Alvarez v. USCIS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00290
District Judge Matthew F. Kennelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:59 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jose Manuel Alvarez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinnally, Flaherty, Krentz & Loran, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Kinnally +1 630 907 0909 +1 630 907 0913 pkinnally@kfkllaw.com
v.
No Logo Robert M. Cowan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov
No Logo Service List, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Northern District Of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED United States Attorney General +1 312 353 5300 USAIL.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
No Logo Uscis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint stipulation to dismiss the complaint is granted. The case is dismissed, with leave to reinstate on or before 9/30/2011. The motion to dismiss is terminated as moot (15). Civil case terminated. (or, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
      MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Defendants' final motion to extend time to reply is granted. Due date for reply brief is extended to 6/29/11. This deadline will not be extended again for any reason whatsoever. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 25 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
          MOTION by Defendants Robert M. Cowan, USCIS, Service List for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, 1 (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
            MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion for extension of time is granted. Due date for reply brief is extended to 6/13/11. (mk) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 22 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/14/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                MOTION by Defendants Robert M. Cowan, USCIS for extension of time to file response/reply (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion to extend time is granted. Due date for reply brief is extended to 5/31/11. No appearance is necessary on 5/25/11. (mk) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                      MOTION by Defendants Robert M. Cowan, USCIS for extension of time to file response/reply (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jose Manuel Alvarez to motion to dismiss 15 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Notice of Filing)(Kinnally, Patrick) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held. Response to motion to dismiss is due by 5/6/2011. Reply is due by 5/16/2011. Ruling by electronic mail. (or, ) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion to dismiss 15 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Linked document has the incorrect case number.) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                              MOTION by Defendants Robert M. Cowan, USCIS, Service List to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Defendants' agreed motion to extend is granted. Response to complaint is to be filed by 4/11/11.Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of extension of time 12 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/5/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by Defendants Robert M. Cowan, USCIS, Service List for extension of time (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Jose Manuel Alvarez Amended Notice of Filing (Kinnally, Patrick) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Jose Manuel Alvarez Amended Plaintiff's Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosure (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Documents 1-69, # 2 Exhibit Documents 70-137, # 3 Exhibit Documents 138-199, # 4 Exhibit Documents 200-259, # 5 Exhibit Documents 260-295, # 6 Exhibit Documents 296-332, # 7 Exhibit Documents 333-368, # 8 Exhibit Documents 369-403, # 9 Notice of Filing)(Kinnally, Patrick) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:The Clerk is directed to immediately remove the image of docket entry 7 from the docket and place it under seal. Plaintiffs attorney erroneously filed discovery material (namely, a Rule 26(a)(1) response), in contravention of Local Rule 26.3. The Court also notes that these materials are replete with Social Security numbers and other personal identifiers. If either party wishes to file the administrative record in this case in the public record, it must first redact from the public filing any Social Security numbers except for the last four digits, any birth dates, and any financial account numbers other than the last four digits. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                            SEALED DOCUMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(lp, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                              Document Removed Per Court Order. (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:The Court sets the case for an initial status hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) & (c) on 4/14/2011 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                  DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Robert M. Cowan, USCIS (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Robert M. Cowan, USCIS, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (lp, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                      CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kinnally, Patrick) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff jose Manuel alvarez by Patrick M. Kinnally (Kinnally, Patrick) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT filed by jose Manuel alvarez; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5611644. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Kinnally, Patrick) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?