Bryson Ray v. McCullough Payne & Haan, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-11518

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 6:57 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109188152 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Bill of costs filed by Attorney John Gregory McCullough for Appellee McCullough Payne & Haan, LLC. (ECF: John McCullough)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109186860 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Bryson Ray. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109175866 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee McCullough Payne & Haan, LLC. (ECF: John McCullough)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109046270 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Reply Brief filed by Appellant Bryson Ray. (ECF: David McDevitt)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108976415 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee McCullough Payne & Haan, LLC. (ECF: John McCullough)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108940409 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
            Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant Bryson Ray. (ECF: David McDevitt)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108940402 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
              Appellant's brief filed by Bryson Ray. (ECF: David McDevitt)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108902470 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Neal McDevitt for Appellant Bryson Ray. (ECF: David McDevitt)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108895753 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Gregory McCullough for Appellee McCullough Payne & Haan, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: John McCullough)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108894608 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                    Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Neal McDevitt for Appellant Bryson Ray. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: David McDevitt)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108892507 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Gregory McCullough for McCullough Payne & Haan, LLC. (ECF: John McCullough)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 154 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?