National Labor Relations Board,et.al. v. System Council T-6, et.al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-10922
District Judge Denise J. Casper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 11:16 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John J. Walsh, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M. Fleming +1 617 565 6775 Colleen.Fleming@nlrb.gov
No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M. Fleming +1 617 565 6775 Colleen.Fleming@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Defendant
No Logo System Council T-6, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy M Bittner +1 617 624 0200 +1 617 624 0278 WendyBittner@verizon.net
Verizon New England, Inc. Verizon New England, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Skelly Harper +1 617 946 4996 sharper@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur G. Telegen +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 atelegen@seyfarth.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under Section 10(l) of the National Labor Relations Act by National Labor Relations Board.(Fleming, Colleen) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen M. Fleming on behalf of National Labor Relations Board (Fleming, Colleen) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy M Bittner on behalf of System Council T-6 (Bittner, Wendy) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455, I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk to reassign the case randomly to another District Judge.(Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by National Labor Relations Board. System Council T-6 served on 5/23/2016, answer due 6/13/2016. Acknowledgement filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Fleming, Colleen) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Telegen on behalf of Verizon New England Inc. (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Skelly Harper on behalf of Verizon New England Inc. (Harper, Skelly) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by National Labor Relations Board in Support re 1 Complaint,,. (Fleming, Colleen) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT Petition for Temporary Restraining Order Under Section 10(l) of the National Labor Relations Act against System Council T-6, IBEW (Fee Status: US Government), filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(Fleming, Colleen) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 146 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?