Max Hattler v. Lorin Ashton et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-04099-JAK-KS
District Judge John A. Kronstadt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 11, 2020 at 2:56 PM DT (9.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dr. Max Hattler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Doniger Burroughs APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Scott A Burroughs +1 310 570 1820 +1 310 417 3538 scott@donigerlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Doniger +1 310 590 1820 +1 310 417 3538 stephen@donigerlawfirm.com
an individual Justin M Gomes +1 310 590 1820 jgomes@donigerlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Trevor William Barrett +1 310 590 1820 +1 310 417 3538 tbarrett@donigerlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Amorphous Music, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bassnectar Touring, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Lorin Ashton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually

doing business asBassnectar Joseph Charles Gratz +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 jgratz@durietangri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually

doing business asBassnectar Marcia Clare Hofmann +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 marcia@eff.org
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE[47] by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah)
    LREF
    Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Stipulation to Dismiss Case
    STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Max Hattler. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen)
    LREF
    Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
    REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # (1) Order) (ah)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (ah)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
      MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail M. Title: Mediation held on May 9, 2017, and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judges deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case.(Killefer, Gail)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
          NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail M. Title has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
            MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [27] held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The motion hearing is held. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to grant Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (the Motion). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. Counsel report that they have been engaged in settlement discussions and a final ruling on the Motion will help facilitate further discussions in an effort to settle the matter. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (cr)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
              STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Gail Migdal Title, Esq. may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Max Hattler(Doniger, Stephen)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)Court Filing
                ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than May 31, 2017. Status Conference set for June 19, 2017 at 1:30 pm before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The scheduling conference is held. The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case and the parties' January 25, 2017 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2017. Discovery cut-off 8/28/2017. Motions due by 10/9/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/31/2017. Status Conference set for 6/19/2017 at 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for further details. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (cr) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Scheduling Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
                    MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The scheduling conference is held. The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case and the parties' January 25, 2017 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2017. Discovery cut-off 8/28/2017. Motions due by 10/9/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/31/2017. Status Conference set for 6/19/2017 at 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for further details. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (cr)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                      JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Max Hattler.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Doniger, Stephen)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Report due by 1/27/2017., Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2017 at 01:30 PM. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Report due by 1/27/2017., Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2017 at 01:30 PM. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                            (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. [27]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from January 23, 2017 to March 20, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be advanced if an earlier date becomes available. Counsel shall deliver a courtesy copy of the motion and related filings to the 4th Floor of the First Street Courthouse by January 18, 2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                              STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ake)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV16-04099 JAK (KSx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials GHK on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Chief District Judge Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                                  ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#17-018) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that this case be reassigned from the calendar of George H. King to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-04099 JAK(KSx). (rn)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#17-018) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that this case be reassigned from the calendar of George H. King to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-04099 JAK(KSx). (rn) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Reply (Motion related)
                                      REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [27] filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                        OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [27] filed by Plaintiff Max Hattler. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 notice of motionCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [27] filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gratz, Joseph)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Errata
                                            NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [27] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Gratz, Joseph)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016, Terminated: 4/20/2017 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Proposed Order) (Gratz, Joseph)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition[13], filed by plaintiff Max Hattler (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit (A), # (2) Exhibit (B), # (3) Exhibit (C))(Burroughs, Scott)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                  (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER re: Motion to Dismiss by Judge George H. King [17]. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Should Plaintiff elect to file a Second Amended Complaint ("SAC") in conformity with this Order, it SHALL do so within 30 days hereof. Defendants shall respond to the SAC within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's failure to file a SAC will be deemed its admission that amendment of the dismissed claims is futile. In that event, Defendants SHALL file an Answer to the remaining claims within 14 days thereof. All other aspects and claims to the FAC will then be dismissed with prejudice. (pso)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King: On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. [17]), noticed for hearing on 10/24/2016, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (jp)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King: On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. 17 ), noticed for hearing on 10/24/2016, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date pursuant to Local Rule 7-15. No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (jp) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Reply (Motion related)
                                                        REPLY In support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [17] filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Max Hattler, upon Defendant Bassnectar Touring, Inc. served on 9/30/2016, answer due 10/21/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mary Quinn, Legal Assistant, authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                            OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [17] filed by Plaintiff Max Hattler. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Max Hattler, upon Defendant Lorin Ashton served on 9/25/2016, answer due 10/17/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Phil Sarna, Business Manager, authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Max Hattler, upon Defendant Amorphous Music, Inc. served on 9/12/2016, answer due 10/3/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ashley Berg, person authorized to receive in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [17] filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Gratz, Joseph)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016, Terminated: 10/27/2016 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Proposed Order) (Gratz, Joseph)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                      Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Bassnectar Touring, Inc., (Attorney Joseph Charles Gratz added to party Amorphous Music, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Charles Gratz added to party Bassnectar Touring, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gratz, Joseph)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Summons issued
                                                                        21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint [13] as to Defendants Amorphous Music, Inc., Lorin Ashton, Bassnectar Touring, Inc., Does. (bm)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Summons Request
                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition[13] filed by Plaintiff Max Hattler. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by plaintiff Max Hattler (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit (A), # (2) Exhibit (B))(Burroughs, Scott)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                              Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lorin Ashton, identifying Lorin Ashton (Defendant) and Bassnectar Touring, Inc. (Business entity associated with Defendant). (Gratz, Joseph)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lorin Ashton answer now due 8/31/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Defendant Lorin Ashton.(Gratz, Joseph)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marcia Hofmann counsel for Defendant Lorin Ashton. Adding Marcia Hofmann as counsel of record for Defendant Lorin Ashton d/b/a Bassnectar for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Lorin Ashton d/b/a Bassnectar. (Attorney Marcia Hofmann added to party Lorin Ashton(pty:dft))(Hofmann, Marcia)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Charles Gratz counsel for Defendant Lorin Ashton. Adding Joseph C. Gratz as counsel of record for Defendant Lorin Ashton d/b/a Bassnectar for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Lorin Ashton d/b/a Bassnectar. (Attorney Joseph Charles Gratz added to party Lorin Ashton(pty:dft))(Gratz, Joseph)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT by Judge George H. King: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Chief Judge George H. King. The court fully adheres to Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which, as amended as of December 1, 2015, requires that the Rules be "construed, administered, and employed by the court and the parties to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding." Counsel shall also be guided by the following special requirements, some of which are more specific than those set out in the Local Rules: (see document for further details) (bm)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: 6/10/2016 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                        21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) [1] as to Defendant Lorin Ashton. (et)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: 6/10/2016 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dr. Max Hattler. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)
                                                                                              REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Dr. Max Hattler. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Summons Request
                                                                                                Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Dr. Max Hattler. (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dr. Max Hattler, (Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17971587 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dr. Max Hattler. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Dr. Max Hattler(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 671 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?