Arabian Support & Services Com v. Textron Systems Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 16-1309

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 12:55 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107033233 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Textron Systems Corporation. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2016. [16-1309] (AP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107033230 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
    APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Textron Systems Corporation. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2016. Reply brief due 08/08/2016 for APPELLANT Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/01/2016. [16-1309] (AP)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107032884 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
      BRIEF tendered by Appellee Textron Systems Corporation. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2016. [16-1309] (BRB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107014695 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
        ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix filed by Appellee Textron Systems Corporation. Brief due 07/22/2016 for appellee Textron Systems Corporation. [16-1309] (KC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107013860 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
          ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Textron Systems Corporation. Certificate of service dated 06/14/2016. [16-1309]. (BRB)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107010949 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
            CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2016. [16-1309]. (AP)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107010942 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
              APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2016. Brief due 07/08/2016 for APPELLEE Textron Systems Corporation. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/14/2016. [16-1309]. (AP)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107009915 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                BRIEF tendered by Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2016. [16-1309]. (DD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106978753 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Textron Systems Corporation filed by Attorney John A. Tarantino. Certificate of service dated 03/30/2016. [16-1309]. (JAT)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106978696 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Textron Systems Corporation filed by Attorney John A. Tarantino. Certificate of service dated 03/30/2016. [16-1309]. (JAT)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106978690 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Textron Systems Corporation filed by Attorney Brian R. Birke. Certificate of service dated 03/30/2016. [16-1309]. (BRB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106977949 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Textron Systems Corporation filed by Attorney Erin C. Johnston. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2016. [16-1309]. (ECJ)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106977946 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Textron Systems Corporation filed by Attorney Eugene F. Assaf. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2016. [16-1309]. (EFA)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106977937 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Textron Systems Corporation filed by Attorney Ronald K. Anguas, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2016. [16-1309]. (RKA)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106977353 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                              CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #80) filed by Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Docketing Statement due 04/11/2016. Appearance form due 04/11/2016. [16-1309]. (MA)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106997686 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: William P. McGrath, Jr. for Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD., Edwin U. John for Textron Systems Corporation and Tia T. Trout-Perez for Textron Systems Corporation. [16-1309] (MA)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106993228 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                  ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix filed by Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD. Brief due 06/06/2016 for appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD. Appendix due 06/06/2016 for appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD. [16-1309] (MA)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106992049 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
                                    ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Certificate of service dated 04/28/2016. [16-1309] (HVK)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106988590 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE issued. After 05/05/2016, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: William P. McGrath, Jr. for Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD., Edwin U. John for Textron Systems Corporation and Tia T. Trout-Perez for Textron Systems Corporation. [16-1309] (MA)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106986061 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD. filed by Attorney Haig V. Kalbian. Certificate of service dated 04/14/2016. [16-1309] (HVK)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106986052 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD. filed by Attorney D. Michelle Douglas. Certificate of service dated 04/14/2016. [16-1309] (DD)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106984869 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                                            BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/23/2016 for appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Appendix due 05/23/2016 for appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [16-1309] (AS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106984031 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                                              DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD.. Certificate of service dated 04/11/2016. [16-1309] (NDS)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106983746 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD. filed by Attorney Martin F. Gaynor III. Certificate of service dated 04/11/2016. [16-1309] (MFG)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106983738 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Arabian Support & Services Company, LTD. filed by Attorney Nicholas D. Stellakis. Certificate of service dated 04/11/2016. [16-1309] (NDS)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?