Reese et al v. A Russo Wrecking, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-03417
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 4:58 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christine M. Reese, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
No Logo Denis Reese, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
v.
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Earth & Envoronmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo H.P. Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hudson Meridian Construction Group, L.L.C., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Group"
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Moretrench American Corp., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Assicates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo WSP Cantor Seinuk, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011); (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(djc) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
    COMPLAINT against Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., H.P. Environmental, Koch Skanska Inc., Laquila Construction Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liberty Mutual Group, Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Hudson Meridian Construction Group, L.L.C., Moretrench American Corp., MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Pro Safety Services L.L.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Survivair, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Tishman Speyer Properties, Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Turner Construction Company, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Vollmer Assicates L.L.P., Weeks Marine, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties L.L.C., WSP Cantor Seinuk, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., AMEC Earth & Envoronmental, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 682826)Document filed by Denis Reese, Christine M. Reese.(laq) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 138 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?