Board of Education of the Highland Local School District v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00524
District Judge Algenon L. Marbley, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 6, 2021 at 2:40 PM DT (6.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Board of Education of the Highland Local School District, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Campbell +1 480 444 0020 +1 480 444 0028 jcampbell@alliancedefendingfreedom.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J Burton +1 419 522 2889 +1 419 525 4666 aburton@rwblawoffice.com
Space Sean T. Koran +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 skoran@mcgownmarkling.com
Space Matthew John Markling +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 mmarkling@mcgownmarkling.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Langdon Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Langdon +1 513 733 1038 +1 513 577 7383 dlangdon@langdonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgownmarkling.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Vrobel +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 pvrobel@mcgownmarkling.com
v.
No Logo Hon. Loretta E. Lynch, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov
No Logo John B King, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov
No Logo State of Arkansas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Education"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov
No Logo Vanita Gupta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov
No Logo Alabama, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Georgia, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Governor Phil Bryant, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Kentucky Commonwealth of, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Louisiana, State of, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo State of Arizona, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo State Of Nebraska, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo State of Ohio, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Ohio Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric E. Murphy +1 614 466 8980 eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Dickson Nelson +1 614 728 4947 frederick.nelson@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
No Logo State of South Carolina, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo State of Texas, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo State of Utah, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo State of Wisconsin, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo West Virginia State of, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Highland Local School District, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean T. Koran +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 skoran@mcgownmarkling.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Markling +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 mmarkling@mcgownmarkling.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Vrobel +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 pvrobel@mcgownmarkling.com
No Logo Shawn Winkelfoos, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean T. Koran +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 skoran@mcgownmarkling.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Markling +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 mmarkling@mcgownmarkling.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Vrobel +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 pvrobel@mcgownmarkling.com
No Logo William Dodds, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean T. Koran +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 skoran@mcgownmarkling.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Markling +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 mmarkling@mcgownmarkling.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Vrobel +1 330 670 0005 +1 330 670 0002 pvrobel@mcgownmarkling.com
No Logo Jane Doe, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jyotin Hamid +1 212 909 6000 jhamid@debevoise.com
TERMINATED: 08/15/2016, PRO HAC VICE Matthew Ray Hartz +1 212 909 6000 mhartz@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Mintz +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 jfmintz@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph William Weissman +1 212 909 6999 jweissman@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek Wikstrom

Toggle Switch Represented by Hickman & Lowder Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Richard Harrison +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 jharrison@hickman-lowder.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda M. Italiano Gorczynski +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 lgorczynski@hickman-lowder.com

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asaf Orr aorr@nclrights.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
No Logo John Doe, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jyotin Hamid +1 212 909 6000 jhamid@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Mintz +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 jfmintz@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph William Weissman +1 212 909 6999 jweissman@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek Wikstrom

Toggle Switch Represented by Hickman & Lowder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Richard Harrison +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 jharrison@hickman-lowder.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HICKMAN & LOWDER, L.PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda M. Italiano Gorczynski +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 lgorczynski@hickman-lowder.com

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asaf Orr aorr@nclrights.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
No Logo Joyce Doe, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jyotin Hamid +1 212 909 6000 jhamid@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Mintz +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 jfmintz@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph William Weissman +1 212 909 6999 jweissman@debevoise.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek Wikstrom

Toggle Switch Represented by Hickman & Lowder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Richard Harrison +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 jharrison@hickman-lowder.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HICKMAN & LOWDER, L.PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda M. Italiano Gorczynski +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 lgorczynski@hickman-lowder.com

Toggle Switch Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asaf Orr aorr@nclrights.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (140) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Seal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/26/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Answer to Third Party Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CERTIFICATE of Clerk. Certified mailing of summons and 32 INTERVENOR THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. (pes) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Responses to the Motion to Stay shall be filed not later than close of business on 10/12/2016. Reply briefs will not be necessary, except by leave of court. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/5/2016. (cw) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            BRIEF re 102 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District, ThirdParty Defendant Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Shawn Winkelfoos) (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District, ThirdParty Defendant Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE by Amicus SCHOOL ADMINISTRATORS FROM CALIFORNIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FLORIDA, ILLINOIS, KENTUCKY, MAINE, MASSACHUSETTS, MICHIGAN, MINNESOTA, NEVADA, NEW HAMPSHIRE, NEW JERSEY, NEW YORK, NORTH CAROLINA, OREGON re 95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, Amici Curiae Brief of School Administrators in Support of Intervenor Third-Party Plaintiff Jane Doe's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A: Amici Background and Experience) (Robertson, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Parties State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, Phil Bryant, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Louisiana, State of Ohio, State of West Virginia, State Of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wisconsin re 95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, Amicus Brief of States in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Nimocks, Austin) Modified text on 9/27/2016 (sem). (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven O'Ban. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/27/2016. (pes) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL re 95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, (FILING FEE DUE) by Third Party Defendants Board of Education of the Highland Local School District, William Dodds, Shawn Winkelfoos. (Markling, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL re 95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number 0648-5670005) by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 36 Sealed Motion; granting 53 Motion for Leave to File; denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 86 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/26/2016. (cw) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Transcript of Oral Argument Proceedings held on September 20, 2016, before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawna J. Evans, Telephone number 614-719-3316. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 10/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2016. (Evans, Shawna) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              For good cause shown, Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant Board of Education of the Highland Local School District's ("Highland") Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED. (Doc. 92). Highland shall have until October 31, 2016 to respond to the Complaint filed by Third-Party Plaintiff Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/26/2016. (KAJ) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 32 Third Party Complaint New date requested 10/31/2016. by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District, ThirdParty Defendant Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Jane Doe's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction / Reply Declaration of Diane Ehrensaft, Ph.D. filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Harrison, John) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 82 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/13/2016. (cw) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Response (non motion)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Response re 74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Response to Jane Doe's Memorandum in Opposition to an Evidentiary Hearing by Third Party Defendants Board of Education of the Highland Local School District, William Dodds, Shawn Winkelfoos. (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/11/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Response (non motion)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Jane Doe's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Third Party Defendants William Dodds, Shawn Winkelfoos. (Markling, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 61 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Parent S by ThirdParty Defendant Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re 61 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of S.B. by ThirdParty Defendant Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 61 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Parent H by ThirdParty Defendant Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Langdon, David) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Jane Doe's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re 28 Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Joyce Doe Declaration and Supporting Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 3 - Hill Declaration, # 3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Jane Doe's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction) (Harrison, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Jane Doe's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by ThirdParty Plaintiff Jane Doe. Responses due by 9/9/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Jane Doe Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Joyce Doe Declaration and Supporting Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Hill Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4- Dr. Ehrensaft Expert Declaration and Supporting Exhibits, # 5 Memorandum of Law in Support of Jane Doe's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction) (Harrison, John) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Third Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INTERVENOR THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Board of Education of the Highland Local School District, William Dodds, Highland Local School District, Shawn Winkelfoos, filed by John Doe, Joyce Doe, Jane Doe. (pes) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing reset for 9/20/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING 22 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Jane Doe's Motions to Intervene and for Leave to Proceed Pseudonysmously. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/27/2016. (cw) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Jane Doe's Motions to Intervene and for Leave to Proceed Pseudonysmously by Movants Jane Doe, John Doe, Joyce Doe. Responses due by 8/19/2016 (Harrison, John) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 17 and 18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Stoll, Asaf Orr, Jyotin Hamid, Joseph Weissman, Jennifer Mintz, Derek Wikstrom and Matthew Hartz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/22/2016. (pes) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intervenor Parties Jane Doe, John Doe, Joyce Doe re 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jyotin Hamid, Joseph Weissman, Jennifer Mintz, Derek Wikstrom, Matthew Hartz (Filing fee $ 1000, receipt number 0648-5584521), 16 MOTION Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously re 15 MOTION to Intervene as Third-Party Plaintiff , 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Stoll, Asaf Orr (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0648-5584578), 15 MOTION to Intervene as Third-Party Plaintiff (Harrison, John) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants on 06/30/2016, filed by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Connelly, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Stoll, Asaf Orr (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0648-5584578) by Intervenor Parties Jane Doe, John Doe, Joyce Doe. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Harrison, John) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jyotin Hamid, Joseph Weissman, Jennifer Mintz, Derek Wikstrom, Matthew Hartz (Filing fee $ 1000, receipt number 0648-5584521) by Intervenor Parties Jane Doe, John Doe, Joyce Doe. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Harrison, John) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously re 15 MOTION to Intervene as Third-Party Plaintiff by Intervenor Parties Jane Doe, John Doe, Joyce Doe. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Harrison, John) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene as Third-Party Plaintiff by Intervenor Parties Jane Doe, Joyce Doe, John Doe. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Verified Complaint-in-Intervention) (Harrison, John) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDERre 8 and 9 U.S. Post Office Domestic return receipt received in the Clerks Office. Plaintiff is directed to provide the Court with proof of service, as required by Rule 4(l)(1), within the time limit specified in Rule 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/20/2016. (pes) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - re 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by Board of Education of the Highland Local School District Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley.. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/19/16. (kn) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/19/2016 @ 03:30 PM in Teleconference before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Parties have been provided with the call in information via email. (kn) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Highland Local School District's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus State of Ohio. Responses due by 8/11/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State of Ohio Amicus Brief in Support of Highland Local School District's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Nelson, Frederick) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. Responses due by 8/8/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dodds Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Burton Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Dear Colleague Letter, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Resolution Letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 3-30-16 Email, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 5-13-16 Email, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Letter of Impasse, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter of Findings, # 9 Exhibit 9 - APA Article, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Shupe Order, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Oregonian Article, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Final Bulletin) (Campbell, James) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      U.S. Post Office Domestic return receipt received in the Clerk's Office, addressed to U.S. Dept. of Education, John B. King, Jr., U.S. Department of Justice, Loretta E. Lynch, Loretta E. Lynch and Vanita Gupta. (mas) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Vanita Gupta, John B King, Jr, Loretta E. Lynch, NA, U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pes) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          U.S. Post Office Domestic return receipt received in the Clerk's Office, addressed to Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office, 303 Marconi Blvd., Columbus, Ohio 43215. (pes) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Campbell, James) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 4 , 5 , and 6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeana Hallock, Kenneth Connelly, J. Matthew Sharp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/24/2016. (agm) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Matthew Sharp (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5548996) by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Campbell, James) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth Connelly (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5548994) by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Campbell, James) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeana Hallock (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5548985) by Plaintiff Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Campbell, James) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5531173), filed by Board of Education of the Highland Local School District. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Form, # 3 Summons Form, # 4 Summons Form, # 5 Summons Form, # 6 Summons Form) (Campbell, James) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 325 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?