Pavarini Construction Co. (SE) v. Ace American Insurance Company
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-12223

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 2:28 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109120284 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellee brief filed by Appellee Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc. is GRANTED. [7874008-2] Appellees brief due on 10/21/2016. BBM
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109106552 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for extension of time to file appellees brief to 10/21/2016 filed by Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [7874008-1] (ECF: Stephen Asay)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109106510 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Appendix filed [Three VOLUMES] by Appellant Ace American Insurance Company. (ECF: Jonathan Hacker)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109106504 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Appellant's brief filed by Ace American Insurance Company. (ECF: Jonathan Hacker)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109102095 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for extension to file appellee brief [7871266-2] received from Attorney Stephen Scott Asay for Appellee Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc. is returned unfiled. The motion for extension is premature because appellant have not filed their brief. In addition, your motion is returned unfiled because the motion contains mediation language. Please refer to 11th Cir. R. 33-1(c)(3).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109041028 Unknown Document Type
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108976119 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
              Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jonathan D. Hacker for Appellant Ace American Insurance Company.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108976105 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                ORDER: Motion for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Ace American Insurance Company is GRANTED by clerk. [7795088-2]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108971588 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura Freid-Studlo for Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc.. (ECF: Laura Freid-Studlo)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108971368 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melissa Callahan Lesmes for Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc.. (ECF: Melissa Lesmes)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108970225 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                      ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Ace American Insurance Company is GRANTED. [7791407-2] Appellants brief due on 08/04/2016. CRW
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108969955 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                        MOTION APPELLANTS MOTION TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OUT OF TIME filed by Ace American Insurance Company. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [7795088-1] (ECF: Jonathan Hacker)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108969676 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David T. Dekker for Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc.. (ECF: David Dekker)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108969644 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Scott Asay for Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc.. (ECF: Stephen Asay)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108968718 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                              Corrected Motion for extension to file appellant brief [7791407-2] filed by Appellant Ace American Insurance Company. (ECF: Jonathan Hacker)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108968699 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jonathan D. Hacker for Appellant Ace American Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Jonathan Hacker)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108967699 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                  Attorney Jonathan D. Hacker for Appellant Ace American Insurance Company has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time.
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108967532 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
                                    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Russell M. Landy for Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc.. (ECF: Russell Landy)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108967528 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter Francis Valori for Pavarini Construction Co. (SE), Inc.. (ECF: Peter Valori)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108963823 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 08/04/2016 filed by Ace American Insurance Company. Motion is Unopposed. [7791407-1] (ECF: Jonathan Hacker)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108963741 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                          APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan D. Hacker for Appellant ACE American Insurance Company (ECF: Jonathan Hacker)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108944474 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                            TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Joel D. Adler for Appellant Ace American Insurance Company. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. (ECF: Joel Adler)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108941642 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                                              CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ace American Insurance Company on 05/06/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/20/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 05/25/2016 as to Appellant Ace American Insurance Company
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 334 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?