Brinker v. The Bilderberg Group et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03761

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2017 at 11:21 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jason Robert Brinker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Robert Brinker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Robert Brinker +1 281 723 1555
v.
American Express Company American Express Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Express"
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Apple"
No Logo Brazos Valley Schools Credit Union, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Millman, Defendant
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CIA"
No Logo Craig J. Mundie, Defendant
No Logo David Petraeus, Defendant
No Logo David Rockefeller, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Director Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo Donald Fusco, etc., Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Erin Willis, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FBI"
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivanka Trump"
No Logo Jacqueline Kalk, Defendant
No Logo Comey, James B., Defendant
Officially listed as "James Comey"
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2013 - May 9, 2017
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
No Logo John Brennon, Defendant
No Logo John Kerry, Defendant
No Logo KBR, Defendant
No Logo Keith B. Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Leon Panetta, Defendant
No Logo Littler, Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lockheed Martin"
No Logo Meghan Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Morell, Defendant
No Logo Michael S. Rogers, Defendant
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Microsoft"
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.
No Logo NSA, Defendant
No Logo Prafull Kumar, Defendant
No Logo Ralph Daves, Defendant
No Logo Skanska, Defendant
TD Bank, NA TD Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "TD Bank"
No Logo The Bilderberg Group, Defendant
No Logo The Skull and Crossbones, Defendant
No Logo TIM COOK, Defendant
No Logo Trump International, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction, Defendant
No Logo USAA, Defendant
Verizon Wireless Verizon Wireless, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 7 Notice of Appeal filed by Jason Robert Brinker USCA Case Number 16-3199. Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact. Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 2/9/2017. (tp) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF APPEAL from 6 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), 5 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Jason Robert Brinker. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/1/2016) (rdz) Modified on 9/6/2016 (rdz). (Entered: 09/06/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket.Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/1/2016) (rdz) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jason Brinker, dated 8/26/16 re: NOTIFICATION OF HARRASSMENT. Document filed by Jason Robert Brinker.(sc) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/6/2016) (vj) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against Keith B. Alexander, American Express, Apple, Brazos Valley Schools Credit Union, John Brennon, George W. Bush, CIA, James Comey, Tim Cook, Ralph Daves, FBI, Donald Fusco, etc., Michael V. Hayden, Meghan Hunter, KBR, Jacqueline Kalk, John Kerry, Prafull Kumar, Littler, Lockheed Martin, Microsoft, Bruce Millman, Michael J. Morell, Craig J. Mundie(Senior Advisor to the CEO of The Bilderberg Group), Craig J. Mundie(Senior Advisor to the CEO of Microsoft), NSA, Leon Panetta, David Petraeus, David Rockefeller, Michael S. Rogers, Skanska, TD Bank, The Bilderberg Group, The Skull and Crossbones, Donald Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International, Turner Construction, USAA, Verizon Wireless, Erin Willis. Document filed by Jason Robert Brinker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(sac) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jason Robert Brinker.(sac) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 1,818 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?