Diamond Falls Estates, LLC v. Nantahala Bank & Trust Company
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-2210

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 5:36 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John A. Moore for Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC.[1000008808] [15-2210] Michael Rosier
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC. Counsel arguing: John A. Moore Opening argument time: 15 Rebuttal argument time: 5 [1000007451] [15-2210] Michael Rosier
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Nantahala Bank & Trust Company. Counsel arguing: Esther E. Manheimer Answering argument time: 20 minutes [1000006616] [15-2210] Esther Manheimer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 03/21/2017. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [15-2210] (JLC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 3/21/17 - 3/24/17 argument session. Additional copies due: 12/21/2016. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 12/26/2016. [15-2210] (JLC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE ISSUED RE: Rule 34 pre-argument review. [15-2210] (MH)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
              BRIEF by Appellee Nantahala Bank & Trust Company in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/06/2016. [999814187] [15-2210] Esther Manheimer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/29/2016. [999783873] [15-2210] Michael Rosier
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                  BRIEF by Appellants Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/29/2016. [999783798] [15-2210] Michael Rosier
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                    ORDER filed [999764428] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 03/31/2016. Response brief due 05/05/2016 Copies to all parties.. [15-2210] (DL)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                      ORDER filed [999739582] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 3/1/2016, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 03/01/2016. Response brief due 04/05/2016. Copies to all parties. [15-2210] (SAW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
                        ORDER filed [999721319] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 2/1/16, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/01/2016. Response brief due 03/07/2016. Copies to all parties. [15-2210] (BHR)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                          COURT ORDER filed [999707245] denying Motion for stay pending appeal [10] Copies to all parties.. [15-2210] (TF)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                            ORDER filed [999698992] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/14/2016. Response brief due 02/18/2016, extending filing time for opening brief until 1/14/16. Copies to all parties. [15-2210] (SAW)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE/ANSWER by Nantahala Bank & Trust Company to Motion for stay pending appeal [10]. Nature of response: in opposition. [15-2210] Esther Manheimer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                ORDER filed [999695509] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 11/30/2015. Response brief due 01/04/2016 Copies to all parties.. [15-2210] (DL)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE ISSUED to Ms. Esther Elizabeth Manheimer for Nantahala Bank & Trust Company requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [10]Response due: 11/12/2015.[999693298]. Mailed to: J. Moore. [15-2210] (SAW)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                    Emergency MOTION by Appellants Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 11/04/2015 US mail, ecf. [999693208] [15-2210] Michael Rosier
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-2210] (MRB)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC. [15-2210] Michael Rosier
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999687154] [15-2210] Michael Rosier
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael S. Rosier for Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC.[999687152] [15-2210] Michael Rosier
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Nantahala Bank & Trust Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999678692] [15-2210] Esther Manheimer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Esther E. Manheimer for Nantahala Bank & Trust Company.[999677728] [15-2210] Esther Manheimer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: J. Moore. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/18/2015. Response Brief due 12/21/2015 [15-2210] (SAW)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00007-MR-DLH. Mailed to: J. Moore. [15-2210] (SAW)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00007-MR-DLH. Case manager: SWiley. [15-2210] (SAW)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 268 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?