. No settlement reached. APPEARANCES: Plaintiffs Edward Blum and Nancy Blum, appearing pro se. Kate Corcoran for Defendant Dr. Samuel Duran Jr. Hearing held 9:30 AM to 12:15 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MJF) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 8/12/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John A Buttrick. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Buttrick on 6/25/15. (MAP) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Susan Irene McLellan, counsel for Defendant Scott L Dalton. (McLellan, Susan) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER pursuant to the parties' 72 Stipulation to Request Appointment of Magistrate Judge for Purposes of Settlement Conference: IT IS ORDERED that a Magistrate Judge is appointed to hold a settlement conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Magistrate Judge John A. Buttrick is drawn for purposes of conducting a Settlement Conference no later than 9/1/2015. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Buttrick's chambers by email at buttrick_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov to schedule a Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/10/2015. (MMO) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      STIPULATION re: 68 Scheduling Order by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/18/2015. Dispositive motions due by 9/1/2015. Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2015 at 04:00 PM before Judge Douglas L Rayes [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/11/15. (MAW) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/10/2015 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter David German) Hearing held 3:59 PM to 4:16 PM.(MAW) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Representation by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (7 pages) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting Mr. Porter's 59 MOTION and allowing him to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs, effective immediately. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/26/15. (LAD) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2015. After hearing from Mr. Porter and his clients, IT IS ORDERED granting counsel's 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney subject to review of the fee agreement as it pertains to expert costs. Mr. Porter is directed to submit a proposed form of order along with the fee agreement to the Court. Mr. and Mrs. Blum shall have 45 days to retain new counsel. The Status Conference is reset. If new counsel is retained, counsel shall appear (telephonically) at the status conference at which time case deadlines will be discussed. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Bernald Porter for Plaintiffs with Edward Blum and Nancy Blum personally appearing. Telephonic appearance by Katherine Corcoran for Defendant Samuel Duran Jr. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/10/2015 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. (Court Reporter David German.) Hearing held 8:58 AM to 9:12 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE re: 62 Order for Hearing by Plaintiffs Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (REW) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 60 Motion for a Status Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference and oral argument on the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. 59 ) on 1/21/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The hearing shall be set for 30 minutes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Porter shall notify his clients of the hearing and that Plaintiffs may appear at the hearing, if they so choose. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/5/2015. (MMO) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Letter from Nancy Blum to Judge Rayes regarding Attorney Bernald C. Porter. (LAD) (5 pages, filed as pro se) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              * MOTION (REQUEST) for Status Conference by Defendant Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 12/30/2014 (LAD). (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                * MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (Porter, Bernald) * Modified to remove ex parte designation on 12/29/2014 (LAD). (Entered: 12/26/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Minute Order: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This matter is reassigned to Judge Douglas L Rayes for all further proceedings. All documents filed in this action should bear the initials DLR as part of the complete case number (see revised case number above). All pending deadlines and hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Samuel Duran, Jr.(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        * Attorney's Certificate Regarding Need for Expert Testimony filed by Nancy Blum, Edward Blum.(Porter, Bernald) * Modified to correct event and to remove text regarding "against All Plaintiffs" on 5/28/2014 (LAD). (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          * THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Samuel Duran Jr., DDS filed by Nancy Blum, Edward Blum.(Porter, Bernald) * Modified to change text from "against All Plaintiffs" to "against Defendant Samuel Duran, Jr., DDS" on 5/28/2014 (LAD). (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Bernald C Porter on behalf of Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (Porter, Bernald) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/17/2014, before Judge Snow. Court Reporter Gary Moll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (VPB) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/16/2015. Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2015. (See attached order for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/25/2014. (KFZ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2014. Deadlines discussed and entered. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Bernald C. Porter for Plaintiffs Edward Blum and Nancy Blum, who are also present. Katherine Corcoran for Defendant. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 2:37 PM to 2:49 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Edward Blum for proceedings held on 3/17/2014, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge. (VPB) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE to the Court by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        REPLY re: 43 Answer to Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Samuel Duran, Jr.(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER - Scheduling Conference is set for 4/25/2014 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/20/2014. (KFZ) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Doc. 34 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Doc. 37 ) is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/20/2014.(KMG) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/17/2014. Samuel Duran, Jr. is sworn, testifies and excused. The Court finds that jurisdiction in the District of Arizona is appropriate. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Edward Blum, Pro Se Plaintiff on his own behalf. Katherine Corcoran for Defendant. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 2:15 PM to 2:44 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER - Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/17/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/27/14. (LAD) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re: 37 MOTION to Compel Defense Counsel to abide by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gail L Toloumu)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to "Compel Defense Counsel to abide by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure" by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LSP) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (8 pages) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re Second Amended Complaint upon Samuel Duran Jr. on 1/6/14. (LAD) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default (Doc. 29 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to set aside the entry of default. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 31 ) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on its own motion, the Court reaffirms its authorization for the Plaintiff to accomplish service by publication pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e)(1) and grants to Plaintiffs sixty (60) additional days from the date of this Order in which to appropriately accomplish such service by publication. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/16/2013.(KMG) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Default Judgment as to Samuel Duran, Jr by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LFIG) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LFIG) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Set Aside Default by Samuel Duran, Jr. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              SET ASIDE by doc.# 32 ...Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Samuel Duran, Jr (REW) Modified on 12/16/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Service by Publication, last date of publication: 11/8/13 and APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Edward Blum, Nancy Blum against Samuel Duran Jr, DDS. (REW) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Bench Trial, (Doc. 21 ), is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed with Trial in Absentia, or in the Alternative Allow Constructive Service by Publication on Defendant Duran, (Doc. 22 ), is denied as to the request to proceed without Dr. Duran, and granted as to allowing service by publication under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e)(1) and Ariz. R. Civ. P. 4.2(f). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have an additional 60 days from the date of this Order in which to accomplish service upon Defendant Samuel Duran, Jr. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/2/13. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Pro-Se Non-Prisoner Parties form) (LAD) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Medical Protective Company's Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 15 ), is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Defendant Medical Protection Company from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant Medical Protection Company's Motion to Stay Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Until Deadline for Filing Second Amended Complaint, (Doc. 18 ), is granted. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/2/13. (LAD) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      * RESPONSE to Motion re 22 MOTION to Proceed With Trial in Absentia or in the Alternative Allow Constructive Service by Publication on Defendant Duran filed by Medical Protective Company. (Corcoran, Katherine) * Modified to correct filer from Samuel Duran Jr. to Medical Protective Company on 9/26/2013 (LAD). (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        * RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION for Bench Trial filed by Medical Protective Company (Corcoran, Katherine) * Modified to correct filer on 9/26/2013 (LAD). (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Proceed With Trial in Absentia or in the Alternative Allow Constructive Service by Publication on Defendant Duran by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (29 pages) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Bench Trial by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samuel Duran, Jr, Medical Protective Company, filed by Nancy Blum, Edward Blum. (LAD) (14 pages) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                * REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Medical Protective Company. (Corcoran, Katherine) * Modified to correct document linkage on 7/24/2013 (LAD). (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 17 Response in Opposition to Motion by Medical Protective Company. (Corcoran, Katherine) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/Opposition to 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (5 pages) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 14 MOTION for Enlargement of Time. 1. Plaintiffs must file their Second Amended Complaint with the Court within (14) fourteen days of the date of this Order. 2. Plaintiffs shall have 60 days from the date of this Order to serve the Second Amended Complaint upon Defendants. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/12/13. (LAD) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        * MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Medical Protective Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Corcoran, Katherine)* Modified to correct event on 7/9/2013 (LAD). (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time (for Service Upon Samuel Duran Jr., DDS) by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (4 pages) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant's Motion to Quash and Objections to Plaintiffs' Subpoena (Doc. 6 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Civil Complaint (Doc. 9 ). Plaintiffs are directed to file and serve the amended complaint on all parties under Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED finding the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 11 ) moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/25/13. (LAD) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              SERVICE EXECUTED: Return of Service re Summons, 2nd Amended Complaint, Certificate of Service upon Medical Protective Company on 6/17/13. (LAD) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants Scott L. Dalton, DDS (DBA Sunwest Dental Centers), Sara Shimmin, MD, Gary Sollars, MD, Medamerica Mutual Risk Retention Group and California Emergency Physicians by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  * LODGED Proposed Second Amended Complaint re: 9 MOTION to Amend 8 Amended Complaint by Edward Blum and Nancy Blum. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. (LAD) (14 pages) * Modified to add page count on 6/3/2013 (LAD). (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend Civil Complaint (re 8 Amended Complaint) by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum. (LAD) (4 pages) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      * AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Emergency Physicians, Scott L Dalton, Samuel Duran, Jr., Medamerica Mutual Risk Retention Group, Medical Protective Company, Sara Shimmin, Gary Sollars, filed by Nancy Blum, Edward Blum; terminating Medical Protective Insurance.(LAD) (23 pages) * Modified to add one defendant and terminate another defendant on 5/28/2013 (LAD). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Service by Edward Blum, Nancy Blum re 5 Order. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Scott L Dalton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. Consequently, motions to dismiss must contain a certification of conferral or they are subject to be stricken on the Court's motion. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/20/2013. (LFIG) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER pursuant to the Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for Permission to Serve Out-of-State Defendants. Plaintiffs shall comply with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ.P. 4(c). ORDERED that to the extent Plaintiffs' desired method of service is inconsistent with this rule the motion is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/20/2013.(LFIG) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX13391. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-13-966-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MHU) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Permission To Serve Out-of-State Defendants by Way of Certified U.S. Mail by Edward Blum and Nancy Blum. (MHU) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX 13391, filed by Nancy Blum and Edward Blum. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MHU) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?