Deep Green Wireless LLC v. Ooma, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00604
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 9:17 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deep Green Wireless LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Wizenfeld +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 charles.wizenfeld@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Ooma, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None case transferred out - district transfer
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Expedite
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Charles Wizenfeld on behalf of Deep Green Wireless LLC (Wizenfeld, Charles) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Ooma, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deep Green Wireless LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Deep Green Wireless LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Patent Corporation for Deep Green Wireless LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Ooma, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5779850.), filed by Deep Green Wireless LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ' 714 Patent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?