Montague v. Yale University et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00885
District Judge Alfred V. Covello, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 24, 2019 at 10:35 AM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jack Montague, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacobs & Dow, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F. Dow, III +1 203 772 3100 +1 203 772 1691 wdow@jacobslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Katz +1 203 772 3100 +1 203 772 1691 jkatz@jacobslaw.com
v.
No Logo Angela Gleason, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen Noonan Davis +1 203 458 9168 cdavis@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Jason Killheffer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen Noonan Davis +1 203 458 9168 cdavis@ddnctlaw.com
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mark Centers Trust
Unknown Role, JBG SMITH Properties
Unknown Role, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen Noonan Davis +1 203 458 9168 cdavis@ddnctlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (164) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Calendar Entry
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Additional Authority
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Seal
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 120 joint motion to amend/correct. The scheduling order is modified as follows: depositions of the plaintiff's expert witnesses shall be completed on or before January 9, 2018; the defendant's disclosure of expert witnesses shall be completed on or before February 16, 2018; depositions of the defendant's expert witnesses shall be completed on or before April 20, 2018; dispositive motions shall be filed on or before May 18, 2018; the joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before September 5, 2018; this case shall be trial ready thereafter. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on November 1, 2017. (Kontyko, K.) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 114 Order,, Current Scheduling Order by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University.Responses due by 11/21/2017 (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories by Jack Montague.Responses due by 11/20/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE by Yale University of Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Request for Production of Documents (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University of Service of Third Set of Requests for Proeduction (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 115 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney James D. Flynn terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 5, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION for James D. Flynn to Withdraw as Attorney by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER. The joint stipulation is noted and so ordered. The scheduling order is modified as follows: The plaintiff shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts on or before August 18, 2017, and depositions of any such experts shall be completed by October 20, 2017; the defendants shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts on or before November 24, 2017, and depositions of any such experts shall be completed by February 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 30, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION and Request to Amend Scheduling Order by Jack Montague. (Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 102 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christian G. Kiely to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4443735) by Jack Montague. (Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christian G. Kiely on behalf of Jack Montague (Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 106 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney James M. Sconzo terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 27, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 105 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney John W. Herrington terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 27, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 103 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 26, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 102 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/22/2017. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2017. (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for James M. Sconzo to Withdraw as Attorney by Others Unknown. (Sconzo, James)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION for John W. Herrington to Withdraw as Attorney by Others Unknown. (Herrington, John)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 86 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents and Request for Hearing filed by Jack Montague. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jack Montague. (Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Christian G. Kiely to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4443735) by Jack Montague. (Dow, William)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 99 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendant Yale University to respond to the plaintiff's third set of interrogatories and requests for production is extended to and including June 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 19, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 98 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Hillary Lehmann terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 19, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2017 to respond and object to 3rd Set of Interrogatories by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jack Montague Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Hillary Lehmann (Lehmann, Hillary) Modified on 6/19/2017 to convert to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Hushin, Z.).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 95 motion for extension of time. The time for the plaintiff to reply to the defendants' opposition to the plaintiff's combined motion and memorandum in support of motion to compel production of improperly withheld documents is extended to and including June 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 13, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION re 86 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents and Request for Hearing by Others Unknown. (Herrington, John)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/22/2017 for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel 86 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents and Request for Hearing by Jack Montague. (Lehmann, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 93 motion for extension of time. The time for Sally Roe to respond to the plaintiff's combined motion and memorandum in support of motion to compel production of improperly withheld documents is extended to and including June 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on June 8, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until June 12, 2017 for Sally Roe, Non-Party Witness, to Respond 86 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents and Request for Hearing by Others Unknown. (Herrington, John)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John Warren Herrington on behalf of Others Unknown Sally Roe, Non-Party Witness (Herrington, John)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Sconzo on behalf of Others Unknown Sally Roe, Non-Party Witness (Sconzo, James)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 86 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents and Request for Hearing filed by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT by Jack Montague re 86 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents and Request for Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Lehmann, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 87 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on May 15, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Seal by Jack Montague. (Lehmann, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Improperly Withheld Documents and Request for Hearing by Jack Montague.Responses due by 6/2/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 84 motion to amend/correct. The scheduling order is modified as follows: all discovery, including depositions of all witnesses, shall be completed by February 1, 2018; the parties shall complete all fact discovery by June 30, 2017; the plaintiff shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts on or before July 3, 2017, and depositions of any such experts shall be completed by October 2, 2017; the defendants shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts on or before November 1, 2017, and depositions of any such experts shall be completed by February 1, 2018; the parties shall file dispositive motions, if necessary, on or before March 30, 2018; the parties shall file a joint trial memorandum in accordance with the standing order regarding trial memoranda on or before April 30, 2018; the case shall be ready for trial by May 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on April 7, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION And Request To Enlarge Scheduling Order by Jack Montague. (Lehmann, Hillary) Modified on 4/6/2017 to convert document to motion (Hushin, Z.).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint with Special Defenses. by Jason Killheffer.(Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint with Special Defenses. by Angela Gleason.(Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER finding as moot 34 motion to bifurcate, in light of the court's ruling (doc. no. 78). Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on March 21, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER finding as moot 56 motion for hearing on preliminary injunction, in light of the court's ruling (doc. no. 78). Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on March 20, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint with Special Defenses. by Yale University.(Davis, Colleen)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      RULING on the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction denying 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/8/2017. (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 76 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendants to respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint is extended to and including March 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on March 2, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until March 17, 2017 to file a response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 70 motion to compel. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on February 1, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 72 motion to withdraw. The court will consider the defendants' memorandum of law in opposition to the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (doc. no. 53) without reference to the affidavit of Colleen Davis. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on February 1, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 70 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Affidavit of Colleen Davis (No. 65) and Request for Fees and Costs filed by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw 65 Sealed Document Affidavit of Colleen Davis with exhibits by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 68 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 27, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Affidavit of Colleen Davis (No. 65) and Request for Fees and Costs by Jack Montague.Responses due by 2/16/2017 (Deal, Alexandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jack Montague. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Exhibit 22, # 6 Exhibit 23, # 7 Exhibit 24, # 8 Exhibit 25)(Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jack Montague. (Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jack Montague. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 49 motion to amend/correct; order withdrawing document number 30 . The plaintiff is directed to docket the amended complaint as a separate document. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 24, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document: Affidavit of Colleen Davis by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University . (Davis, Colleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT AA to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction dated January 11, 2017 by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University re 53 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER sealing document number 60 . Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 23, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 61 motion to withdraw. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 23, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw 60 Exhibit, by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITHDRAWN: EXHIBIT AA to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction dated January 11, 2017 by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University re 53 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,. (Flynn, James) Modified on 1/23/2017 to withdraw pursuant to ORDER 62 (Hushin, Z.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 54 motion to strike. The court accepts [document no. 53] as a sur-reply in response to [document no. 40]. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 19, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 52 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 19, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 51 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 19, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Request) by Jack Montague.Responses due by 2/8/2017 (Lehmann, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Strike 53 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, for Preliminary Injunction filed by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 53 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, for Preliminary Injunction by Jack Montague.Responses due by 2/2/2017 (Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L, # 7 Exhibit M, # 8 Exhibit N, # 9 Exhibit O, # 10 Exhibit P, # 11 Exhibit Q, # 12 Exhibit R (to be filed under seal), # 13 Exhibit S, # 14 Exhibit T, # 15 Exhibit U, # 16 Exhibit V, # 17 Exhibit W, # 18 Exhibit X, # 19 Exhibit Y, # 20 Exhibit Z)(Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Affidavit of Colleen Davis by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Davis, Colleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER vacating 47 order on consent motion for referral, 48 order referring case to magistrate judge. The court will issue a decision regarding the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction forthwith. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 11, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint Motion to Withdraw First Motion to Amend Complaint (3) and Unobjected -To Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jack Montague.Responses due by 1/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for conference. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 6, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 46 consent motion for referral. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 6, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Consent Motion For Referral to Magistrate Thomas Smith by Jack Montague.Responses due by 1/26/2017 (Dow, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 44 motion for extension of time. The time for the parties to amend the pleadings is extended to and including January 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 3, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 10, 2017 For Parties to Amend the Pleadings by Jack Montague. (Lehmann, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 42 motion for extension of time. The time for the plaintiff to respond to the defendant's interrogatories and requests for production is extended to and including January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on December 27, 2016. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 13, 2017 To Respond and Object to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff by Jack Montague. (Lehmann, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to Request for Production Attached to Subpoena filed by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re 34 MOTION to Bifurcate Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jack Montague. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 38 consent motion for leave to file consolidated pleading. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/06/2016. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION The court grant the Plaintiff's Motion to file a consolidated pleading and to set the time for filing to December 12, 2016 re 34 MOTION to Bifurcate Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Unobjected to by Jack Montague.Responses due by 12/23/2016 (Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 33 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendant, Angela Gleason, to respond to the plaintiff's first request for production of documents is extended to and including December 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on November 23, 2016. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re 34 MOTION to Bifurcate Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Bifurcate Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University.Responses due by 12/12/2016 (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until December 5, 2016 to respond and object to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Angela Gleason by Angela Gleason. (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James Daniel Flynn on behalf of Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University (Flynn, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jack Montague.Responses due by 11/21/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Stern, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Jack Montague.Responses due by 11/21/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stern, Max) Modified on 1/25/2017 to correct term date (Hushin, Z.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Yale University.(Davis, Colleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Jason Killheffer.(Davis, Colleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Angela Gleason.(Davis, Colleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/2/2017 Discovery due by 11/1/2017 Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2017 Trial Brief due by 1/31/2018 Trial Ready Date 2/1/2018 Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/12/2016.(Alexander, R.) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Deal, Alexandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 22 motion for extension of time to and including 09/17/16, within which to plead. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/09/16. (Codeanne, K.) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2016 to Plead by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2016. (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until September 7, 2016 file a response to complaint by Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alexandra H. Deal to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034632) by Jack Montague. (Deal, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra H. Deal on behalf of Jack Montague (Deal, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Max D. Stern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034624) by Jack Montague. (Stern, Max) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hillary Lehmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034596) by Jack Montague. (Lehmann, Hillary) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Lehmann on behalf of Jack Montague (Lehmann, Hillary) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Max D. Stern on behalf of Jack Montague (Stern, Max) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificates of Good Standing due by 8/16/2016. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2016. (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Alexandra H. Deal to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034632) by Jack Montague. (Dow, William) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney(s) Max D. Stern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034624) by Jack Montague. (Dow, William) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) Hillary Lehmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034596) by Jack Montague. (Dow, William) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jason Killheffer waiver sent on 6/9/2016, answer due 8/8/2016; Angela Gleason waiver sent on 6/9/2016, answer due 8/8/2016; Yale University waiver sent on 6/9/2016, answer due 8/8/2016 filed by Jack Montague. (Katz, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Doyle Davis on behalf of Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University (Davis, Colleen) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Angela Gleason, Jason Killheffer, Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William F. Dow, III* *Jacobs & Dow, LLC* *350 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06503-0606*. (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jack Montague, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by Jack Montague Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2016.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 6/9/2016.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/9/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2016 Discovery due by 12/9/2016 Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2016.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Katz on behalf of Jack Montague (Katz, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4027626.), filed by Jack Montague.(Dow, William) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,610 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?