Vocatura's Bakery, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Federal Court Proceeding Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:16-mc-00147
District Judge Robert N. Chatigny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 12:43 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vocatura's Bakery, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel L. Alban +1 703 682 9320 +1 703 682 9321 dalban@ij.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Everett Johnson +1 703 682 9320 rjohnson@ij.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Shipman & Goodwin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G Chase +1 860 251 5194 +1 860 251 5219 mchase@goodwin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross H. Garber +1 860 251 5901 +1 860 251 5219 rgarber@goodwin.com
v.
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"
No Logo John Koskinen, Defendant
No Logo Lynch, Loretta E., Defendant
Officially listed as "Loretta Lynch"
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Alban on behalf of Vocatura's Bakery, Inc. (Alban, Daniel) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnson on behalf of Vocatura's Bakery, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
      ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert E. Johnson and Daniel L. Alban. Signed by Clerk on 5/26/16. (Sundie, T) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez for all pretrial matters excluding trial, unless the parties consent to trial before the magistrate judge including 1 MOTION for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/24/16. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
          MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert E. Johnson and Daniel L. Alban to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4010951) by Vocatura's Bakery, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Garber, Ross) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
            Docket Entry Correction re 3 Electronic Summons Issued, Summons did not upload. Reissued summons as docket entry 4 . (Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Internal Revenue Service, John Koskinen, Loretta Lynch, USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Michael G Chase* *Shipman & Goodwin LLP* *One Constitution Plaza* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                ERROR UPLOADING SUMMONS ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Internal Revenue Service, John Koskinen, Loretta Lynch, USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Michael G. Chase* *Shipman & Goodwin LLP* *One Constitution Plaza* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Nuzzi, T) Modified on 5/24/2016 (Nuzzi, T). (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/24/2016.(Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Return of Property by Vocatura's Bakery, Inc. (Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 81 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?