Jbara v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-11073
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 12:23 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abdel Karim Jbara, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Todd & Weld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Rich +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 drich@toddweld.com
v.
Raiser LLC Raiser LLC, Defendant
No Logo Rasier LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis J. Bingham +1 617 378 6000 fbingham@littler.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Mankes +1 415 433 1940 MMankes@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asha A. Santos +1 617 378 0092 asantos@littler.com
Uber Technologies, Inc. Uber Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff Jbara's Complaint alleges that defendant Uber misclassified him as an independent contractor instead of an employee, and that Uber failed to remit to him the gratuities paid by his riders. Jbara purports to represent himself and all others similarly situated Massachusetts Uber drivers. The allegations of this lawsuit substantially overlap with the earlier-filed Yucesoy v. Uber, No. 14-13939-FDS, transferred to California as part of No. 13-03826-EMC, and so too the classes of plaintiffs would overlap. In the interest of judicial efficiency and consistency of decisions, this case is STAYED pending the resolution of the Yucesoy matter. The parties are to file a motion to request to return this case to the active docket. (RGS, int2) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None
    SUR-REPLY to Motion re 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of the Yucesoy Settlement Agreement or, in the Alternative, Strike Class Allegations and Compel Arbitration Sur-Reply in Further Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay or to Compel Arbitration (Leave to File Granted on August 9, 2016) filed by Abdel Karim Jbara. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sur-Reply Declaration of Paul B. Maslo)(Maslo, Paul) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None
      REPLY to Response to 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of the Yucesoy Settlement Agreement or, in the Alternative, Strike Class Allegations and Compel Arbitration filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Bingham, Francis) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. Reply brief, no longer than ten pages in length, must be submitted by 8/15/16. Sur reply, if any, to be filed by 8/19/16. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to 23 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Stay filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Santos, Asha) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
            Opposition re 23 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Stay filed by Abdel Karim Jbara. (Maslo, Paul) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Stay by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Santos, Asha) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
                ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy of the exhibits attached to plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Stay. Counsel should submit a courtesy copy of these exhibits to the Clerk's Office by Tuesday August 9, 2016. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
                  Opposition re 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of the Yucesoy Settlement Agreement or, in the Alternative, Strike Class Allegations and Compel Arbitration filed by Abdel Karim Jbara. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Paul B. Maslo, # 2 Exhibit A of Declaration of Paul B. Maslo, # 3 Exhibit B of Declaration of Paul B. Maslo, # 4 Exhibit C of Declaration of Paul B. Maslo, # 5 Exhibit D of Declaration of Paul B. Maslo, # 6 Exhibit E of Declaration of Paul B. Maslo, # 7 Exhibit F of Declaration of Paul B. Maslo, # 8 Affidavit of Abdel Karim Jbara)(Maslo, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, up to thirty. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages relative to Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Stay by Abdel Karim Jbara.(Weld, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Maslo. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul B. Maslo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6215908 by Abdel Karim Jbara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Paul B.Maslo)(Rich, David) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J. Bingham on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Bingham, Francis) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy of the exhibits attached to defendants Memorandum (Dkt. #14). Counsel who filed these exhibits are requested to submit a courtesy copy of them to the Clerk's Office by 7/28/16. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of the Yucesoy Settlement Agreement or, in the Alternative, Strike Class Allegations and Compel Arbitration filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Colman, # 2 Exhibit A to Colman Declaration--Screenshot, # 3 Exhibit B to Colman Declaration--Screenshot, # 4 Exhibit C to Colman Declaration--6/20/14 Agreement, # 5 Exhibit D to Colman Declaration--Receipt, # 6 Exhibit E to Colman Declaration--Driver Portal, # 7 Affidavit of Asha Santos, # 8 Exhibit A to Santos Declaration--O'Connor Complaint, # 9 Exhibit B to Santos Declaration--O'Connor Order, # 10 Exhibit C to Santos Declaration--Yucesoy MA Complaint, # 11 Exhibit D to Santos Declaration--Yucesoy USDC MA Docket, # 12 Exhibit E to Santos Declaration Yucesoy NDCA Fourth Amended Complaint, # 13 Exhibit F to Santos Declaration--Settlement Agreement, # 14 Exhibit G to Santos Declaration--O'Connor Docket, # 15 Exhibit H to Santos Declaration--Yucesoy Dockete)(Mankes, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of the Yucesoy Settlement Agreement or, in the Alternative, Strike Class Allegations and Compel Arbitration by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Mankes, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                    Notice of Filing Consent to Sue. (Rich, David) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns added. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Rich, David) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed by July 21, 2016. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants Response to Complaint due by cob 7/21/16. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Mankes on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Mankes, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 21, 2016 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Santos, Asha) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Rasier, LLC served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. (Rich, David) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. (Rich, David) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                      Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6149080 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Abdel Karim Jbara. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Rich, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/13/2016) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia). (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 445 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?