District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

USA v. Zukerman
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cr-00194-AT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 15, 2021 at 5:08 PM DT (3.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley John Okula, Jr. +1 212 637 1585 stan.okula@usdoj.gov
No Logo Morris E Zuckerman, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Asa Bruton, III +1 202 434 5216 +1 202 434 5029 jbruton@wc.com
Space David Michael Horniak +1 202 434 5852 dhorniak@wc.com
Space David M. Zinn +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 dzinn@wc.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 3/16/2016
County NewYork
Terminated 3/21/2017
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7212A.F
Offense Level 4
267212A.F CORRUPT OR FORCIBLE INTERFERENCE (CORRUPTLY ENDEAVORING TO OBSTRUCT AND IMPEDE THE DUE ADMINISTRATION OF THE INTERNAL REVENUE LAWS)
Count 2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201.F ATTEMPT TO EVADE OR DEFEAT TAX
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags CLOSED,ECF
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Morris E. Zukerman re [58] Judgment. Satisfaction is acknowledged between United States of America, plaintiff, and Morris Zukerman, defendant, for the restitution in the amount of $37,574,951.88, for the fine in the amount of $10,000,000.00 and the special assessment in the amount of $200.00, amounting in all to the sum of $47,575,151.88. Judgment entered in the Judgment Book of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York on the 21st day of March 2017. (bw)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 108 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
    ORDER as to Morris E. Zukerman (1) granting [105] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated September 4, 2018 re: 87 Order,, re: Request to Extend Monthly Payment Plan for Fine. Accordingly, Defendant's request is GRANTED to the extent that: 1. Defendant's fine is stayed in part pending the Supreme Court's decision on Defendant's petition for certiorari; 2. Defendant shall continue to make monthly payments on the fine equal to $250,000 per month, pursuant to the Court's May 23, 2017 order; 3. Defendant may not transfer, encumber, or dissipate his assets without approval from the U.S. Probation Office or the Court; and 4. If the Supreme Court denies Defendant's petition for certiorari or affirms the Court's sentence, the remaining balance of the fine shall be due within 120 days. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 105. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/14/2018) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Response to motionCourt Filing
      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated September 13, 2018 re: [105] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated September 4, 2018 re: [87] Order,, re: Request to Extend Monthly Payment Plan for Fine .. (Okula, Stanley)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 106 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER as to Morris E. Zukerman. It is ORDERED that by September 13, 2018, the Government shall respond to Defendants letter dated September 4, 2018, ECF No. 105. (Responses due by 9/13/2018) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/5/2018) (ap)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018, Terminated: 9/14/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated September 4, 2018 re: [87] Order,, re: Request to Extend Monthly Payment Plan for Fine . Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Bruton, James)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
            MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Morris E. Zukerman re: [63] Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 17-948. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 8/17/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion)(nd)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 USCA Order - Other
              ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Morris E. Zukerman re: [63] Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 17-948. On February 6, 2018, this case was remanded to the district court. Pursuant to that order, the Appellant filed a motion and letter on May 11, 2018, requesting reinstatement of the appeal and other miscellaneous relief. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the mandate is recalled and the appeal is reinstated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Appellant's motion to file the district court's May 4, 2018, Supplemental Memorandum under seal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall have until May 21, 2018, to file its opposition to Appellant's request for a stay of Appellant's fine. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall have until June 1, 2018, to respond to the arguments raised in Appellants letter concerning the district court's May 4, 2018, Supplemental Memorandum. The governments response shall be in the form of a letter that is not to exceed six pages. Thereafter, Appellant shall have until June 8, 2018, to file a reply letter not to exceed three pages. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Certified: 05/18/2018. (nd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER as to Morris E. Zukerman. For the key reasons discussed above, the Court concluded that the imposition of a fine well above the Guidelines range was warranted. Defendant is directed to file a copy of this supplemental memorandum with the Clerk of the Court of the Second Circuit Court of Appeals, with the request that she forward it to the panel that issued the aforementioned remand.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/4/2018)(ft)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018, Terminated: 8/17/2018 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                      MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Morris E. Zukerman re: [63] Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 17-948. ON CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the judgment of the district court is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 02/28/2018. (nd)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018, Terminated: 2/28/2018 USCA Order - Other
                          ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Morris E. Zukerman re: [63] Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 17-0948. Appellant renews his motion for a stay, pending appeal, of the district court judgment ordering that he pay $250,000 of his $10 million fine per month. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. The denial is without prejudice to the motion being renewed after May 4, 2018, in the event that the district court has not supplemented the record as to its rationale for the fine imposed by that date. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Certified: 02/28/2018. (nd)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
                              Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: [101] USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal,. (nd)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018, Terminated: 2/28/2018 USCA order
                                  ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re: [63] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment USCA Case Number 17-948. ON CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the judgment of the district court is REMANDED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 02/06/2018. (nd)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Sealed document
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/5/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Morris E. Zukerman (1) granting [96] AMENDED LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Horniak dated September 8, 2017 re: Acknowledgment of Payments Made in Satisfaction of Judgment. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED as to post-judgment interest. Pursuant to the Court's order dated May 23, 2017, ECF No. 87, Defendant is not obligated to pay interest on timely payments. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/20/2017) (lnl)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/4/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017, Terminated: 9/20/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                              AMENDED LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Horniak dated September 8, 2017 re: Acknowledgment of Payments Made in Satisfaction of Judgment . Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits - Part 1, # (3) Exhibit Exhibits - Part 2, # (4) Exhibit Exhibits - Part 3, # (5) Exhibit Exhibits - Part 4, # (6) Exhibit Exhibits - Part 5, # (7) Exhibit Exhibits - Part 6, # (8) Exhibit Exhibits - Part 7)(Bruton, James)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Morris E. Zukerman (1) granting in part and denying in part [92] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David M. Horniak dated September 8, 2017 re: 91 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David M. Horniak dated September 8, 2017 re: Acknowledgment of Payments Made in Satisfaction of Judgment re: Request to Redact and File Under Seal. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Defendant's request is GRANTED to the extent it seeks to redact sensitive third-party information that falls into the category of information the Court has sealed in prior orders Defendant's request is DENIED to the extent it seeks to redact information related to Mrs. Zukerman, as her identity is included in the public indictment. Defendant is directed to file revised, redacted copies of his letter motion on the docket, as well as unredacted copies with Sealed Records at 500 Pearl St. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/19/2017) (lnl)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated September 18, 2017 re: Interest on Restitution/Fine Document filed by USA. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER as to Morris E. Zukerman. The Court has reviewed Defendant's letter, dated September 8, 2017, requesting that the Court issue an order acknowledging, in effect, (1) Defendant's timely payments satisfying his restitution and fine obligations, and (2) that Defendant owes no interest on either obligation. ECF No. 91. It is ORDERED that, by September 18, 2017, the Government shall respond to Defendant's letter. In particular, the Government is instructed to clarify (1) why the Government informed Defendant that he owes interest on his restitution and fine obligations, and (2) whether the Defendant, in fact, owes any interest. Alternatively, the Government should inform the Court if it is able to resolve this issue internally. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/12/2017)(bw)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017, Terminated: 9/19/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David M. Horniak dated September 8, 2017 re: [91] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David M. Horniak dated September 8, 2017 re: Acknowledgment of Payments Made in Satisfaction of Judgment . re: Request to Redact and File Under Seal . Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Horniak, David)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David M. Horniak dated September 8, 2017 re: Acknowledgment of Payments Made in Satisfaction of Judgment . Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibits - Part 1, # (3) Exhibits - Part 2, # (4) Exhibits - Part 3, # (5) Exhibits - Part 4, # (6) Exhibits - Part 5, # (7) Exhibits - Part 6, # (8) Text of Proposed Order)(Horniak, David)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Attorney David M. Horniak dated July 19, 2017 re: Accordingly, we hereby request an order authorizing the Pretrial Services Office to release Mr. Zukerman's passport to his wife, Karen Zukerman, or to any representative she may designate. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/19/2017)(bw)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/19/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David M. Horniak dated July 19, 2017 re: Release of Passport . Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Horniak, David)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Payment of Restitution
                                                                            Payment of Restitution from Morris E. Zukerman in the amount of $200.00. Date Received: 06/08/2017. (jvs)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Sealed document
                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER as to Morris E. Zukerman. Accordingly, Defendant's request is GRANTED to the extent that: 1. Defendant's fine is stayed in part pending Defendant's appeal; 2. Defendant shall make monthly payments on the fine equal to $250,000 per month, with the first payment due June 22, 2017; 3. Defendant may not transfer, encumber, or dissipate his assets without approval from the U.S. Probation Office or the Court; and 4. If the Second Circuit affirms the Court's sentence, the remaining balance of the fine is due within 120 days. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 65 and 70. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/23/2017)(ft)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER by Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated May 22, 2017 re: Reply to Response to Motion to Stay Fine (Bruton, James)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Morris E. Zukerman: Notice to Attorney James A. Bruton to RE-FILE Document [85] Reply to Response to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Morris E. Zukerman re [70] AMENDED MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal., [65] MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal.. (Bruton, James) Modified on 5/23/2017 (ka).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley J. Okula, Jr., Special Assistant U.S. Attorney, dated May 17, 2017 re: We write in connection with the May 20, 2017 surrender date set by Your Honor at the defendant's sentencing. In particular, we write to request that the defendant's surrender date be moved to June 26, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Defendant shall surrender at the Otisville facility before 2:00 p.m. on June 26, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/17/2017)(bw)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017, Terminated: 5/17/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated May 17, 2017 re: Change of Defendant's Surrender Date . Document filed by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley J. Okula, Jr., Special Assistant U.S. Attorney, dated May 16, 2017 re: The United States filed late yesterday (May 15, 2017) its response to the defendant's financial submission regarding his ability to make immediate payment of the $10 million fine imposed by Your Honor in connection with sentencing. Pursuant to the Court's directive, we respectfully request that our May 15 letter be placed under seal by the Court. The Government will supplement its filing through a redacted filing of the letter via ECF. ENDORSEMENT: The Government's request is GRANTED. ECF No, 79 shall be placed under permanent seal. The Government shall re-file its response with appropriate redactions via ECF and file an unredacted version with the Sealed Records office of the Records Management Department. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/16/2017)(bw)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated May 15, 2017 re: [70] AMENDED MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal., [66] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated April 5, 2017 re: [65] MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal. re: Permission to File Under Seal .. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017, Terminated: 5/16/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated May 16, 2017 re: [79] Response in Opposition to Motion, re: Request to Seal . Document filed by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk
                                                                                                  Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk: as to Morris E. Zukerman. Transmitted re: [82] Endorsed Letter, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing of document. (bw)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated May 15, 2017 re: [70] AMENDED MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal., [66] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated April 5, 2017 re: [65] MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal. re: Permission to File Under Seal .. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                        LETTER by Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated May 8, 2017 re: Mr. Zukerman's Updated Financial Information (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Edward Imperatore dated 5/1/2017 re: leave until 5/10/17 to respond to 4/28/17 defense letter . Document filed by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman. (Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER by Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated April 28, 2017 re: Ex Parte Communications (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER as to Morris E. Zukerman. It is ORDERED that: 1. By May 8, 2017, Defendant shall file an updated financial affidavit, which shall include all of the information requested in the Government's letter dated April 6, 2017, ECF No. 68, with the exception of information regarding the Zukerman Family Trust. Defendant may, if he desires, also propose a payment plan. 2. By May 15, 2017, the Government may oppose Defendant's motion. 3. By May 22, 2017, Defendant may reply. 4. The financial affidavit may be filed under seal without further application from the Court. To the extent either brief describes or quotes from the financial affidavit, it may be filed with corresponding redactions without further application from the Court. 5. Defendant's obligation to pay the fine is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's motion. All other conditions of the sentence remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/18/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Morris E. Zukerman: Replies due by 5/22/2017. Responses due by 5/15/2017. (ft)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER by Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated April 14, 2017 re: Response to Government's Reply Letter Regarding Motion to Stay Fine (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated April 12, 2017 re: Motion to Stay Payment of Fine Document filed by USA. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 5/23/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                        AMENDED MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal. Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER by Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated April 10, 2017 re: Government's Letter dated April 6, 2017 (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Morris E. Zukerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated April 6, 2017 re: Defendant's Motion for a Stay Document filed by USA. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [66] LETTER MOTION as to Morris E. Zukerman (1). ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's request is GRANTED only to the extent that Defendant may redact account and address information in Exhibit A pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1. Under the common law and First Amendment presumptions of public access, the Court may only seal documents where "closure is essential to preserve higher values and is narrowly tailored to serve that interest.'' Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 121 (2d Cir. 2006). Defendant has not identified a ''substantial probability of prejudice to a compelling interest." United States v. Doe, 63 F.3d 121, 128 (2d Cir. 1995). By April 12, 2017, the Government shall respond to Defendant's motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/6/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017, Terminated: 4/6/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated April 5, 2017 re: [65] MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal. re: Permission to File Under Seal . Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017, Terminated: 5/23/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Fine Pending Appeal. Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying [62] LETTER MOTION as to Morris E. Zukerman (1). ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's requests for leave to file this letter with redactions and his motion under seal in its entirety are DENIED. Defendant shall re-file this letter without redactions and may submit to chambers, via e-mail, proposed redactions tailored to the sensitive information, if any, contained in Defendant's motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/4/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017, Terminated: 8/17/2018 NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Morris E. Zukerman from [58] Judgment. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401178336. (nd)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                                                                                        Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files as to Morris E. Zukerman re: [63] Notice of Appeal were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                          Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to Morris E. Zukerman to US Court of Appeals re: [63] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (nd)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017, Terminated: 4/4/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated April 3, 2017 re: Leave to File Under Seal . Document filed by Morris E. Zukerman. (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Morris E. Zukerman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 3/21/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Morris E. Zukerman re: Sentence held on 3/21/17 before Judge Analisa Torres. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  RESTITUTION ORDER as to (16-Cr-194-01) Morris E. Zukerman. WHEREAS, on or about June 27, 2016, defendant MORRIS ZUKERMAN pleaded guilty to Counts One and Two of the Indictment, charging him with violations of Title 26, United States Code, Section 7212(a) (Corruptly Endeavoring to Obstruct the Internal Revenue Service) and Section 7201 (Tax Evasion); and WHEREAS, as part of MORRIS ZUKERMAN's plea agreement, he agreed to make restitution to the Internal Revenue Service ("IRS") and to the New York State Department of Taxation and Finance ("NYS"); and WHEREAS, the Court has received information from the Government concerning the actual losses sustained by the IRS and NYS, the victims of the crime of conviction, and, accordingly, the appropriate amount of restitution, which is calculated to be $37,547,951.88; now IT IS ORDERED that defendant MORRIS ZUKERMAN pay restitution to the IRS in the amount of $33,008,951.88 and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall pay restitution to New York State in the amount of $4,566,000. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall append a copy of this Order to the Judgment of the defendant. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/21/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Morris E. Zukerman (1), Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1, 2, Imprisonment for a total term of 70 Months. Supervised release for a term of One Year. Count(s) 3 is dismissed on the motion of the US. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: Time should be served at the FCI Otisville satellite camp, if possible. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2pm on 5/20/17. Special Assessment of $200, Fine of $10,000,000.00 and Restitution of $37,574,951.88. Lump Sum payment of $47,575,151.88 which is due immediately. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/21/17)(jw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2017: # (1) Restitution Order) (bw).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                    DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Morris E. Zukerman (1) Count 3. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                      DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Morris E. Zukerman (1) Count 3. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Sentencing held on 3/21/2017 for Morris E Zukerman (1) Count 1,2. Sentencing for Morris E. Zukerman held on 3/21/2017 as to Counts 1 and 2 of S1 16 Cr. 194. AUSA Okula present. Defendant present with counsel James A. Bruton, David Michael Horniak, and David M. Zinn. Court reporter present. Count 3 dismissed on application of Government. Defendant sentenced to 70 months of imprisonment, 1 year of supervised release, $37,574,951.88 restitution, $10,000,000 fine, and $200 assessment. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Morris E Zuckerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated 3/20/2017 re: Response to March 17, 2017 Letter from the United States (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                            SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ciccarella Sentencing Transcript)(Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Morris E Zuckerman on re: [54] Letter - Sentencing filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The Government's request to file the ex parte submission under seal is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/28/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 Letter - Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                              Sentencing Letter by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman addressed to Honorable Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated February 27, 2017 re: Defendant's Letter of February 22, 2017. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Morris E Zuckerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated February 22, 2017 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [50] LETTER MOTION as to Morris E Zuckerman (1). ENDORSEMENT: The Government's requests are GRANTED. ECF No. 48 shall remain under permanent seal. To protect sensitive personal and medicalinformation, the Government may file under seal its Sentencing Memorandum and exhibits, with redacted versions on the public docket. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 38, 49, and 50.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017, Terminated: 2/14/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated February 14, 2017 re: [48] Sentencing Submission re: Filing Under Seal . Document filed by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017, Terminated: 2/14/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated February 8, 2017 re: Permission to File Un-redacted Sentencing Memorandum Under Seal . Document filed by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT [45] LETTER MOTION The United States respectfully submits this letter to correct its application filed earlier today, which sought an enlargement of time to file its Sentencing Memorandum. The enlargement date incorrectly noted in the earlier letter was March 7, 2017. The correct date is February 7, 2017 - next Tuesday....ENDORSEMENT..This request is GRANTED. The prior request, at ECF No. 45, is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/3/17) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated February 3, 2017 re: Corrected Letter . Document filed by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated February 3, 2017 re: Enlargement of Time to file Sentencing Memo . Document filed by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [41] LETTER MOTION as to Morris E Zuckerman (1). ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/25/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Morris E Zuckerman: Sentencing set for 3/21/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017, Terminated: 1/25/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated January 24, 2017 re: Extention of Time to File Senetncing Memorandum . Document filed by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Morris E Zuckerman ( Sentencing set for 3/21/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) The sentencing hearing scheduled on March 7, 2017, is ADJOURNED to March 21, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/24/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Morris E Zuckerman. By letter dated January 13, 2017, Defendant requests to file under seal parts of Defendant's sentencing submission and exhibits. ECF No. 38. The submission and exhibits contain limited redactions of sensitive personal information about the Defendant and others associated with him. Accordingly, the request to file the materials, filed with redactions at ECF Nos. 37, 37-1 - 37-14, under seal is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an unredacted copy of these materials with the sealed records department of this Court, and send an unredacted courtesy copy to chambers. Any future submissions that quote or refer to the content filed under seal may be similarly filed under seal and filed publicly with redactions without an additional application to the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/17/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk: as to Morris E. Zuckerman. Transmitted re: [39] Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing of document(s). (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017, Terminated: 2/14/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated January 13, 2017 re: [37] Sentencing Submission, re: Leave to File Under Seal . Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Morris E Zuckerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index, # (2) Exhibit A - Volume 1, # (3) Exhibit A - Volume 2, # (4) Exhibit A - Volume 3, # (5) Exhibit A - Volume 4, # (6) Exhibit B, # (7) Exhibit C, # (8) Exhibit D, # (9) Exhibit E, # (10) Exhibit F, # (11) Exhibit G, # (12) Exhibit H, # (13) Exhibit I, # (14) Exhibit J)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Morris E Zuckerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated January 3, 2017 re: Clarification of Deadline (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [34] LETTER MOTION Continuance of Sentencing as to Morris E Zuckerman (1). ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The sentencing hearing scheduled for January 24, 2017 is ADJOURNED to March 7, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall follow the submission schedule proposed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/28/2016) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016, Terminated: 12/28/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated December 28, 2016 re: Motion To Continue Sentencing . Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Morris E Zuckerman: Sentencing set for 3/7/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Morris E. Zuckerman. By letter e-mailed to chambers dated December 23, 2016, and filed on the docket, ECF Nos. 31, 32, Defendant requests to file under seal certain materials, Exhibit A, to be submitted in connection with Defendant's upcoming sentencing. Exhibit A contains a letter from the Defendant to the U.S. Probation Office that includes a correction to the Defendant's financial disclosure statement and letters in support of the Defendant that request leniency at sentencing, some of which contain sensitive personal information about third-parties. Defendant states that he "will re-file the letters publicly on ECF, with appropriate redactions, as exhibits to [Defendant's] upcoming sentencing memorandum." ECF No. 32 at 1. Accordingly, the request to file the materials under seal is GRANTED. Defendant shall file Exhibit A under seal. By January 3, 2017, Defendant shall submit by e-mail to chambers the proposed redactions to these materials as part of Defendant's sentencing memorandum. See ECF No. 28. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/27/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 12/27/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated December 23, 2016 re: Request To Seal Submission to Probation Officer . Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 12/27/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated December 23, 2016 re: Request To Seal December 8, 2016 Submission to Probation Officer . Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: 12/15/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Morris E. Zuckerman. By letter e-mailed to chambers dated December 15, 2016, Defendant requests to file under seal certain materials, Exhibit A, to be submitted in connection with Defendant's upcoming sentencing. Exhibit A contains limited redactions of sensitive personal information about the Defendant and others associated with him. Accordingly, the request to file the materials in Exhibit A under seal is GRANTED. Defendant shall file his letter and Exhibit A under seal, and file the materials with redactions on the docket. Future submissions, such as Defendant's sentencing memorandum, that quote or refer to the content filed under seal in Exhibit A may be similarly filed under seal and filed publicly with redactions without an additional application to the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/15/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [27] LETTER MOTION Continuance of Sentencing as to Morris E Zuckerman (1). ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Defendant Morris Zukerman's sentencing hearing scheduled for December 5, 2016, is ADJOURNED to January 24, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall follow the submission schedule proposed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/7/2016) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016, Terminated: 11/7/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James A. Bruton, III dated 11/4/2016 re: Request To Continue Sentencing Hearing . Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Morris E Zuckerman: Sentencing set for 1/24/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Morris E Zuckerman: Notice to Attorney James A. Bruton to RE-FILE Document [26] MOTION to Continue Sentencing. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016, Terminated: 11/4/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Continue Sentencing. Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Bruton, James) Modified on 11/7/2016 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Morris E Zuckerman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 6/27/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Morris E Zuckerman re: Plea held on 6/27/16 before Judge Analisa Torres. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Morris E Zuckerman (1) Count 1,2. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Change of Plea Hearing as to Morris E Zuckerman held on 6/27/2016. Plea entered by Morris E Zuckerman (1) Guilty as to Count 1,2. Defendant, pled guilty to one count of corruptly endeavoring to obstruct and impede the due administration of the internal revenue laws, in violation of 26 U.S.C. § 7212(a), and tax evasion, in violation of 26 U.S.C. § 7201. Parties and court reporter were present. Sentencing set for December 5, 2016, at 4:00 p.m. (Sentencing set for 12/5/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Change of Plea Hearing as to Morris E Zuckerman held on 6/27/2016. Plea entered by Morris E Zuckerman (1) Guilty as to Count 1,2. Defendant, pled guilty to one count of corruptly endeavoring to obstruct and impede the due administration of the internal revenue laws, in violation of 26 U.S.C. § 7212(a), and tax evasion, in violation of 26 U.S.C. § 7201. Parties and court reporter were present. Sentencing set for December 5, 2016, at 4:00 p.m. (Sentencing set for 12/5/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Morris E Zuckerman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 06/08/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Morris E Zuckerman re: Conference held on 06/08/2016 before Judge Analisa Torres. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2016. (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Morris E Zuckerman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Appearance proceeding held on 5/23/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (do)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Morris E Zuckerman re: Initial Appearance held on 5/23/16 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2016. (do) (Main Document 19 replaced on 7/1/2016) (do).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Note Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 36, 37 Transcript as to Morris E Zuckerman. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Edward Arthur Imperatore appearing for USA. (Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Curcio Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Curcio Hearing as to Morris E Zuckerman held on 6/8/2016. Defendant and counsel, David M. Zinn and James A. Bruton, appeared. Counsel Henry Putzel III appeared for purposes of the hearing. Government, AUSA Stanley John Okula, Jr. And Edward Arthur Imperatore present. Court Reporter present. The Court finds that Defendant has knowingly and voluntarily chosen Mr. Bruton, Mr. Zinn, and James T. Fuller III to serve as his attorneys in this case and waived his right to conflict-free representation. The next conference is scheduled for June 21, 2016, at 3:00 p.m. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated May 31, 2016 re: Proposed Curcio Hearing Questions Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Curcio Hearing Questions)(Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [11] Motion for James A. Bruton, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Morris E Zuckerman (1); granting [12] Motion for David M. Zinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Morris E Zuckerman (1); granting [13] Motion for David M. Horniak to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Morris E Zuckerman (1). (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/31/16) (Torres, Analisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016, Terminated: 5/31/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for David M. Horniak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12353438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - California, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia)(Horniak, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016, Terminated: 5/31/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for David M. Zinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12353419. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - California, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia)(Zinn, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016, Terminated: 5/31/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for James A. Bruton, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12353363. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morris E Zuckerman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Pennsylvania, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia)(Bruton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [12] MOTION for David M. Zinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12353419. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [11] MOTION for James A. Bruton, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12353363. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [13] MOTION for David M. Horniak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12353438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Morris E Zuckerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from AUSA Stanley J. Okula, Jr. dated May 23, 2016 re: In particular, we write to request that Your Honor set an initial conference date before the Court. Pursuant to a discussion with Your Honor's law clerk last Friday, and after consultation with defense counsel, we request a conference on June 6, 7, 8, or 9, in the afternoon. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The parties are directed to appear in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007, on June 8, 2016, at 4:45 p.m., for an initial conference and to address the potential conflict between Defendant and his counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/24/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appearance Bond Entered as to (S1-16-Cr-194-01) Morris E. Zuckerman in amount of $2,500,000.00. $2,500,000.00 PRB; secured by certain artwork valued in excess of $2,500,000.00; co-signed by 2 FRP's by May 27, 2016; travel is restricted to the Continental U.S.; surrender of travel documents and no new applications; pre-trial supervision reporting by telephone or internet; Defendant is to be released on his own signature. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated May 23, 2016 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein:Initial Appearance on disposition sheet as to Morris E Zuckerman held on 5/23/2016. Deft present with atty James A. Bruton, III. AUSA Stan Okula present. Agreed conditions of release: 2.5 Million PRB, 2 FRP to sign by May 27, 2016. Secured by certain artwork valued of $2.5 million. Travel restricted to Continental US. Surrender travel documents (& No new applications), Regular pretrial supervision. Pretrial supervisor by telephone or internet reporting. Deft to be released on own signature: FRP's by May 27, 2016. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Morris E Zuckerman addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stanley Okula dated May 23, 2016 re: Request for Court Conference Document filed by USA. (Okula, Stanley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Morris E Zuckerman. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order to Unseal S(1) Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/20/16)(jm) Modified on 5/23/2016 (jm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Plea entered by Morris E Zuckerman (1) Count 1,2,3 Not Guilty. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein:Arraignment on disposition sheet as to Morris E Zuckerman (1) Count 1,2,3 held on 5/23/2016. Deft present with atty James A. Bruton, III. AUSA Stan Okula present. Deft arraigned and pleads not guilty. Speedy trial time excluded under 18 USC 3161(h)(7) until 6/10/2016. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attorney update in case as to Morris E Zuckerman. Attorney Stanley John Okula, Jr for USA added. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case as to Morris E Zuckerman ASSIGNED to Judge Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF as to Morris E Zuckerman. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED S(1) INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (Attachments: # (1) indictment, # (2) indictment) (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 4,016 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?