City of New Bedford v. AVX Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-10242
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 5:28 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of New Bedford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke Hoffman Legere +1 617 338 6464 llegere@mcgregorlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregor I. McGregor +1 617 338 6464 gimcg@mcgregorlaw.com
No Logo City of New Bedford Harbor Development Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke Hoffman Legere +1 617 338 6464 llegere@mcgregorlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregor I. McGregor +1 617 338 6464 gimcg@mcgregorlaw.com
No Logo City of New Bedford Redevelopment Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke Hoffman Legere +1 617 338 6464 llegere@mcgregorlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregor I. McGregor +1 617 338 6464 gimcg@mcgregorlaw.com
No Logo Housing 70 Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke Hoffman Legere +1 617 338 6464 llegere@mcgregorlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregor I. McGregor +1 617 338 6464 gimcg@mcgregorlaw.com
v.
No Logo Avx Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cammpaign, Larry Walker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Slavitt +1 617 742 7300 +1 617 742 9969 evan.slavitt@avx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia M. Guizzetti +1 617 439 2491 +1 617 310 9491 cguizzetti@nutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re 37 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims and Settlement by AVX Corporation. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Memorandum & Order 33 dated August 27, 2015. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AVX Corporation. (Guizzetti, Cynthia) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Transcript of Motion to Dismiss Hearing held on April 8, 2015, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 5/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Main Document 30 replaced on 4/14/2015) (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2015 at Boston College Law School.re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AVX Corporation. After hearing from counsel, the Court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: McGregor, Legere for the plaintiff, Guizzetti and Ryan for the defendant) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 26 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                        REPLY to Response to 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Leave to File Granted on March 27, 2015 filed by AVX Corporation. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 24 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion to Dismiss ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 8 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 19 Opposition to Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2015 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will take place at Boston College Law School, 885 Centre Street, East Wing, Room 115, Newton, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                  First AFFIDAVIT of Gregor I. McGregor in Opposition re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of New Bedford, City of New Bedford Harbor Development Commission, City of New Bedford Redevelopment Authority, Housing 70 Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Legere, Luke) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                    First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of New Bedford, City of New Bedford Harbor Development Commission, City of New Bedford Redevelopment Authority, Housing 70 Corporation. (Legere, Luke) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                      First Opposition re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of New Bedford, City of New Bedford Harbor Development Commission, City of New Bedford Redevelopment Authority, Housing 70 Corporation. (Legere, Luke) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 3/9/2015. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                          First MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to March 9, 2015 to File Response/Reply to Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion to Dismiss filed by City of New Bedford, City of New Bedford Harbor Development Commission, City of New Bedford Redevelopment Authority, Housing 70 Corporation. (Legere, Luke) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to March 9, 2015 to File Response/Reply to Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by City of New Bedford, City of New Bedford Harbor Development Commission, City of New Bedford Redevelopment Authority, Housing 70 Corporation.(Legere, Luke) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Assented to Motion to Reassign Case to Judge William G. Young. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                  STATE COURT Record. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Slavitt on behalf of AVX Corporation (Slavitt, Evan) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Mary K. Ryan in Support re 9 Assented to MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge William G. Young filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 Assented to MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge William G. Young filed by AVX Corporation. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Assented to MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge William G. Young by AVX Corporation.(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Mary K. Ryan in Support re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AVX Corporation. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AVX Corporation.(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia M. Guizzetti on behalf of AVX Corporation (Guizzetti, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mary K. Ryan on behalf of AVX Corporation (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AVX Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5391772 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Local Category Sheet)(Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?