Fujinomaki v. Google, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-03137
Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 8, 2019 at 8:23 PM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ryujin Fujinomaki, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haltom & Doan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Alexander Latchford +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 slatchford@haltomdoan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Clayton Juren +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 matthew@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Donald Puckett +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 puckett@nelbum.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ajit Dang +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 dang@fr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane J Du +1 214 292 4073 +1 214 747 2091 jjdu@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thad Kodish +1 404 892 5005 tkodish@fr.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co Ltd"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ajit Dang +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 dang@fr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane J Du +1 214 292 4073 +1 214 747 2091 jjdu@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thad Kodish +1 404 892 5005 tkodish@fr.com
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015 Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015 Ajit Dang +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 dang@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE Jane J Du +1 214 292 4073 +1 214 747 2091 jjdu@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015 Thad Kodish +1 404 892 5005 tkodish@fr.com
v.
No Logo Asus Computer International Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2016 Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2016 Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus A Barber +1 404 260 6080 +1 404 260 6081 mbarber@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy L. Jones +1 650 453 5418 djones@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather S. Kim +1 650 453 5419 hkim@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AARON H. MARKS +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 amarks@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Shaw , +1 650 453 5410 jshaw@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Downing jdowning@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Translang Technology Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Esha Bandyopadhyay +1 650 521 5930 +1 650 521 5931 bandy@turnerboyd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Michael Masur +1 650 521 5935 +1 650 521 5931 masur@turnerboyd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keeley I Vega +1 650 521 5939 +1 650 521 5931 vega@turnerboyd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP-Mountain View

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen I. Boyd +1 650 521 5930 +1 650 521 5931 boyd@turnerboyd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2016 Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Asutek Computer Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2016 Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2016 Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus A Barber +1 404 260 6080 +1 404 260 6081 mbarber@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy L. Jones +1 650 453 5418 djones@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather S. Kim +1 650 453 5419 hkim@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AARON H. MARKS +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 amarks@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Shaw , +1 650 453 5410 jshaw@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Downing jdowning@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Esha Bandyopadhyay +1 650 521 5930 +1 650 521 5931 bandy@turnerboyd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Michael Masur +1 650 521 5935 +1 650 521 5931 masur@turnerboyd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keeley I Vega +1 650 521 5939 +1 650 521 5931 vega@turnerboyd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP-Mountain View

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen I. Boyd +1 650 521 5930 +1 650 521 5931 boyd@turnerboyd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2016 Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus A Barber +1 404 260 6080 +1 404 260 6081 mbarber@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy L. Jones +1 650 453 5418 djones@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather S. Kim +1 650 453 5419 hkim@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AARON H. MARKS +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 amarks@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Shaw , +1 650 453 5410 jshaw@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Downing jdowning@kasowitz.com
Huawei Technologies Company, Ltd. Huawei Technologies Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KD Shull +1 469 585 5461 kd.shull@huawei.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew William Stinson +1 903 510 5277 +1 903 597 2413 andys@rameyflock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TWO PRUDENTIAL PLAZA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Airan +1 312 616 5600 dairan@leydig.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H Michael Hartmann +1 312 616 5600 +1 312 616 5700 mhartmann@leydig.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard Zheng Hua +1 312 616 5747 +1 312 616 5700 lhua@leydig.com
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2016 Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani +1 619 595 8032 +1 619 595 8135 renzo.rocchegiani@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus A Barber +1 404 260 6080 +1 404 260 6081 mbarber@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy L. Jones +1 650 453 5418 djones@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather S. Kim +1 650 453 5419 hkim@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AARON H. MARKS +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 amarks@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Shaw , +1 650 453 5410 jshaw@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2016 R Tyler Goodwyn, IV +1 202 496 7143 +1 202 496 7756 tyler.goodwyn@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pollack, Bernd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hershey Stern +1 212 506 1794 +1 212 506 1800 hstern@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2016 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
TERMINATED: 02/29/2016 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Downing jdowning@kasowitz.com
Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc. Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2016 Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani +1 619 595 8032 +1 619 595 8135 renzo.rocchegiani@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus A Barber +1 404 260 6080 +1 404 260 6081 mbarber@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy L. Jones +1 650 453 5418 djones@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather S. Kim +1 650 453 5419 hkim@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AARON H. MARKS +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 amarks@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Shaw , +1 650 453 5410 jshaw@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2016 R Tyler Goodwyn, IV +1 202 496 7143 +1 202 496 7756 tyler.goodwyn@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pollack, Bernd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hershey Stern +1 212 506 1794 +1 212 506 1800 hstern@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2016 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
TERMINATED: 02/29/2016 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Downing jdowning@kasowitz.com
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2016 Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani +1 619 595 8032 +1 619 595 8135 renzo.rocchegiani@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus A Barber +1 404 260 6080 +1 404 260 6081 mbarber@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy L. Jones +1 650 453 5418 djones@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather S. Kim +1 650 453 5419 hkim@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AARON H. MARKS +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 amarks@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Shaw , +1 650 453 5410 jshaw@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2016 R Tyler Goodwyn, IV +1 202 496 7143 +1 202 496 7756 tyler.goodwyn@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pollack, Bernd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hershey Stern +1 212 506 1794 +1 212 506 1800 hstern@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2016 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
TERMINATED: 02/29/2016 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Downing jdowning@kasowitz.com
No Logo Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2015 James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
TERMINATED: 12/14/2015 Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com
Motorola Mobility LLC Motorola Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus A Barber +1 404 260 6080 +1 404 260 6081 mbarber@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darcy L. Jones +1 650 453 5418 djones@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather S. Kim +1 650 453 5419 hkim@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AARON H. MARKS +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 amarks@kasowitz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Shaw , +1 650 453 5410 jshaw@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Tindel & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Mark Mann +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 mark@themannfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Blake Thompson +1 903 657 8540 +1 903 657 6003 blake@themannfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Downing jdowning@kasowitz.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley Allman Bolt +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 bolt@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ajit Dang +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 dang@fr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane J Du +1 214 292 4073 +1 214 747 2091 jjdu@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thad Kodish +1 404 892 5005 tkodish@fr.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co Ltd"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley Allman Bolt +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 bolt@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ajit Dang +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 dang@fr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane J Du +1 214 292 4073 +1 214 747 2091 jjdu@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thad Kodish +1 404 892 5005 tkodish@fr.com
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015 Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015 Ajit Dang +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 dang@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE Jane J Du +1 214 292 4073 +1 214 747 2091 jjdu@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2015 Thad Kodish +1 404 892 5005 tkodish@fr.com
No Logo Ryujin Fujinomaki, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Clayton Juren +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 matthew@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Donald Puckett +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 puckett@nelbum.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (265) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Costs Taxed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER. The Court entered the parties' stipulated first amended protective order to the extent that it does not conflict with the Court's standing orders. Dkt. No. 225. The parties are in a dispute over the terms of the protective order, Dkt. Nos. 224, 227, and plaintiffs have asked for entry of an amended protective order, Dkt. No. 224-2. The request is denied. If the parties are unable to agree upon protective order terms, the Northern District's model protective order for patent cases will apply. For the question of handwritten notes, they are permitted for the names of files, folders, directories, subroutines, and variables, so long as they do not include actual source code. For the issue of software to view and search the source code, the parties are directed to use a non-internet-based solution. If that is not reasonably available, the parties should advise the Court. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/19/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Aaron H. Marks.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Aaron H. Marks ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10589031.) filed by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Google Inc., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marks, Aaron) (Filed on 7/7/2016) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/30/16. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd... (Gray, Gerald) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Google Inc., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd.. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Shaw on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Shaw, Jack) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. Kim on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Kim, Heather) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John Walter Downing on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Downing, John) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus Alan Barber on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Barber, Marcus) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Darcy Lachelle Jones on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan K. Waldrop on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10568341.) filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bolt, Ashley) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Todd Gray on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. (Gray, Gerald) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Joseph Bobel on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. (Bobel, Arthur) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryujin Fujinomaki.. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 165 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thad Kodish. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10565084.) filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Kodish, Thad) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Betty Hong Chen (Chen, Betty) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/29/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:15-cv-01381. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM ORDER - Clerk is to transfer this case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/13/16. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2016 re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen filed by Google, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, ) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. of Correction and Clarification Regarding Attorney Argument at May 3, 2016 Evidentiary Hearing (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/3/16 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (sholmes, ) (Entered: 05/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ryujin Fujinomaki for proceedings held on 5/3/2016 Evidentiary Hearing before Judge Roy S. Payne. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Substitute Defendant by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Juren, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David M Airan on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5714538. (Airan, David) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gordie Donald Puckett on behalf of Ryujin Fujinomaki (Puckett, Gordie) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Disputed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Support, # 3 Exhibit C - Intrinsic and Extrinsic, # 4 Exhibit D - Summary of Opinions of Dr. Meldal)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by H Michael Hartmann on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5702682. (Hartmann, H) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Ryujin Fujinomaki (Latchford, Shawn) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Ryujin Fujinomaki (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 140 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter; Roger Brian Craft and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/6/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 142 Motion to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/6/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Shaw on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Google, Inc., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC (Shaw, Jack) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Leonard Z Hua on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5689630. (Hua, Leonard) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/3/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/5/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Ryujin Fujinomaki of Compliance Regarding Service of Disclosures Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Juren, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Juren, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Google, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, of Compliance regarding P.R. 4-2 (Mann, James) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby Gunter, Eric H. Findlay, and Brian Craft by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Aaron H Marks on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Google, Inc., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5678718. (Marks, Aaron) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Mann, James) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darcy Lachelle Jones on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Jones, Darcy) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W Downing on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Downing, John) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Alan Barber on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Barber, Marcus) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather S. Kim on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Kim, Heather) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Keith Waldrop on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER finding as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss in view of 21 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/23/2016. (rsp2, ) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Patent Local Rules 3-3, 3-4(a), and 4-1(a)) (on behalf of all Defendants) (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc Defendant ASUS Notice of Compliance (Initial and Amended Disclosures, and Disclosure of Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(A)) (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ryujin Fujinomaki Notice of Compliance (Regarding Service of Local Patent Rule 4-1 Disclosure of Proposed Terms for Claim Construction) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 123 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner and Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/9/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Mann, James) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hershy Stern on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5649478. (Stern, Hershy) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather S. Kim on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Kim, Heather) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W Downing on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Downing, John) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Alan Barber on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Barber, Marcus) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darcy Lachelle Jones on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Jones, Darcy) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Keith Waldrop on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc.(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 03/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/27/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 113 Motion to Amend/Correct Third Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct The Docket Control Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Heather Kim, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Third Amended Docket Control Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/16/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 101 Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2016., Jury Selection set for 2/6/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 8/5/2016., Markman Hearing set for 6/24/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 12/19/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/2/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Motorola Mobility LLC Notice of Compliance with Service of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Mann, James) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Service of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Mann, James) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. Notice of Compliance (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Rocchegiani, Renzo) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc Notice of Compliance (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. of Service of Initial & Additional Disclosures (Stinson, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (Kodish, Thad) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Ryujin Fujinomaki of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/25/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/25/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/25/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A- Proposed Agreed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Position, # 3 Exhibit C- Defendants' Position, # 4 Exhibit D- Declaration of Heather Kim)(Mann, James) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Regarding E-Discovery)(Juren, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and E-Discovery Order by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Second Amended Docket Control Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 85 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff Ryujin Fujinomaki's Response to Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to The United States District For the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 104(A) Or, In the Alte, 90 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen Plaintiff Ryujin Fujinomaki's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defendants and Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew C. Juren, # 2 Exhibit 15, # 3 Exhibit 16, # 4 Exhibit 17)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keeley I Vega on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Vega, Keeley) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen I Boyd on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Boyd, Karen) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 90 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/6/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/8/15 (Scheduling Conference) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2016. (sholmes, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen filed by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Stinson, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stinson, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order filed by Google, Inc.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2016., Jury Selection set for 2/6/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 8/5/2016., Markman Hearing set for 6/24/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 12/19/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/4/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 85 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/4/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Esha Bandyopadhyay on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen Motorola Mobility LLC. filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Mann, James) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff Ryujin Fujinomaki's Response to Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to The United States District For the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 104(A) Or, In the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defendants and Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen filed by Google, Inc.. (Mann, James) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Docket Control Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER granting 78 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order filed by Ryujin Fujinomaki.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen of Joinder (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Hongsun Yoon)(Rocchegiani, Renzo) (Entered: 12/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply / Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time on Motorola Mobility LLC's Reply, and Samsung, ASUS and Huawei Technologies' Reply, to Plaintiff Ryujin Fujinomaki's Response to Motorola's Joinder, and Samsung, ASUS and Huawei's Joinder, to Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR***Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 12/23/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 12/23/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 36 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Ryujin Fujinomaki's Reply to Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen Plaintiff Ryujin Fujimaki's Response in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defendants and Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew C. Juren, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 70 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Defendant Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/14/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge David Folsom, filed by Ryujin Fujinomaki. re 24 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Joint Notice Regarding Mediator (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. Without Prejudice by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen of Joinder (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Kodish, Thad) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Allman Bolt on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (Bolt, Ashley) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Clayton Juren on behalf of Ryujin Fujinomaki (Juren, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen Responses due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/4/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Briefing on Google Inc's Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defendants and Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Tyler Goodwyn, IV on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Goodwyn, R) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC re 47 MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defen / Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Notice of Joinder and Joinder to Google Inc.'s Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas V. Miller)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 25 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Samsung Telecommunications America without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Alan Barber on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC (Barber, Marcus) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Alan Barber on behalf of Google, Inc. (Barber, Marcus) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W Downing on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC (Downing, John) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W Downing on behalf of Google, Inc. (Downing, John) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather S. Kim on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC (Kim, Heather) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather S. Kim on behalf of Google, Inc. (Kim, Heather) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend The Parties' Deadlines to Comply With P.R. 3-1 Through 3-4 and Paragraphs 1&3 of the Court's Discovery Order by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darcy Lachelle Jones on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC (Jones, Darcy) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darcy Lachelle Jones on behalf of Google, Inc. (Jones, Darcy) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Keith Waldrop on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Change Venue / Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Sever the Case as to Co-Defendants and Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hoffman, # 2 Declaration of Jonathan K. Waldrop, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Keith Waldrop on behalf of Google, Inc. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Kim, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility LLC (Mann, James) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Defenses and ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Mann, James) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Mann, James) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Google Inc's Defenses and ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Google, Inc..(Mann, James) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC (Mann, James) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc.(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Kodish, Thad) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Ryujin Fujinomaki by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC.(Kodish, Thad) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.; Corporate Parent LG Electronics, U.S.A., Inc. for LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc..(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Ryujin Fujinomaki (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Shenzhen Huawei Investment & Holding Co., Ltd. for Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Stinson, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd..(Stinson, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Rocchegiani, Renzo) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ajit Dang on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Dang, Ajit) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thad C Kodish on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Kodish, Thad) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Du, Jane) (Entered: 11/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/1/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shull, KD) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process [FRCP 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5)] NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT PROCESS AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process [FRCP 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5)] filed by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(ch, ) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryujin Fujinomaki for Google, Inc., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Asus Computer International Inc. served on 8/3/2015, answer due 8/24/2015; Asutek Computer Inc served on 8/3/2015, answer due 8/24/2015; Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. served on 8/3/2015, answer due 8/24/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 10 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Inc answer due 11/23/2015; LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc. answer due 11/23/2015; LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. answer due 11/23/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/26/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Google, Inc. (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process [FRCP 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5)] by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Email Chain), # 2 Exhibit B (Summons), # 3 Exhibit C (ACI registered agent), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/21/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/21/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Opposed Motion to Set Deadline for Response to Plaintiffs Complaint by Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Email Chain), # 2 Exhibit B (Summons as Served), # 3 Exhibit C (ACI registered agent), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC (Mann, James) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Google, Inc. (Mann, James) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/18/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Du, Jane) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Google, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Asus Computer International Inc., Asutek Computer Inc, Google, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, filed by Ryujin Fujinomaki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 22, # 4 Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit 26, # 6 Exhibit 27, # 7 Exhibit 28, # 8 Exhibit 29, # 9 Exhibit 30, # 10 Exhibit 31, # 11 Exhibit 32, # 12 Exhibit 33, # 13 Exhibit 34, # 14 Exhibit 35, # 15 Exhibit 36, # 16 Exhibit 37, # 17 Exhibit 38, # 18 Exhibit 39, # 19 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, ) Modified on 8/10/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 250 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?