8x8, Inc. v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 16-1959

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 11:09 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
MOTION of Appellant 8x8, Inc. to extend the time to 08/04/2016 to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 06/16/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/02/2016 by email. [340473]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
    Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 06/02/2016 by email. [340419]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
      Docketing Statement for the Appellant 8x8, Inc.. Service: 06/02/2016 by email. [340263]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130787553 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
        Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant 8x8, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2016 by email. [335804]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130787171 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
          Certificate of Interest for the Appellant 8x8, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2016 by email. [335648]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
            Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant 8x8, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2016 by email. [336028]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
              Entry of appearance for Judith A. Hagley as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 05/13/2016 by email. [335043]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                Entry of appearance for Christopher G. Michel as of counsel for Appellant 8x8, Inc.. Service: 05/03/2016 by email. [331707]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                  Entry of appearance for H. Christopher Bartolomucci as principal counsel for Appellant 8x8, Inc.. Service: 05/03/2016 by email. [331705]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                    Appeal docketed. Received: 05/03/2016. [331544]Entry of Appearance due 05/17/2016. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/17/2016. Docketing Statement due 06/02/2016. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 07/05/2016.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 153 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?