St. Lot v. City Of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03879

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2018 at 12:20 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jean Robert St. Lot, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunlop & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Victor Antonio Dunlop, II +1 718 403 9261 +1 718 403 9593 victor@kjmontgomerylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jean Robert St. Lot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean Robert St. Lot
No Logo Robert Jean Saint Lot, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Antonio Dunlop, II +1 718 403 9261 +1 718 403 9593 victor@kjmontgomerylaw.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 99 Park Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Michael Cleary +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 rcleary@hpmb.com
Space Austa Starr Devlin +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 adevlin@hpmb.com
Space Tucker Christian Kramer +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 tkramer@hpmb.com
Space Daryl Paxson +1 914 522 2068 +1 914 949 1160 dpaxson@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan Michael Smith +1 212 880 3800 +1 212 880 8965 jordan.smith@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter John Fogarty +1 212 356 3514 pfogarty@law.nyc.gov
Space Bilal Husain Haider +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 bhaider@law.nyc.gov
Space Evan Michael Piercey +1 212 356 2428 epiercey@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lynn Weiss +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 DAWEISS@LAW.NYC.GOV

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel Office City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rhiana L. Swartz +1 212 356 2382 +1 212 356 3509 rswartz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell Pittoni Murphy & Bach, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alejandra Rosa Gil +1 914 559 3100 agil@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP (WP)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Gerard May +1 212 471 4653 +1 212 490 8966 dmay@hpmb.com
Space Ana Maria Vizzo +1 212 471 4661 +1 212 883 7929 avizzo@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joshua Mathew Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Mathew Friedman

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
Space Danielle Marie Dandrige +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0877 Ddandrig@law.nyc.gov
Space Brendan Michael Horan +1 212 356 1174 +1 212 356 4360 brhoran@law.nyc.gov
Space Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@ahalelaw.com
Space Elisa Lee +1 781 636 8967 +1 212 356 3582 ellee@law.nyc.gov
Space Gary Moy +1 212 356 3522 +1 212 788 9776 gmoy@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel H. Oliner +1 212 356 2329 +1 212 256 3509 doliner@law.nyc.gov
Space Rachel Amy Seligman +1 212 788 0784 +1 212 788 9776 rseligma@law.nyc.gov
Space Scott Craig Silverman +1 212 356 2450 ssilverm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan F. Jaffe +1 212 356 2354 evjaffe@law.nyc.gov
Space Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fayola Naila Alibey +1 212 356 2334 +1 212 356 3509 falibey@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph Anci +1 212 356 1106 +1 212 788 5650 janci@law.nyc.gov
Space Suzanne Emily Aribakan +1 212 232 1300 +1 212 232 1399 saribaka@law.nyc.gov
Space Christopher Gregory Arko +1 212 788 0303 carko@law.nyc.gov
Space Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
Space Richard Bahrenburg +1 212 356 2338 +1 212 356 3509 rbahrenb@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Barrett Bardauskis +1 212 356 3159 +1 212 356 3509 ebardaus@law.nyc.gov
Space Nikki Lynn Barker +1 212 676 0992 nbarker@law.nyc.gov
Space Zachary Russell Bergman +1 212 356 5051 zbergman@law.nyc.gov
Space Shira M. Blank +1 212 356 2475 +1 212 788 3770 sblank@law.nyc.gov
Space Cassandra Natasha Branch +1 212 356 4074 cbranch@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel Michael Braun +1 212 356 3548 +1 212 356 3509 dbraun@law.nyc.gov
Space Cherie Nicole Brown +1 212 356 5054 chebrown@law.nyc.gov
Space Kyle C. Bruno +1 732 674 3172 kbruno@law.nyc.gov
Space Evan Brustein +1 212 356 2651 +1 212 356 3509 ebrustei@law.nyc.gov
Space Katherine Abigail Byrns +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 kbyrns@law.nyc.gov
Space John Corbin Carter +1 212 356 2078 jocarter@law.nyc.gov
Space Johana Castro +1 212 788 0976 +1 212 788 9776 jcastro@law.nyc.gov
Space Colin M. Ceriello +1 212 356 5052 +1 212 356 3509 cceriell@law.nyc.gov
Space Jacqueline Carolina Chavez +1 212 356 1000 jchavez@law.nyc.gov
Space Megan Patricia Conger +1 212 356 3504 +1 212 356 3509 mconger@law.nyc.gov
Space David Allen Cooper +1 212 356 3535 +1 212 356 3509 dcooper@law.nyc.gov
Space Alexandra Corsi +1 212 788 1090 +1 212 788 9776 acorsi@law.nyc.gov
Space Theresa Jeanine D'Andrea +1 212 356 3187 +1 212 356 3509 tdandrea@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth M. Daitz +1 212 788 0775 +1 212 788 9776 edaitz@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov
Space Carolyn Kay Depoian +1 212 442 1048 +1 212 788 9776 cdepoian@law.nyc.gov
Space Anthony Matthew Disenso +1 212 442 6618 +1 212 788 9776 adisenso@law.nyc.gov
Space Hannah Victoria Faddis +1 212 356 2486 +1 212 356 1148 hfaddis@law.nyc.gov
Space Courtney Patrice Fain +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 cfain@law.nyc.gov
Space Kaitlin Elizabeth Fitzgibbon +1 212 356 5057 kfitzgib@law.nyc.gov
Space Michael Friel Fleming +1 212 356 2471 +1 212 788 3770 mfleming@law.nyc.gov
Space Brian Christopher Francolla +1 212 788 0988 +1 212 788 9776 bfrancol@law.nyc.gov
Space Philip Sebastian Frank +1 212 788 0893 +1 212 788 9776 pfrank@law.nyc.gov
Space John L. Garcia +1 212 356 5053 +1 212 356 3509 johgarci@law.nyc.gov
Space Ashley Rebecca Garman +1 212 768 4900 +1 212 768 3629 agarman@law.nyc.gov
Space Holly Rachel Gerstenfeld +1 212 788 0710 +1 212 788 0937 hgersten@law.nyc.gov
Space Brachah Goykadosh +1 212 356 3523 +1 212 356 3509 bgoykado@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
Space John Paul Guyette +1 212 356 2455 +1 212 356 2089 jguyette@law.nyc.gov
Space Douglas William Heim +1 212 788 1298 +1 212 788 9776 dheim@law.nyc.gov
Space Maurice L Hudson +1 212 788 8684 +1 212 788 9776 mhudson@law.nyc.gov
Space Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov
Space Paul Hasan Johnson +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 pajohnso@law.nyc.gov
Space Christopher Michael Katsimagles +1 609 558 7656 ckatsima@law.nyc.gov
Space Melissa Kim +1 310 985 1524 mkim@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Norris Krasnow +1 212 335 3997 +1 212 335 4390 krasnowe@dany.nyc.gov
Space Ben Kuruvilla +1 212 788 6405 +1 212 788 9776 bkuruvil@law.nyc.gov
Space Nelson Leese +1 212 356 4361 nleese@law.nyc.gov
Space Ariel Shaun Lichterman +1 212 513 7927 +1 212 788 9776 alichter@law.nyc.gov
Space Jeffrey Loperfido +1 212 356 2384 +1 212 356 3509 jloperfido@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew W Manoff +1 212 356 3283 amanoff@law.nyc.gov
Space Paul Frederick Marks +1 212 788 0884 +1 212 788 8877 pmarks@law.nyc.gov
Space Heather Marie Martone +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 hmartone@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph Anthony Marutollo +1 212 788 1300 +1 212 788 0367 jmarutol@law.nyc.gov
Space Max Oliver McCann +1 212 788 0861 +1 212 788 9776 mmccann@law.nyc.gov
Space Joanne Maureen McLaren +1 212 801 3197 +1 212 801 6400 jmclaren@law.nyc.gov
Space Linda Margareta Mindrutiu +1 212 788 1177 +1 212 788 9776 lmindrut@law.nyc.gov
Space Alison Sue Mitchell +1 212 356 3514 amitchel@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew Thomas Myerberg +1 212 788 0869 +1 212 788 9776 amyerber@law.nyc.gov
Space Michael Nacchio +1 212 356 2726 mnacchio@law.nyc.gov
Space Kathleen Erin Naughton +1 212 788 9567 +1 212 788 9776 knaughto@law.nyc.gov
Space Alexander Macrae Noble +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 356 3509 anoble@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel Louis Passeser +1 212 227 6339 +1 212 788 9776 dpassese@law.nyc.gov
Space Lucienne Pierre +1 212 356 2415 +1 212 356 3509 lpierre@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew James Rauchberg +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0940 arauchbe@law.nyc.gov
Space Justin Warren Reiter +1 212 356 3580 jreiter@law.nyc.gov
Space Sean Robert Renaghan +1 212 356 2452 srenagha@law.nyc.gov
Space Wilda Jacqueline Rodriguez +1 212 356 4361 +1 212 356 3508 wrodrigu@law.nyc.gov
Space Erin T. Ryan +1 212 365 5056 +1 212 356 3509 eryan@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel G. Saavedra +1 212 356 0892 +1 212 356 3509 dsaavedr@law.nyc.gov
Space Melanie Vogel Sadok +1 212 676 6051 +1 212 791 9714 msadok@law.nyc.gov
Space Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Space Nana Kwame Sarpong +1 212 356 0827 +1 212 356 3508 nsarpong@law.nyc.gov
Space Susan P. Scharfstein +1 212 227 4071 +1 212 788 9776 sscharfs@law.nyc.gov
Space Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov
Space Valerie Elizabeth Smith +1 212 356 2398 vsmith@law.nyc.gov
Space Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
Space Kathryn M Sprovieri +1 212 356 2383 +1 212 356 3509 ksprovie@law.nyc.gov
Space Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
Space Pernell Michael Telfort +1 212 341 2652 +1 212 788 3824 ptelfort@law.nyc.gov
Space Kavin Suresh Thadani +1 212 356 2351 +1 212 356 3509 kthadani@law.nyc.gov
Space Omar Hani Tuffaha +1 212 356 0896 +1 212 788 0877 otuffaha@law.nyc.gov
Space Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov
Space Katherine Jane Weall +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 3509 kweall@law.nyc.gov
Space Joshua Alan Weiner +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 jweiner@law.nyc.gov
Space Angharad Wilson +1 212 356 2572 awilson@law.nyc.gov
Space Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
Space Christopher John Yee Coyne +1 212 356 1180 +1 212 356 2089 ccoyne@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph P. Zangrilli +1 212 356 2657 +1 212 356 1148 jzangril@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Dept.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Issac Klepfish +1 212 788 0897 +1 212 788 8000 iklepfis@law.NYC.gov
Space Ryan Glenn Shaffer +1 212 788 1041 +1 212 788 9776 rshaffer@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shlomit Aroubas +1 212 442 2715 +1 212 788 9776 saroubas@law.nyc.gov
Space Tanya N Blocker +1 212 356 3177 +1 212 780 3770 tblocker@law.nyc.gov
Space Stephanie Marie Breslow +1 212 788 1575 +1 212 788 9776 sbreslow@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Bridge +1 212 356 2347 +1 212 356 3509 mbridge@law.nyc.gov
Space Peter William Brocker +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 356 3509 pbrocker@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Colette Connelly +1 212 356 2547 +1 212 356 1148 econnell@law.nyc.gov
Space Tavish Coryell Deatley +1 212 356 2409 tdeatley@law.nyc.gov
Space Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
Space Eviana Linnea Frances Englert +1 212 356 5055 eenglert@law.nyc.gov
Space Aimee Kara Lulich +1 212 788 0725 +1 212 788 9776 alulich@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew William McQueen +1 212 356 2423 +1 212 356 3509 mmcqueen@law.nyc.gov
Space Suzanna Publicker Mettham +1 212 788 1103 +1 212 788 9776 smettham@law.nyc.gov
Space Okwede N Okoh +1 212 356 3271 +1 212 788 9776 ookoh@law.nyc.gov
Space Alan Howard Scheiner +1 212 788 0600 +1 212 788 0367 ascheine@law.nyc.gov
Space Mark David Zuckerman +1 212 442 8248 +1 212 788 9776 mzuckerm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Keaupuni Akina +1 212 356 2377 +1 212 356 3509 wakina@law.nyc.gov
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
Space Kristen Monet McIntosh +1 212 356 2394 +1 212 356 3582 kmcintos@law.nyc.gov
Space Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrea Mary O'Connor +1 212 676 2750 +1 212 788 8877 aoconnor@law.nyc.gov
Space Kathleen Deborah Reilly +1 212 356 2663 +1 212 356 2663 kareilly@law.nyc.gov
Space Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
Space Qiana Charmaine Smith +1 212 788 1588 +1 212 788 9776 qwilliam@law.nyc.gov
Space Emily Stitelman +1 212 356 2011 +1 212 356 2019 estitelm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Ferrari +1 212 356 5058 dferrari@law.nyc.gov
Space Michael Keith Gertzer +1 212 788 0786 +1 212 788 9776 mgertzer@law.nyc.gov
Space Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov
Space Brian Guenther Maxey +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 bmaxey@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel NYC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Scott Dantowitz +1 212 788 0939 +1 212 788 8877 jdantowi@law.nyc.gov
Space Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elissa Paulette Fudim +1 212 356 2425 +1 212 356 1148 efudim@law.nyc.gov
Space Aviva Yocheved Horowitz +1 917 868 1122 ahorowit@law.nyc.gov
Space Sumit Sud +1 212 788 1096 +1 212 788 0367 ssud@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The Corporation Counsel, Nyc Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amatullah Khaliha Booth +1 212 356 3534 +1 212 356 3509 abooth@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Shoffel +1 212 416 8576 +1 212 416 6009

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip Rudolph DePaul

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Rudolph DePaul

Toggle Switch Represented by Sadis & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Amy Rossan +1 212 788 0867 +1 212 788 9776 jrossan@sglawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge M. Marquez-San Martin +1 787 525 8895 +1 212 356 3509 jorge.marquez.sm@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanley W Hodge Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Joseph Lax +1 212 442 6831 +1 212 788 9776 joshua_lax@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tzipora Esther Teichman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tzipora Esther Teichman
No Logo P.O. Seeley, Defendant
No Logo P.O. John Doe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Ryan Budhu +1 212 356 4014 +1 212 356 4009 rbudhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
No Logo P.O. Julio Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Police Officer Seeley, Defendant
No Logo Police Officer JOHN DOE, Defendant
No Logo Police Officer Julio Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Office of Corporation Counsel for the City of New York, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Peter John Fogarty +1 212 356 3514 pfogarty@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel G. Saavedra +1 212 356 0892 +1 212 356 3509 dsaavedr@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Brachah Goykadosh +1 212 356 3523 +1 212 356 3509 bgoykado@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Jean Robert St. Lot from Honorable Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald United States District Judge dated 6/26/2017 re: As you may recall, this Court directed you to inform it by February 16, 2017 as to whether you will retain new counsel following your former counsel's withdrawal. We have received no communication from you; nor have you filed any response to the defendant's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint. You must let us know by July 7, 2017 whether you intend to pursue your case. If we do not hear from you, we will have no choice but to conclude that you have decided not to do so. In that event, your case will be dismissed. (ama) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendant City of New York dated June 12, 2017 re: Respectfully Requesting that the Court Deem Defendant's Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) Unopposed, Fully-Briefed, and Ready for Adjudication. Document filed by City Of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendant City of New York dated April 24, 2017 re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, in accordance with Rule 2.E of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice. Document filed by City Of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6). . Document filed by City Of New York. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DECLARATION of Brachah Goykadosh in Support re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6).. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Local Civil Rule 12.1 Notice to a Pro Se Litigant re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6).. Document filed by City Of New York. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6). Document filed by City Of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER terminating 23 Letter Motion for Conference. Having reviewed defendant City of New York's pre-motion letter, ECF No. 23, the Court has determined that the defendant may bring its motion without the necessity of a pre-motion conference. The briefing schedule is hereby set as follows: Defendant's motion papers to be served by April 24, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition to be served by May 22, 2017; Defendant's reply, if any, to be served by June 12, 2017. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/20/2017) Copies Mailed by Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 9 Amended Complaint Respectfully Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference to Discuss Defendant's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendant City of New York dated February 13, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER terminating 19 Letter Motion to Stay. (The purpose of this letter is to request a full stay of the proceedings for a period of no less than 30 days in order to permit the Plaintiff to retain replacement counsel). The Plaintiff may have thirty (30) days from today to endeavor to find new counsel. Plaintiff is directed to inform the Court in writing no later than February 16, 2017 as to whether he has retained new counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/17/2017) (ama) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw. (I am writing to inform the Court that on January 5, 2017 I was ordered to active duty with the United States Army Judicial General Advocate's Corp ("JAG"). Application Granted. ** Attorney Victor Antonio Dunlop, II terminated.** (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/17/2017) (ama) Modified on 1/18/2017 (ama). (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Withdraw . Document filed by Jean Robert St. Lot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Training Orders)(Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Victor A. Dunlop dated January 13, 2017. Document filed by Jean Robert St. Lot.(Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Office of Corporation Counsel for the City of New York served on 12/15/2016, answer due 1/5/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Document filed by Jean Robert St. Lot. (Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York, Julio Rodriguez. (dgo) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York; P.O. Julio Rodriguez of the 43rd Precinct, re: 9 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jean Robert St. Lot. (Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCESECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 9 Amended Complaint against City Of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot. Related document: 9 Amended Complaint filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot.(Dunlop, Victor) Modified on 12/14/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 10 Motion for Reconsideration. We decline to offer plaintiff a fourth chance. Six months have elapse since plaintiff first filed his complaint. Corporation Counsel's motion for reconsideration is granted, and we dismiss plaintiff's claims against Rodriguez. Plaintiff has until December 15, 2016 to properly serve the City of New York. If he fails to do so, the claims against the City will also be dismissed. While the City states that it is working with plaintiff's counsel to resolve the issue, the attempted service causes the Court concern given what has already transpired in this case. We take this opportunity to remind plaintiff's counsel of his professional obligation to follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Southern District of New York's Local Rules, and this Court's Individual practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/08/2016) (ama) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 8 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, . . Document filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot. (Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendant City of New York dated November 30, 2016. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Goykadosh, Brachah) Modified on 12/22/2016 (db). (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 8 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, . . Document filed by Office of Corporation Counsel for the City of New York. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re; 8 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, . Document filed by Office of Corporation Counsel for the City of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 4 Complaint against City Of New York, Julio Rodriguez with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot. Related document: 4 Complaint filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot.(Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 7 Letter Motion to Reopen Case. It is hereby ordered that this case be re-opened and that plaintiff file an amended complaint consistent with this Order by November 14, 2016. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/1/2016) (cla) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Victor A. Dunlop dated October 19, 2016. Document filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brachah Goykadosh dated October 7, 2016 re: To Inform the Court of Developments Subsequent to Dismissal. Document filed by City Of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/07/2016) (ama) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        COMPLAINT against City Of New York, John Doe, Julio Rodriguez, Seeley. Document filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot.(Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN): Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT against Robert Jean Saint Lot. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12340826)Document filed by Robert Jean Saint Lot.(Dunlop, Victor) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?