Bowser, et al v. Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-01362
District Judge Sylvia H. Rambo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2017 at 11:55 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Billee Bowser, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris and Vedder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Krout +1 717 843 9815 +1 717 846 2813 mjkrout@morris-vedder.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde W Vedder +1 717 843 9815 +1 717 846 2813 cwvedder@morris-vedder.com
No Logo David S. Bowser, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris and Vedder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Krout +1 717 843 9815 +1 717 846 2813 mjkrout@morris-vedder.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde W Vedder +1 717 843 9815 +1 717 846 2813 cwvedder@morris-vedder.com
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/1990, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL P. FINEGAN +1 215 665 3166 +1 215 665 3165 daniel.finegan@obermayer.com
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump's Castle Associates Limited Partnership"

Toggle Switch Represented by Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL P. FINEGAN +1 215 665 3166 +1 215 665 3165 daniel.finegan@obermayer.com
Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc. Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL P. FINEGAN +1 215 665 3166 +1 215 665 3165 daniel.finegan@obermayer.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/6/1991, Entered: None
PRAECIPE/NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - filed by Atty. Krout marking this action settled and discontinued. (c/s) (am) (Entered: 09/12/1991)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/22/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER -by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo: 1) granting defts. motion to vacate/open the order of default entered by the Clerk on 6/5/91 [35-1]; 2) denying pltf's motion for default jgmt. [33-1] ([34-1] order default vacated) (cc: Ct; Vedder; Krout; Finegan & MD of Pa Judges. Orig. to Security ) (js) (Entered: 07/31/1991)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/22/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM -of Judge Sylvia H. Rambo: re: Defts' motion to vacate/open the order of default entered by the Clerk on 6/5/91 [35-1] and pltf's motion for default judgment [33-1]. (cc: Ct; Vedder; Krout & Finegan) (js) (Entered: 07/31/1991)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/17/1991, Entered: None
        Brief by plaintiff in opposition to motion to vacate/open the order of default entered by the Clerk on 6/5/91 [35-1] ; reply brief due 7/1/91 and C of S (ls) (Entered: 06/27/1991)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/11/1991, Entered: None
          MOTION by defendants Trump's Castle Hotel and Trump's Castle Associates Limited Partnership to vacate/open the order of default entered by the Clerk on 6/5/91 with cert of nonconc and c of s. (jc) (Entered: 06/17/1991)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/5/1991, Entered: None
            DEFAULT ENTERED by Clerk against defts. Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Cast. Assoc. (cc: Ct; Krourt & Finegan) (js) (Entered: 06/11/1991)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/4/1991, Entered: None
              MOTION by pltfs. for default judgment against Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Cast. Assoc. & for jury trial on the issue of damages . Affid. of Atty. Krout, Cert. of Non-Conc & Prop. Order attached. (js) (Entered: 06/11/1991)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/4/1991, Entered: None
                ANSWER by defts. Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Cast. Assoc. to the complaint. (c of s) (js) (Entered: 06/11/1991)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/4/1991, Entered: None
                  MOTION by pltfs. for the Clerk to enter default against Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Cast. Assoc. . Affidavit of Atty. Krout in support thereof attached. (c of s) (js) (Entered: 06/11/1991)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER - by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo. [19-2] 1. Defts.' mtn. to transfer venue is denied. [24-1] 2. The deadline for completion of disc. is ext'd to 6/28/91. 3. Dispositive mtns. & supporting briefs shall be filed no later than 7/31/91; 4. All mtns. in limine, if any, shall be filed no later than 9/19/91; 5. P.T. memo shall be filed on or before 9/26/91 in conformity w/the local rules; 6. The P.T.C. is sched. for 3:30 p.m. on 10/3/91 in chambers of Crtrm. #2; and 7. This case is added to the Oct. 1991 trial list. J/sel. for cases on the Oct. list will begin at 9:30 a.m. on Monday, 10/7/91. Trials will commence at 9:30 a.m. on Tues., 10/8/91 in Crtrm. #2, 9th Flr., Fed. Bldg., 3rd & Walnut Sts., Hbg., PA. A dt. certain for trial will be discussed at the P.T.C. (cc: Vedder, Krout, Finegan, Judges, Crt., Lois, Crt. Rptr. & TJM) (am) (Entered: 04/08/1991)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM - by Sylvia H. Rambo: re motion to transfer venue. [19-2] cc: Vedder, Krout, Finegan, Judges & Crt. (am) (Entered: 04/08/1991)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/7/1991, Entered: None
                        Brief by plaintiff David S. Bowser, plaintiff Billee Bowser in opposition to motion to withdraw portions of its' mtn. to dismiss for improper venue pur. FRCP 12(b)(3) as distinguished from seeking transfer [19-2]; reply brief due 3/20/91 & C of S. (gg) (Entered: 03/08/1991)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/1991, Entered: None
                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF - by defendants Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Castle Assoc. in sup. of the application of NJ Law per 2/25/91 order of crt. w/exhs. attached. (c/s) [26-1] (am) (Entered: 03/06/1991)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/25/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER - by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo. 1. Defts.' mtn. to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is deemed w/drawn; 2. On or before 2/28/91, defts. are directed to submit to the crt. a supplementary brief in sup. of the application of NJ law to this action; 3. Plfs. are allowed 7 days from the service of the supplementary brief w/in which to respond; 4. If defts. fail to submit the supplementary brief as directed, the crt. will deem the mtn. to transfer venue w/drawn; 5. On or before 3/15/91, defts. shall provide a responsse to plfs.' 7/30/90 interrogs.; 6. The sched. order, including the disc. deadline, is suspended; 7. The crt. will issue a new sched. order upon disposition of the plf.'s mtn. to transfer venue. (cc: Krout, Vedder, Crt. & Finegan) (am) (Entered: 03/06/1991)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: None
                              BRIEF - by plaintiffs David S. Bowser & Billee Bowser in support of its' motion to extend discovery which was previously sched. by crt. order on 8/21/90 to 2/28/91. (c/s) [24-1] (am) (Entered: 02/20/1991)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: None
                                MOTION - by plaintiffs David S. Bowser & Billee Bowser to extend discovery which was previously set by order of crt. filed 8/21/90. (c/s) (am) (Entered: 02/20/1991)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo motion to withdraw portions of its' mtn. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pur. to FRCP 12(b)(2) 2.) On or before Feb. 8, l99l, defts. are directed to submit to the Ct. a supplementary brief, in support of the application of New Jersey law to this action; 3.) Pltfs. are allowed 7 days from the service of the supplementary brief within which to respond; 4.) If defts. fail to submit the supplementary brief as directed, the court will deem the mtoion to transfer withdrawn. [19-1] (cc: Vedder, Krout, All Judges and Ct. 4 copies. (gg) (Entered: 01/31/1991)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/30/1991, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM - of Court (gg) (Entered: 01/31/1991)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/1991, Entered: None
                                      MOTION - by plaintiffs David S. Bowser & Billee Bowser to compel defts.' to serve upon plf. answers to interrogs. w/exhs. attached. (c/s) (am) (Entered: 01/24/1991)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/1991, Entered: None
                                        LETTER - to court from defendants Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Castle Association dtd. 1/11/91 re: w/drawal of portions of its mtn. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction & mtn. to dismiss for improper venue. (am) (Entered: 01/24/1991)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/14/1991, Entered: None
                                          MOTION - by defendants Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Castle Association to withdraw portions of its' mtn. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pur. to FRCP 12(b)(2) and to withdraw portions of its' mtn. to dismiss for improper venue pur. FRCP 12(b)(3) as distinguished from seeking transfer (c/s) (am) (Entered: 01/24/1991)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/26/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo that 1.) Defts. shall provide responses to pltfs' final set of interrogs on or before Jan l4, l99l; 2.) Pltfs. shall submit supplemental affidavits and materials on or before Janm. 29, l99l. 3) Failure of defts. to so respond by Jan l4, l99l shall result in the dismissal of defts' mtn. to dismiss pltfs' complt. for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue. (cc: Vedder, Finegan, and Ct. counsel) (gg) (Entered: 01/03/1991)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/1990, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by plaintiff David S. Bowser, plaintiff Billee Bowser to extend time to file supplemental affidavits and materials with cert. of non/conc. and C of S. (gg) (Entered: 01/03/1991)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/19/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo that 1.) Defts. shall provide answers to pltfs' First Set of Interrogs. on or before Dec. l2, l990. 2.) Pltfs. shall submit additional materials and affidavits to the Ct. on or before Dec. 24, 1990. 3.) Response materials shall be submitted pursuant to the local rules. & 4). The Ct. will not address pltfs' comment conclerning July 30, l990 interrogs. (cc: Vedder, Finegan, and Ct. (gg) (Entered: 11/20/1990)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/13/1990, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION - by plaintiffs Billee Bowser & David S. Bowser to compel answers to interrrogs. and to extend (enlarge) time to file supplemental affidavits w/prop. interrogs. attached as exhs. Cert. of non-conc. of defts. (c/s) (am) Modified on 11/16/1990 (Entered: 11/16/1990)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo 1) Donald J. Trump, individually, is dismissed from the action. The Clerk of Courts is directed to remove his name from the caption. 2) Ruling on motion to dismiss pltfs' complt. due to lack of jurisdiction and/or improper venue [5-1] is deferred to permit parties to conduct discovery on the jurisdiction issue. 3) Parties shall conduct discovery on the issue of general jurisdiction until 10/31/90. 4) Pltf shall submit additional materials and affidavits to the court on the jurisdiction issue on or before 11/12/90. 5) Defts shall provide responsive materials on or before 11/23/90. (cc: Vedder, Finegan, All Judges, Ct. & Mag. Smyser) (jc) (Entered: 10/11/1990)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM bu Judge Rambo re: defts have also petitioned for a change of venue under 28 USC 1404(a). The court will defer ruling on that mtn until pltfs have had the chance to conduct discovery on the limited issue of jurisdiction. An appropriate order will be issued. (cc: Vedder, Finegan, All Judges, Ct. & Mag. Smyser) (jc) (Entered: 10/11/1990)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/1990, Entered: None
                                                        BRIEF by plaintiff Billee Bowser, plaintiff David S. Bowser in opposition to motion to dismiss pltfs' complt. due to lack of jurisdiction and/or improper venue [5-1] ;reply brief due 9/10/90 & C of S. (gg) (Entered: 08/28/1990)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo Trial is placed on the 6/1/91 trial list beginning at 9:30; Jury selection will commence at 9:30 on 6/4/91; discovery shall be completed by 2/28/91; Pretrial conference will be held at 11:00 on 5/31/91 ; pretrial memorandum shall be filed on or before 5/24/91 (cc: Vedder, Finegan and Ct. (gg) (Entered: 08/22/1990)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/21/1990, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE SHEET - of Case Management Conf. Discover, Feb. 9l, Dispositive Mtns. March 9l; and Trial list June 9l. (gg) (Entered: 08/21/1990)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/13/1990, Entered: None
                                                              REQUEST of attorney for special admission to practice on behalf of Donald J. Trump, Trump's Castle Hotel, Trump's Cast. Assoc. approved by J. Rambo cc: Finegan and Scr. Registry (gg) (Entered: 08/13/1990)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/1990, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF NONCONCURRENCE filed by defendants Donald J. Trump, Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Castle Assoc. re: defts mtn to dismiss due to lack of jurisdiction and/or improper venue. (jc) (Entered: 08/13/1990)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/10/1990, Entered: None
                                                                  BRIEF - by defendants Trump's Castle Hotel & Trump's Castle Association in support of its' motion to dismiss plf.'s complt. for lack of jurisdiction pur. to FRCP 12(b)(2) [5-1] & to dismiss for improper venue pur. to FRCP 12(b) (3). (c/s) [5-2] (am) (Entered: 01/24/1991)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo Scheduling conf will be conducted 8:45 on 8/21/90 (cc: Vedder, Finigan & Ct. (gg) (Entered: 08/08/1990)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/1990, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION - of defts. Donald Trump & Trump's Castle & Casino, Inc. t/d/b/a Trump's Castle Associates Limited Partnership to dismiss plf.'s complt. for lack of jurisdiction pur. to FRCP 12(b)(2) and to dismiss for improper venue pur. to FRCP 12(b) (3) w/exhs. attached. Conc. or non-conc. unable to be sought by plf.'s counsel. (c/s) (am) Modified on 01/24/1991 (Entered: 01/24/1991)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/1990, Entered: None
                                                                        COUNTY COURT RECORD - received from the York County Ct. House consisting of Notice and Complt.; entry of appearance; and writ of summons. (gg) (Entered: 07/26/1990)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                                          DOCUMENT - of defts. requesting demand for J/T. (c/s) (jc) (Entered: 07/20/1990)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                                            ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - of Atty. Finegan o/b/o defendants Donald J. Trump, Trump's Castle Hotel, and Trump's Castle Associates Limited Partnership. (jc) (Entered: 07/20/1990)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                                              PETITION FOR REMOVAL - from York County Court of Common Pleas, Case Number: 90 SU 02117-01 w/copy of complt. attached. Jury trial demanded. N/C handed to counsel. Copy of docket sheet to J. Rambo and Terry. Receipt #: 106696 Amt: $120.00 (jc) (Entered: 07/20/1990)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?