RAAB v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:16-vv-00431

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 1:33 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KRISTINA RAAB, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark T. Sadaka, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ON BEHALF OF J.R., A MINOR MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Alexander MacLeod +1 202 616 4122 glenn.macleod@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct , filed by KRISTINA RAAB.Response due by 6/6/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Alexander MacLeod for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES .. (MacLeod, Glenn) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
      INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. (ag) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/06/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. (kh) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $400, Receipt number 9998-3268237) [Vaccination date: 4/22/2013], filed by KRISTINA RAAB. Respondents Report due by 7/5/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dw1) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 126 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?