Bulcock v. Unilife Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03976
District Judge Ronnie Abrams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:13 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bill Bulcock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
No Logo Manuel Quintero Gomez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leanne Heine Solish +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lsolish@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
v.
No Logo Alan Shortall, Defendant
No Logo David C. Hastings, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul C. Curnin +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pcurnin@stblaw.com
Space Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
Space Christopher Gunn Lee +1 212 455 7601 +1 212 455 2502 cglee@stblaw.com
No Logo Dennis P. Pyers, Defendant
No Logo Jim Bosnjak, Defendant
No Logo John Ryan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul C. Curnin +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pcurnin@stblaw.com
Space Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
Space Christopher Gunn Lee +1 212 455 7601 +1 212 455 2502 cglee@stblaw.com
No Logo R. Richard Wieland II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul C. Curnin +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pcurnin@stblaw.com
Space Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
Space Christopher Gunn Lee +1 212 455 7601 +1 212 455 2502 cglee@stblaw.com
No Logo Unilife Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul C. Curnin +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pcurnin@stblaw.com
Space Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
Space Christopher Gunn Lee +1 212 455 7601 +1 212 455 2502 cglee@stblaw.com
No Logo Fred Assefi, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Manuel Antigua Gonzalez, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Richard Carrazza, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leanne Heine Solish +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lsolish@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda F. Szydlo +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 bszydlo@pomlaw.com
No Logo Richard Farino, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leanne Heine Solish +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lsolish@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda F. Szydlo +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 bszydlo@pomlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Unilife Corporation's ("Unilife") Notice of Bankruptcy, which indicates that Unilife filed a Chapter 11 petition in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware on April 12, 2017. See No. 16-cv-3976 (Dkt. 47). Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362, the above-captioned actions are automatically stayed. The parties shall submit a joint status report no later than June 14, 2017. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/14/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Bankruptcy. Document filed by David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II. (Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: 44 MOTION for Settlement [Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement].. Document filed by Bill Bulcock, Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino, Manuel Quintero Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION for Settlement [Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement]. . Document filed by Bill Bulcock, Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino, Manuel Quintero Gomez. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Settlement [Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement]. Document filed by Bill Bulcock, Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino, Manuel Quintero Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 42 Status Report filed by David C. Hastings, R. Richard Wieland II, Unilife Corporation, John Ryan. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The parties shall submit definitive settlement documentation, or a status report in lieu thereof, no later than March 22, 2017. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/16/2017) (cla) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          STATUS REPORT. Document filed by David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STATUS REPORT. Joint status report on the settlement proceedings pursuant to February 8, 2017 Order Document filed by David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 39 Letter Motion to Reopen Case. The Court is in receipt of Unilife Corporation's letter, dated February 7, 2017, requesting that the Court stay all deadlines and proceedings in the above-captioned actions. See No. 16-CV- 3976 (ECF No. 39). This request is granted, and the above-captioned actions are stayed. The parties shall submit a joint status report no later than March 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/08/2017) (ama) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and reiterate request for a stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Peter E. Kazanoff dated February 7, 2017. Document filed by David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. (As further set forth in this Order.) All pending motions are moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/3/2017) (cf) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines and proceedings addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Peter E. Kazanoff dated February 2, 2017. Document filed by David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 28 Amended Complaint, against Jim Bosnjak, Dennis P. Pyers, Alan Shortall, Unilife Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Manuel Quintero Gomez, Richard Farino, Richard Carrazza, Bill Bulcock. Related document: 28 Amended Complaint, filed by Richard Farino, Bill Bulcock, Richard Carrazza, Manuel Quintero Gomez.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, subject to the approval of the Court that: 1. Plaintiffs will have until December 16, 2016 to file a Second Amended Coi1solidatedComplaint ("SAC"); 2. Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the SAC no later than February 17, 2017; 3. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition thereto no later than April 19, 2017; and 4. Defendants shall file their reply no later than May 19, 2017. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2016., Motions due by 2/17/2017., Responses due by 4/19/2017, Replies due by 5/19/2017.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/12/2016) (cf) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dennis P. Pyers waiver sent on 11/18/2016, answer due 1/17/2017. Document filed by Manuel Quintero Gomez; Richard Farino; Richard Carrazza; Bill Bulcock. (Heine, Leanne) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Alan Shortall served on 11/10/2016, answer due 12/1/2016. Service was accepted by Defendant Alan Shortall. Document filed by Manuel Quintero Gomez; Richard Farino; Richard Carrazza; Bill Bulcock. (Heine, Leanne) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leanne H. Solish to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 29 Motion for Robert V. Prongay to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Leanne H. Solish to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12924097. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bill Bulcock, Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino, Manuel Quintero Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing)(Heine, Leanne) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Robert V. Prongay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12924063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bill Bulcock, Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino, Manuel Quintero Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing)(Prongay, Robert) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 12 Amended Complaint, against Jim Bosnjak, Dennis P. Pyers, Alan Shortall, Unilife Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Richard Farino, Richard Carrazza, Bill Bulcock, Manuel Quintero Gomez. Related document: 12 Amended Complaint, filed by Bill Bulcock.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER GRANTING RICHARD CARRAZZA AND RICHARD FARINO'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES, APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROY AL OF LEAD COUNSEL (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases 16-cv-3976 (as Lead Case) with 16-cv-3986; granting (17) Motion to Appoint Richard Carrazza and Richard Farino as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (17) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:16-cv-03976-RA. 1. The Motion is GRANTED; 2. The above-captioned actions are consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) as In re Unilife Corporation Securities Litigation, Master File No. 16-cv-03976- RA. 3. The Court, having considered the provisions of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, 15 U.S.C. §77z-l(a)(3)(B) and 15 U.S.C. §78u-4(a)(3)(B), appoints Richard Carrazza and Richard Farino as Lead Plaintiff; and 4. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. §77z-l(a)(3)(B)(v) and 15 U.S.C. §78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v), Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP are approved as Co-Lead Counsel for the Class. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/24/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03976-RA, 1:16-cv-03986-RA (cf) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Unilife Corporation.(Curnin, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brenda F. Szydlo on behalf of Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino. (Szydlo, Brenda) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino. (Hood, Joseph) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Alan Lieberman on behalf of Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Motion of Richard Carrazza and Richard Farino for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel and in Opposition to Competing Motions. Document filed by Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:16-cv-03976, 1:16-cv-03986 . MOTION to Appoint Fred Assefi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Fred Assefi. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Paul C. Curnin dated August, 8, 2016 re: Lead Plaintiff motions. Document filed by David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II.(Curnin, Paul) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support re: 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:16-cv-03976-RA and 1:16-cv-03986-RA . MOTION to Appoint Richard Carrazza and Richard Farino to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP.. Document filed by Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Movant Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit E - Pomerantz Firm Resume)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:16-cv-03976-RA and 1:16-cv-03986-RA . MOTION to Appoint Richard Carrazza and Richard Farino to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP. . Document filed by Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:16-cv-03976-RA and 1:16-cv-03986-RA ., MOTION to Appoint Richard Carrazza and Richard Farino to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP. Document filed by Richard Carrazza, Richard Farino. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DECLARATION of Matthew M. Guiney in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:16-cv-03976, 1:16-cv-03986 . MOTION to Appoint Fred Assefi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Fred Assefi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:16-cv-03976, 1:16-cv-03986 . MOTION to Appoint Fred Assefi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. . Document filed by Fred Assefi. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:16-cv-03976, 1:16-cv-03986 ., MOTION to Appoint Fred Assefi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by Fred Assefi.(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Moylan Guiney on behalf of Fred Assefi. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Jim Bosnjak, David C. Hastings, Dennis P. Pyers, John Ryan, Alan Shortall, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Bill Bulcock. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Bill Bulcock.(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David C. Hastings waiver sent on 7/13/2016, answer due 9/12/2016; John Ryan waiver sent on 7/13/2016, answer due 9/12/2016; Unilife Corporation waiver sent on 7/13/2016, answer due 9/12/2016; R. Richard Wieland II waiver sent on 7/13/2016, answer due 9/12/2016. Document filed by Bill Bulcock. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting 9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall notify the Court of the date on which class notice was published no later than July 20, 2016. The Court will schedule a conference to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation once it is so notified. Members of the purported class will have 60 days from the date class notice was published to move the Court to serve as lead plaintiff. Opposition to any motion for appointment of lead plaintiff shall be served and filed 14 days after any motions are made. In the event that more than one action on behalf of the class asserting substantially the same claim or claims has been filed, and any party has sought to consolidate those actions for pretrial purposes or for trial, the Court shall not appoint a lead plaintiff until after a decision on the motion to consolidate is rendered. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/14/2016) (cf) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Re: submission of joint letter, proposed case management plan and scheduling order, and Defendants' response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Paul C. Curnin dated July 14, 2016., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Paul C. Curnin dated July 14, 2016. Document filed by David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II.(Curnin, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Gunn Lee on behalf of David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II. (Lee, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Eric Kazanoff on behalf of David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II. (Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul C. Curnin on behalf of David C. Hastings, John Ryan, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II. (Curnin, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/8/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/1/2016) (cf) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jim Bosnjak, David C. Hastings, Dennis P. Pyers, John Ryan, Alan Shortall, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II. (dgo) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNILIFE CORPORATION, ALAN SHORTALL, JOHN RYAN, R. RICHARD WIELAND II, DENNIS P. PYERS, DAVID C. HASTINGS, and JIM BOSNJAK, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Bill Bulcock. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Jim Bosnjak, David C. Hastings, Dennis P. Pyers, John Ryan, Alan Shortall, Unilife Corporation, R. Richard Wieland II. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12350515)Document filed by Bill Bulcock.(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 341 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?