MARINO v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:16-cv-00550
District Judge Elaine D. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 12:23 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MICHELLE MARINO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by RR 3 Box 3471

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHELLE MARINO +1 573 223 2199
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. MacGriff +1 202 305 3689 +1 202 305 1571 scott.macgriff@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. MacGriff for USA. Service: 5/11/2016. (dw) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (dw) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by MICHELLE MARINO. Service: 5/4/2016. Response due by 5/23/2016. (dw) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by MICHELLE MARINO. Answer due by 7/5/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Eligibility, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dw) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 124 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?