Krey v. Brennan et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-03800
District Judge Deborah K. Chasanow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 1:26 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Karl Heinz Krey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Edward Carpenter +1 202 887 5445 +1 202 253 3596 jecindc1@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Edward Carpenter +1 202 887 5445 +1 202 253 3596 jecindc1@aol.com
v.
No Logo 6900 Wisconsin Ave LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger O Robertson +1 443 353 2301 +1 410 637 4704 RORobert@Travelers.com
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
No Logo WPC Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Joseph M Jagielski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger O Robertson +1 443 353 2301 +1 410 637 4704 RORobert@Travelers.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
SECOND AMENDED Scheduling Order: Status report due by June 22. If the parties elect to conduct further discovery, the parties will submit another status report and discovery will close on October 5 and the dispositive pretrial motions deadline is November 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/16/2016. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2016: # 1 Second Amended Scheduling Order) (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Karl Heinz Krey re 20 MOTION for Other Relief Seeking modification of scheduling order Proposed second amended scheduling order (Carpenter, John) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
      MOTION for Other Relief Seeking modification of scheduling order by Karl Heinz Krey Responses due by 5/31/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carpenter, John) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 18 consent motion to substitute the United States for Defendant Megan Brennan, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/13/2016. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION to Substitute Party by Megan Brennan Responses due by 4/29/2016 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            AMENDED Scheduling Order: Status report due by June 22. If the parties elect to conduct further discovery, the parties will submit another status report and discovery will close on September 21 and the dispositive pretrial motions deadline is October 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/11/2016. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None
              Status Report Submitted Joint by Megan Brennan (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and status report due by 8/8/2016; motions due by 9/6/2016. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/24/2016. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Megan Brennan.(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The government's response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due by March 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/25/2016. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Megan Brennan Responses due by 3/14/2016 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karl Heinz Krey. WPC Management LLC served on 12/29/2015, answer due 2/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 executed certified mail)(Carpenter, John) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                          QC NOTICE: 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by WPC Management LLC, 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by 6900 Wisconsin Ave LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please note for future filings of Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement all corporate affiliations and/or those with any financial interest should be entered when the system prompts you do to so.*** No further action is necessary for these filings. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None
                            Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by WPC Management LLC. (Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None
                              Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 6900 Wisconsin Ave LLC. (Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by 6900 Wisconsin Ave LLC, WPC Management LLC.(Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                  Summons Issued 60 days as to Megan Brennan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 AUSA Summons, # 2 Atty Gen. Summons)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                    Summons Issued 21 days as to 6900 Wisconsin Ave LLC, WPC Management LLC. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Karl Heinz Krey re 1 Complaint, summons to complaint (Carpenter, John) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Karl Heinz Krey re 1 Complaint, summons to complaint (Carpenter, John) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Karl Heinz Krey re 1 Complaint, summons to complaint (Carpenter, John) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                            VERIFIED COMPLAINT against 6900 Wisconsin Ave LLC, Megan Brennan, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service, WPC Management LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637026643.), filed by Karl Heinz Krey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 proposed summons)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?