Jenkins v. Bair
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-20067-ASG
District Judge Alan S. Gold, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 9:22 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lindsay Jenkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindsay Jenkins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lindsay Jenkins +1 888 552 2194 +6963 696 696 3799
v.
No Logo Akerman Senterfitt LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Akerman Senterfitt"
No Logo Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Allen Matkins Leck"
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
No Logo Dune Capital Management LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot Pedrosa +1 305 579 0743 +5790 579 579 0717 pedrosae@gtlaw.com
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Deposit Insurance Corp."
No Logo Gamble Mallory & Natsis, Defendant
No Logo George Andrews, Defendant
No Logo IMB Management Holdings L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot Pedrosa +1 305 579 0743 +5790 579 579 0717 pedrosae@gtlaw.com
No Logo IndyMac Bank, Defendant
No Logo J.c. Flowers & Co. Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot Pedrosa +1 305 579 0743 +5790 579 579 0717 pedrosae@gtlaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Colbath, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Mahl +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5102 Jeffrey.Mahl@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Msd Capital, L.p., Defendant
Unknown Role, MSD Torchlight, L.P.
Unknown Role, Tyler Corp /new/
Unknown Role, Msd Sbi Lp
Unknown Role, IHOP CORP
Unknown Role, Dell, Michael S.
Unknown Role, I-many, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot Pedrosa +1 305 579 0743 +5790 579 579 0717 pedrosae@gtlaw.com
No Logo Office of Thrift Supervision, Defendant
No Logo Paulson & Co. Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Paulson, John
Unknown Role, Newdex, Inc.
Mallinckrodt PLC Unknown Role, Mallinckrodt PLC
Unknown Role, ESH Hospitality LLC
Unknown Role, NovaCopper Inc.
Unknown Role, Pawfect Foods Inc
Unknown Role, Domus Holdings Corp
No Logo Richard Landman, Defendant
No Logo Sheila Bair, Defendant
No Logo Silar MCG-I, LLC, Defendant
No Logo SSP Offshore, LLC, Defendant
Mnuchin, Steven Mnuchin, Steven, Defendant
Officially listed as "Steven Mnuchin"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot Pedrosa +1 305 579 0743 +5790 579 579 0717 pedrosae@gtlaw.com
No Logo Stone Point Capital Llc, Defendant
Unknown Role, Carey James D
Unknown Role, Trident VI, L.P.
Unknown Role, Trident FFP GP LLC
Unknown Role, Trident FFP LP
Unknown Role, Stone Point Gp Ltd.
Unknown Role, Trident VII, L.P.
Unknown Role, Zyskind Barry D
Citation no cause specified
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Office Miami
Filed 1/9/2009
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX DONT USE THIS CODE
Terminated 10/30/2009
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,EGT,STAYED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Omnibus ORDER DISMISSING CASE (09-20067), (09-20824), and (09-21482); (07-22463) Remains Closed. Case is closed. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 10/29/2009. (mg)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 OrderCourt Filing
    OMNIBUS ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE; CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 9/3/2009. (wc)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
      ORDER STAYING CASE.. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 2/18/2009. (ail)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: 2/12/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
        ORDER granting re [9] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to [1] Complaint Responses due by 3/12/2009. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 2/12/2009. (ail)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009, Terminated: 2/20/2009 Motion to Dismiss
          Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss [1] Complaint by Jeffrey Colbath. Responses due by 3/2/2009 (Mahl, Jeffrey)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSD Capital, LP. (Pedrosa, Eliot)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Corporate Disclosure Statement by J. C. Flowers & Co., LLC. (Pedrosa, Eliot)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMB Management Holdings L.P.. (Pedrosa, Eliot)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dune Capital Management, LP. (Pedrosa, Eliot)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009, Terminated: 2/12/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to [1] Complaint by IMB Management Holdings L.P., J. C. Flowers & Co., LLC, MSD Capital, LP, Dune Capital Management, LP, Steven Mnuchin. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Pedrosa, Eliot)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Order Reassigning/Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                      ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alan S. Gold for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno no longer assigned to case. (Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/6/2009) (Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 2/9/2009) (ra1)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eliot Pedrosa on behalf of IMB Management Holdings L.P., J. C. Flowers & Co., LLC, MSD Capital, LP, Dune Capital Management, LP, Steven Mnuchin (Pedrosa, Eliot)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [5] Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response to complaint due by 3/4/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/5/2009.(mmc)[This is a paperless order]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009, Terminated: 2/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [1] Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brochin, Robert)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Notice (Other)
                              NOTICE by IMB Management Holdings L.P., J. C. Flowers & Co., LLC, MSD Capital, LP, Dune Capital Management, LP, Steven Mnuchin of Lower-Numbered Related Action, Unopposed Request for Intra-District Transfer, and Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pedrosa, Eliot)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Summons Issued as to USA
                                Summons Issued as to Office Of Thrift Supervision,, Sheila Bair, Condoleezza Rice, Federal Deposit Insurance Corp., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lh)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Summons Issued
                                  Summons Issued as to George Andrews, Richard Landman, Akerman Senterfitt, IMB Management Holdings L.P., J. C. Flowers & Co., LLC, Paulson & Co. Inc., MSD Capital, LP, Stone Point Capital, LLC, SSP Offshore, LLC, Dune Capital Management, LP, Steven Mnuchin, Silar MCG-I, LLC, Jeffrey Colbath, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Allen Matkins Leck, Indymac Bank. (lh)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against all defendants; Filing fee $ 350.00. Receipt#: 725293, filed by Lindsay Jenkins.(lh)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?